Juluke v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Bernell Juluke
Defendant: Len Davis, Samuel Williams, Wayne Tamborella, Dwight Deal, Anthony Small, Ross J.J. Mocklin, Kenneth Harris, City of New Orleans, Louisiana, Harry F. Connick, Sr., New Orleans City and Jason Rogers Williams
Case Number: 2:2023cv03111
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Orleans City.(St. Raymond, Corwin)
September 20, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Harry F. Connick, Sr.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Harry F. Connick, Sr.(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew)
September 19, 2023 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Len Davis served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Marrese, John)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to New Orleans City answer due 9/21/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/1/2023. (mmm)
September 4, 2023 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(St. Raymond, Corwin)
August 31, 2023 Filing 28 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Corwin St. Raymond added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(St. Raymond, Corwin) Modified on 9/1/2023 (mmm).
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to Jason Rogers Williams answer due 9/21/2023. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/28/2023. (mmm)
August 25, 2023 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jason Rogers Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Jason Rogers Williams(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Serve Summons and Complaint on Incarcerated Defendant Len Davis via U.S. Marshals Service as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/21/2023. (mmm)
August 18, 2023 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Leave to Serve Summons and Complaint on Incarcerated Defendant Len Davis via U.S. Marshals Service by Bernell Juluke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marrese, John)
August 15, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Samuel Williams served on 8/12/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Marrese, John) Modified on 8/15/2023 (mmm).
August 14, 2023 Filing 22 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Samuel Williams served on 8/12/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Marrese, John) Modified on 8/15/2023 (mmm).
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian Howard Eldridge. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Hart. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
August 11, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Harry F. Connick, Sr. served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. (Unglesby, Lance)
August 11, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. (Unglesby, Lance)
August 9, 2023 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ***Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. ***All future pleadings must reflect Section A, Jay Zainey and Magistrate (2) Donna Currault. (mmm)
August 9, 2023 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Eldridge (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10072661) by Bernell Juluke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to E-Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Marrese, John)
August 9, 2023 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10072600) by Bernell Juluke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to E-Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Marrese, John)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Shannon Marrese. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
August 4, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Harry F. Connick, Sr., Len Davis, Dwight Deal, Kenneth Harris, Ross J.J. Mocklin, New Orleans City, Anthony Small, Wayne Tamborella, Samuel Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(mmm)
August 3, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10065167) by Bernell Juluke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Marrese Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - John Marrese Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Unglesby, Lance)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of New Orleans, Louisiana, Harry F. Connick, Sr., Len Davis, Dwight Deal, Kenneth Harris, Ross J.J. Mocklin, Anthony Small, Wayne Tamborella, Samuel Williams (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10064945) filed by Bernell Juluke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lance Covington Unglesby added to party Bernell Juluke(pty:pla).(Unglesby, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juluke v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernell Juluke
Represented By: Lance Covington Unglesby
Represented By: Adrian Michael Simm, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Howard Eldridge
Represented By: Jamie F Gontarek
Represented By: John Shannon Marrese
Represented By: Steven Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Len Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Tamborella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross J.J. Mocklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans, Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry F. Connick, Sr.
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Renee E. Goudeau
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rogers Williams
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?