Walter v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Sullivan Walter
Defendant: New Orleans City, Jason Williams, Michelle Woodfork, Harry Connick, Sr., Eddie Jordan, Jr., Leon Cannizzaro, Jr., Harry ONeal, John/Jane Does #1-20, Unidentified Parties and Anne Kirkpatrick
Case Number: 2:2023cv04352
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Filing 36 Declaration by Sullivan Walter re: All Defendants' Written Consent to Filing of First Amended Complaint (Shanies, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 35 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against New Orleans City, Harry ONeal, Unidentified Parties, Jason Williams, Anne Kirkpatrick filed by Sullivan Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Levenson Report))(Shanies, David)
October 18, 2023 Filing 34 **DEFICIENT** First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), against New Orleans City, Harry ONeal, Unidentified Parties, Jason Williams, Michelle Woodfork filed by Sullivan Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Levenson Report))(Shanies, David) Modified on 10/19/2023 (pp).
October 17, 2023 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by New Orleans City, Harry ONeal, Michelle Woodfork.(St. Raymond, Corwin)
October 17, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jason Williams. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Paul, Matthew)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to New Orleans City, Harry ONeal and Michelle Woodfork; answer due 10/17/2023. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
September 29, 2023 Filing 30 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer . Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 29 to document 1. (cs)
September 28, 2023 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by New Orleans City, Harry ONeal, Michelle Woodfork. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Renee E. Goudeau added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft), Attorney Renee E. Goudeau added to party Harry ONeal(pty:dft), Attorney Renee E. Goudeau added to party Michelle Woodfork(pty:dft).(Goudeau, Renee) Modified link/text on 9/29/2023 (cs).
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED, and that the deadline for Mr. Williams to file a response to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sullivan Walter is hereby extended by 21days, to October 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 09/22/2023. (js)
September 20, 2023 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Jason Williams(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew)
September 20, 2023 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Shanies of #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Specified Defendants and #25 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss served on All Defendants on 09/19/2023. (Shanies, David)
September 19, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Sullivan Walter re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion is moot in light of #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i)). (Shanies, David)
September 19, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Harry Connick, Sr.; Eddie Jordan; and Leon Cannizzaro, Jr., in their official capacities by Sullivan Walter. (Shanies, David)
September 11, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leon Cannizzaro, Jr., Harry Connick, Sr., Eddie Jordan, Jr.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Leon Cannizzaro, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Harry Connick, Sr.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Eddie Jordan, Jr.(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew)
September 9, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michelle Woodfork served on 09/05/2023, answer due 09/26/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/11/2023 (cs).
September 9, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jason Williams served on 09/02/2023, answer due 09/26/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/11/2023 (cs).
September 9, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michelle Woodfork served 09/05/2023, answer due 09/26/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/11/2023 (cs).
September 9, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Harry O'Neal served on 09/04/2023, answer due 09/25/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/11/2023 (cs).
September 9, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Harry Connick, Sr., served on 9/2/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/11/2023 (cs).
September 7, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Eddie Jordan, Jr. served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Shanies, David)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Leon Cannizzaro, Jr. served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Shanies, David)
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 DEFICIENT---SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michelle Woodfork served on 9/5/2023, answer due 9/26/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (cs).
September 6, 2023 Filing 14 DEFICIENT---SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jason Williams served on 9/5/2023, answer due 9/26/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (cs).
September 6, 2023 Filing 13 DEFICIENT---SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 9/5/2023, answer due 9/26/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (cs).
September 6, 2023 Filing 12 DEFICIENT---SUMMONS Returned Executed; Harry ONeal served on 9/4/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (cs).
September 6, 2023 Filing 11 DEFICIENT---SUMMONS Returned Executed; Harry Connick, Sr. served on 9/2/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Shanies, David) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (cs).
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eleanor Davis. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 08/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cs)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Deborah Ingrid Francois. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 08/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cs)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Bradley Shanies. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 08/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cs)
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Leon Cannizzaro, Jr., Harry Connick, Sr., Eddie Jordan, Jr., New Orleans City, Harry ONeal, Jason Williams, Michelle Woodfork. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(cs)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eleanor C. Davis (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10116954) by Sullivan Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Eleanor C. Davis, #3 Exhibit Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) Modified text on 8/29/2023 (cs).
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Deborah I. Francois (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10116935) by Sullivan Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Deborah I. Francois, #3 Exhibit Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2023) (cs). Modified image/text on 8/29/2023 (cs).
August 28, 2023 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Shanies (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10116801) by Sullivan Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David B. Shanies, #3 Exhibit Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) Modified text on 8/29/2023 (cs).
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leon Cannizzaro, Jr., Harry Connick, Sr., Eddie Jordan, Jr., New Orleans City, Harry ONeal, Jason Williams, Michelle Woodfork. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(cs)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10111234) filed by Sullivan Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Professor Laurie L. Levenson, #2 Notice of Collateral Proceeding, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Sullivan Walter(pty:pla).(Murell, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walter v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sullivan Walter
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Represented By: Eleanor Davis
Represented By: David Bradley Shanies
Represented By: Deborah Ingrid Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Renee E. Goudeau
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Williams
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Woodfork
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: Renee E. Goudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Connick, Sr.
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Cannizzaro, Jr.
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry ONeal
Represented By: Renee E. Goudeau
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does #1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?