In the Matter of Sunland Construction Inc.
Petitioner: Sunland-Kori Services, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Sunland Construction Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Michael Bianchini and Raymond Bianchini, Jr.
Consolidated Defendant: Venture Global Gator Express, LLC and Unidentified Party
3Rd Party Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01665
Filed: May 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Reference: 23-1665)(js)
July 12, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Michael Bianchini. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Reference: 2:23-cv-1665)(Kobetz, Natalie) Modified text/linkage on 7/13/2023 (js).
July 12, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Raymond Bianchini, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Reference: 2:23-cv-1665)(Kobetz, Natalie) Modified text/linkage on 7/13/2023 (js).
July 12, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER and CLAIM to #15 Amended Complaint by Michael Bianchini. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Reference: 2:23-cv-1665)(Kobetz, Natalie) Modified text/linkage on 7/13/2023 (js).
July 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Answer to Complaint, by Sunland Construction Inc., Sunland-Kori Services, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Pleading, #5 Proposed Order)(Reference: 23-1665)(Guy, Matthew)
June 27, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Venture Global Gator Express, LLC re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 23cv1796)(Asprodites, Rowen)
June 27, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Sunland Construction Inc., Sunland-Kori Services, LLC re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Reference: 23-1796)(Guy, Matthew)
June 27, 2023 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sunland-Kori Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Broad Oak Enterprises, LLC for Sunland-Kori Services, LLC (Reference: 23-1665; 23-1796)(Guy, Matthew)
June 23, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY Sunland Construction Inc., Sunland-Kori Services, LLC filed by Sunland Construction Inc., Sunland-Kori Services, LLC.(Reference: 23-1665)(js)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/23/2023. (Reference: 23-1665)(js)
June 22, 2023 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Sunland Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 23-1665)(Guy, Matthew) Modified text on 6/22/2023 (js).
June 20, 2023 Filing 12 **DEFICIENT** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Bianchini, Raymond Bianchini, Jr. filed by Sunland Construction Inc..(Reference: 23-1665)(Guy, Matthew) Modified on 6/21/2023 (js).
June 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael Bianchini, Michael Bianchini. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:23-cv-1665)(Kobetz, Natalie)
June 6, 2023 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sunland Construction Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sunland Equity, L.L.C. for Sunland Construction Inc. (Reference: 23-1665; 23-1796)(Laizer, Edwin) Modified text on 6/7/2023 (js).
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Civil Action 23-1796 be consolidated with the above-captioned matter. All pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the limited liability suit, In the Matter of Sunland Construction, Inc., Civil Action No. 23-1665 Section "T" (5) together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies, except that orders and documents terminating a party or disposing of a case will also be entered on the individual docket sheet. All documents shall be filed in the master file only, except that orders and documents terminating a party or disposing of a case will also be filed in the record of the individual case. In the event that a case is separated from the consolidated group, it shall be the responsibility of counsel jointly to designate the documents necessary to the continued litigation of the case and to file such designation and copies of the documents. The Clerk of Court is instructed to deliver a copy of this order to all counsel of record this date. The defendants, if and when served, may move to unconsolidate the actions, with good cause shown therefor. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 06/05/2023.(js)
June 1, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company(Rec. Doc. 5), Hartford Fire Insurance Company(Rec. Doc. 6). (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
June 1, 2023 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Answer to Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint. **Summons were prepared on incorrect form. Third Party Summons should be prepared on AO 441. Clerk will prepare summons.** (am)
May 31, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, and Third Party Complaint against Sunland Construction, Inc. and Hartford Fire Insurance Company by Raymond Bianchini, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)Attorney Natalie Kobetz added to party Raymond Bianchini, Jr.(pty:clm).(Kobetz, Natalie) Modified text on 6/1/2023 (am).
May 31, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, and Third Party Complaint against Sunland Construction, Inc. and Hartford Fire Insurance Company by Michael Bianchini. (Attachments: #1 Summons)Attorney Natalie Kobetz added to party Michael Bianchini(pty:clm).(Kobetz, Natalie) Modified text on 6/1/2023 (am).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing the Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining the Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(js)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/18/2023. (rt)
May 17, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls)
May 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY Sunland Construction Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9940481) filed by Sunland Construction Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Values, #2 Exhibit A - Rivers & Gulf Appraisal, #3 Letter of Undertaking, #4 Notice to Claimants of Complaint, #5 Proposed Order Order Approving Petitioners' Letters, etc., #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Matthew C. Guy added to party Sunland Construction Inc.(pty:pet).(Guy, Matthew) Modified text on 5/18/2023 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Sunland Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sunland Construction Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Bianchini
Represented By: Philip Francis Cossich, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brandon J. Taylor
Represented By: Natalie Kobetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Raymond Bianchini, Jr.
Represented By: Philip Francis Cossich, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew J. Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brandon J. Taylor
Represented By: Natalie Kobetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sunland-Kori Services, LLC
Represented By: Edwin Christian Laizer
Represented By: James T. Rogers, III
Represented By: Matthew C. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Venture Global Gator Express, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Greenbaum
Represented By: Anna G. Carey
Represented By: Rowen F. Asprodites
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?