Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Dixie Marine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Canopius/State National Ins. Co., Travelers Property Casualty Co of America, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Great American Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Great American Insurance Co
Defendant: Dixie Marine, Inc. and Dixie Marine Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: New Orleans Steamboat Company, Bluewater Electric, LLC and Southern Diesel Service, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01455
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2024 03:00 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 4/29/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry (5 days). All discovery must be completed by 2/26/2024. Issued by Clerk for the Court. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dp)
August 11, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Third-Party Defendants' / Rule 14(c) Defendants' Jury Demands by Dixie Marine Inc, Dixie Marine Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Maestri, Walter)
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Answer to Third Party Complaint. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate 5, Magistrate Judge Michael North. (js)
August 9, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2023 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (dp)
August 9, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Third Party Complaint by Southern Diesel Service, LLC. Attorney Lawrence Raymond DeMarcay, III added to party Southern Diesel Service, LLC(pty:3pd).(DeMarcay, Lawrence) Modified text on 8/10/2023 (js).
August 8, 2023 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by New Orleans Steamboat Company (Mahtook, Robert)
July 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2023 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (dp)
July 26, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to Rule 14(C) Tender by Bluewater Electric, LLC. Attorney Robert Michael Kallam added to party Bluewater Electric, LLC(pty:3pd).(Kallam, Robert) Modified text/link on 7/27/2023 (js).
July 12, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Third Party Complaint, with Jury Demand by New Orleans Steamboat Company. Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party New Orleans Steamboat Company(pty:3pd).(Mahtook, Robert) Modified text on 7/13/2023 (js).
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons'. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (js)
June 12, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bluewater Electric, LLC, New Orleans Steamboat Company, Southern Diesel Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/12/2023. (rt)
June 9, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bluewater Electric, LLC, Southern Diesel Service, LLC, New Orleans Steamboat Company by Dixie Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Walter P. Maestri added to party Dixie Marine Inc(pty:dft).(Maestri, Walter) Modified text on 6/12/2023 (js). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/12/2023) (js). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/12/2023) (js). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/12/2023) (js).
May 17, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dixie Marine Inc served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Mahtook, Robert) Modified date served on 5/17/2023 (js).
May 2, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dixie Marine, Inc. (js)
May 2, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dixie Marine, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9916999) filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Co of America, Canopius/State National Ins. Co., Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Canopius/State National Ins. Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:pla), Attorney Robert A. Mahtook, Jr added to party Travelers Property Casualty Co of America(pty:pla).(Mahtook, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Dixie Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canopius/State National Ins. Co.
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Co of America
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Marine Inc
Represented By: Walter P. Maestri
Represented By: Bertrand M. Cass, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: New Orleans Steamboat Company
Represented By: Robert A. Mahtook, Jr.
Represented By: Kaliste Joseph Saloom, IV
Represented By: Kay Austin Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bluewater Electric, LLC
Represented By: Robert Michael Kallam
Represented By: Ross Francis Roubion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Southern Diesel Service, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Raymond DeMarcay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?