Parria v. Cvitanovich et al
Plaintiff: Shantel Parria
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Kurt Zeagler, William Roniger, James Arey, Timothy Scanlan, Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Kellie Rish, Unidentified Parties, Donald Meunier, Paul Connick and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Health Care Organization Professional and General Liability Insurance Policy No. AH100558
Cross Defendant: Dana Troxclair
Case Number: 2:2023cv03663
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Kurt Zeagler.(Martiny, Daniel)
October 13, 2023 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by William Roniger.(Martiny, Daniel)
October 13, 2023 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Joseph P. Lopinto, III.(Martiny, Daniel)
October 12, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Donald Meunier.(Martiny, Daniel)
October 6, 2023 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by James Arey.(Martiny, Daniel)
October 6, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Timothy Scanlan.(Martiny, Daniel)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Expedited hearing. Plaintiff must file memoranda in opposition to the motions to dismiss by October 26, 2023. Defendants must file reply memoranda by November 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/05/2023. (cs)
October 5, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Paul Connick, Kellie Rish re #26 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines . (Donelon, Clement) Modified text on 10/6/2023 (cs).
October 5, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(cs)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/5/2023. (cs)
October 4, 2023 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite consideration re doc #26 Motion for Extension of deadlines by Shantel Parria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Mary) Modified text on 10/5/2023 (cs).
October 4, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines of the Submission date re doc #24 Motion to Dismiss by Shantel Parria. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Smith, Mary) Modified text on 10/5/2023 (cs).
October 3, 2023 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memorandum in Support of 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Pleading Memorandum in Support of 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(Plaiscia, Amanda)
October 3, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paul Connick, Kellie Rish. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Donelon, Clement)
September 21, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Kellie Rish on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Palazzo, Leo) Modified answer date on 9/21/2023 (cg).
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/19/2023. (cbs)
September 18, 2023 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by James Arey, Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Donald Meunier, William Roniger, Timothy Scanlan, Kurt Zeagler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Modified on 9/19/2023 (cbs).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Frederick E. Yorsch for Gerald Cvitanovich,Frederick E. Yorsch for Gerald Cvitanovich,Frederick E. Yorsch for Julia Powers,Frederick E. Yorsch for Julia Powers,Frederick E. Yorsch for Dana Troxclair,Frederick E. Yorsch for Dana Troxclair. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 09/15/2023. (cs)
September 15, 2023 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Answer to Counterclaim. Signature block on pleading contains the name of an attorney who is not enrolled in this matter, Jason Markey. A motion to enroll and order is required to enroll. Any future pleadings containing the signature of an attorney not enrolled in this matter will not be accepted. (cs)
September 14, 2023 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Frederick Yorsch by Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Plaiscia, Amanda) Modified text on 9/15/2023 (cs).
September 14, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #5 Crossclaim, Counterclaim, by Shantel Parria.(Palazzo, Leo) Modified text on 9/15/2023 (cs).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Gerald Cvitanovich answer due 10/3/2023; Julia Powers answer due 10/3/2023; Dana Troxclair answer due 10/3/2023. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/13/2023. (my)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cs)
September 12, 2023 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Amanda M. Plaiscia added to party Gerald Cvitanovich(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda M. Plaiscia added to party Julia Powers(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda M. Plaiscia added to party Dana Troxclair(pty:dft).(Plaiscia, Amanda)
September 12, 2023 Filing 13 Request of Summons Issued as to Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Health Care Organization Professional and General Liability Insurance Policy No. AH100558 re #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Grabill, Jeremy)
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kurt Zeagler served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Palazzo, Leo)
September 11, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; William Roniger served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (Palazzo, Leo)
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; James Arey served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (Palazzo, Leo)
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Timothy Scanlan served on 8/28/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Palazzo, Leo)
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Paul Connick served on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/4/2023. (Palazzo, Leo)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to Paul Connick answer due 10/4/2023; Kellie Rish answer due 10/4/2023. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 09/08/2023. (cs)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer . Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 4 to document 1. (cs)
September 7, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Gerald Cvitanovich, Julia Powers, Dana Troxclair, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Shantel Parria by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Health Care Organization Professional and General Liability Insurance Policy No. AH100558.Attorney Jeremy T. Grabill added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Health Care Organization Professional and General Liability Insurance Policy No. AH100558 (pty:dft).(Grabill, Jeremy)
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Paul Connick, Kellie Rish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Clement Peter Donelon added to party Paul Connick(pty:dft), Attorney Clement Peter Donelon added to party Kellie Rish(pty:dft).(Donelon, Clement) Modified link/text on 9/8/2023 (cs).
August 21, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James Arey, Paul Connick, Gerald Cvitanovich, Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Donald Meunier, Julia Powers, Kellie Rish, William Roniger, Timothy Scanlan, Dana Troxclair, Kurt Zeagler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(cs)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10092501) filed by Shantel M Parria. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons defendant Cvitanovich, #4 Summons defendant Lopinto, #5 Summons defendant Troxclair, #6 Summons defendant Rish, #7 Summons defendant Connick, #8 Summons defendant Powers, #9 Summons defendant Meunier, #10 Summons defendant Scanlan, #11 Summons defendant Roniger, #12 Summons defendant Zeagler, #13 Summons defendant Arey)Attorney Leo J Palazzo added to party Shantel M Parria(pty:pla).(Palazzo, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parria v. Cvitanovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantel Parria
Represented By: Mario A. Arteaga
Represented By: Mary Watson Smith
Represented By: Leo J Palazzo
Represented By: Davin Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: Franz L. Zibilich
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Zeagler
Represented By: Franz L. Zibilich
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Roniger
Represented By: Franz L. Zibilich
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Arey
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: Franz L. Zibilich
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Scanlan
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: Franz L. Zibilich
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Cvitanovich
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Represented By: Amanda M. Plaiscia
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Represented By: Frederick E. Yorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Powers
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Represented By: Amanda M. Plaiscia
Represented By: Frederick E. Yorsch
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Rish
Represented By: Clement Peter Donelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Meunier
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Franz L. Zibilich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Connick
Represented By: Clement Peter Donelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Health Care Organization Professional and General Liability Insurance Policy No. AH100558
Represented By: Kyle S. Moran
Represented By: Melissa Holliday Redmon
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dana Troxclair
Represented By: Amanda M. Plaiscia,
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Represented By: Frederick E. Yorsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?