Q Transport, LLC v. Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Q Transport, LLC
Defendant: Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc, Paccar Inc, Cummins Inc, Hexagon Agility Inc, Paccar Inc doing business as Peterbilt Motors Company, PACCAR Inc improperly named as Paccar, Inc. d/b/a Peterbilt Motors Company and Rush Truck Centers of Texas, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02160
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing Without Date by Q Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neuner, Michael)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 MOTION to Continue Submission Date. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/30/2023 as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/25/2023.(mmm)
July 24, 2023 Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Q Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neuner, Michael)
July 20, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PACCAR Inc(improperly named as Paccar, Inc. d/b/a Peterbilt Motors Company). Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Notice of Submission)(Zimmer, Scott)
July 20, 2023 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by PACCAR Inc(improperly named as Paccar, Inc. d/b/a Peterbilt Motors Company) (Zimmer, Scott)
July 20, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Cummins Inc.(Philips, Harry)
July 20, 2023 Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hexagon Agility Inc identifying Corporate Parent Hexagon Composites ASA for Hexagon Agility Inc (Parker, Jordan)
July 20, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rush Truck Centers of Texas, L.P.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Notice of Submission)(Zimmer, Scott)
July 20, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hexagon Agility Inc.(Parker, Jordan)
July 20, 2023 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Rush Truck Centers of Texas, L.P. identifying Corporate Parents: Rush Enterprises, Inc., Rushco, Inc. for Rush Truck Centers of Texas, L.P. (Zimmer, Scott)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine Harrington.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/18/23. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (cg)
July 17, 2023 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10030797) by Cummins Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, Supreme Court of Texas, #2 Statement Declaration of Katherine Harrington, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 E-File Privileges)(Philips, Harry)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc answer due 7/20/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/12/2023. (mmm)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to PACCAR Inc answer due 7/20/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/12/2023. (mmm)
July 12, 2023 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document, #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm)
July 11, 2023 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Scott) Modified text/event/link on 7/12/2023 (mmm).
July 11, 2023 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by PACCAR Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Scott) Modified text/event/link on 7/12/2023 (mmm).
July 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by PACCAR Inc to #1 Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A additional State Court documents)(Zimmer, Scott)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, as to Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc answer due 7/12/2023. (mmm)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal as to Cummins Inc answer due 7/20/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/30/2023. (mmm)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, as to PACCAR Inc answer due 7/12/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/30/2023. (mmm)
June 30, 2023 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Scott)
June 29, 2023 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (2) Donna Phillips Currault. No further action is necessary. (rt)
June 29, 2023 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Cummins Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Philips, Harry)
June 29, 2023 Filing 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cummins Inc (Philips, Harry)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, as to Hexagon Agility Inc answer due 7/20/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/29/2023. (mmm)
June 29, 2023 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PACCAR Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Scott) Modified text/link on 6/29/2023 (rt).
June 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance re: #1 Complaint by Q Transport, LLC re Substitution of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order granting Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record for Q Transport, LLC)(Surprenant, Diana)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (1) Janis van Meerveld. (mmm)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Hexagon Agility Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christopher W. Kaul added to party Hexagon Agility Inc(pty:dft).(Kaul, Christopher)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/26/2023.(lb)
June 23, 2023 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. (mmm)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Pursuant to E-Filing Procedures, do not fill out address, phone, or fax fields for any party. Clerk took corrective action. **2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mmm)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
June 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th JDC, Plaquemines Parish, case number 68-110 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9995956) filed by Paccar Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Blair Boyd added to party Paccar Inc(pty:dft).(Boyd, Blair) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/23/2023) (mmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Q Transport, LLC v. Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Transport, LLC
Represented By: Charles Michael Parks
Represented By: Mark Raymond Beebe
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Represented By: Patrick Hogan Crosby, Jr
Represented By: Michael Thomas Neuner
Represented By: Edwin Christian Laizer
Represented By: Michael A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Truck Centers of Texas, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc
Represented By: Blair Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hexagon Agility Inc
Represented By: Christopher W. Kaul
Represented By: Jordan P. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc doing business as Peterbilt Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR Inc improperly named as Paccar, Inc. d/b/a Peterbilt Motors Company
Represented By: Scott L. Zimmer
Represented By: Blair Boyd
Represented By: Megan LeBato Reinkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Truck Centers of Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Blair Boyd
Represented By: Scott L. Zimmer
Represented By: Megan LeBato Reinkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?