Encalade v. Sylvia Biggs, et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Clemont Encalade
Defendant: 25th Judicial District Court, Sylvia Biggs, Joy Jones, Wanda Biggs and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv03283
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Correct Case Caption. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the case caption as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the 25th Judicial District Courthouse are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER AND REASONS denying #21 Motion to Call U.S. Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Airflight to Courthouse Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Speedy Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND REASONS denying #13 Motion for Televised Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions for Discovery (ECF Nos. #11 , #19 ), Motion for Production of Documents (ECF No. #18 ), and Motion for Oil and Gas Lease Documents (ECF No. #25 ) are DENIED at this time, without prejudice to his right to seek discovery after completion of the frivolousness review and compliance with Rule 26(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/28/2023. (rt)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Local Rule 73.3. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/27/2023.(clc)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Correct Case Caption filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss) Images QC'd on 9/29/2023 (aj).
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Oil and Gas Lease Documents filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. Modified docket text on 9/25/2023 (ss). Modified text on 9/28/2023 (rt). Images QC'd on 10/2/2023 (aj).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of Counsel (ECF Nos. #4 , #12 ) are DENIED at this time, without prejudice to his right to re-urge his request after completion of the Court's statutorily mandated screening review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/12/2023. (rt)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade re #9 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions. (ss)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade re #9 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions. (ss) Modified on 9/14/2023 (ss).
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Call U.S. Attorney filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade as to #9 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions. (Attachments: #1 USCA Transmittal Letter)(ss) Images QC'd on 10/2/2023 (aj).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Discovery filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Production of Documents filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Airlift to Courthouse filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Jury Trial filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Speedy Trial filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Televised (TV) Trial filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (ss)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade re #9 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions. (ss)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff Lonnie Clemont Encalade filed a "Complaint for a Civil Case and Criminal Case,"an Amended "Complaint for a Civil Case and Criminal RICO," a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Motion for Injunction. ECF Nos. #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 . IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk remove the deficiency and Plaintiff's Ex Parte/ConsentMotion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #8 ) be GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk withhold issuance of summons at this time pending completion of the statutorily mandated review; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for the reasons set forth above, on or before TUESDAY, OCTOBER 31, 2023, Plaintiff Lonnie Clemont Encalade SHOW CAUSE why his Complaint should not be summarily dismissed as frivolous and/or for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in response to this show cause order, Plaintiff shall file a response containing a concise written statement of the claims or basis for relief as to each identified defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be no oral hearing on Tuesday, October 31, 2023, but the matter will be taken under advisement on the written filings on that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/25/23. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(cg)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Filing, #2 Cover Letter)(ss) Modified docket text on 8/23/2023 (ss). Modified on 8/28/2023 (cg).
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade.(ss)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT with jury demand against 25th Judicial District Court, Sylvia Biggs, Wanda Biggs, Joy Jones, Unidentified Parties filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss) Modified docket text on 8/22/2023 (ss). Images QC'd on 9/26/2023 (aj).
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Injunction filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss) Images QC'd on 9/5/2023 (aj).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (ss) Image QC'd on 8/18/2023 (aj).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re Terminate Motions. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/29/2023. (ss)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (ss) Image QC'd on 8/18/2023 (aj).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against 25th Judicial District Court, Sylvia Biggs, Wanda Biggs, Joy Jones, Unidentified Parties filed by Lonnie Clemont Encalade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss) Modified on 8/10/2023 (ss). Image QC'd on 8/18/2023 (aj). Modified docket text on 8/22/2023 (ss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encalade v. Sylvia Biggs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Clemont Encalade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25th Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?