CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC et al v. Southstar Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC, FCA Construction, LLC, FCA Electrical Services, LLC, FCA Equipment, LLC, FCA Mechanical, LLC, FCA Plumbing, LLC, FCA Roofing, LLC and Albert Walter Courcelle, III
Defendant: Southstar Financial, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv04847
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #14 Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion. IT IS ORDERED that, at the request of the parties, the oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case Venue set for 10/19/2023 is RESET for 11/16/2023 at 9:30a.m. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(egs)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #16 Motion Set Deadline for Sur-Reply and Allow Live Testimony. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/13/2023. (am)
October 12, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Southstar Financial, LLC re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(sa)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/12/2023. (sa)
October 11, 2023 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Southstar Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - TX Court Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Todd Culbreth, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Lori Wolff, #5 Proposed Order)(King, Mary Ellen)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #17 is GRANTED and that any response to the Motion shall be filed on or before October 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/11/2023. (am)
October 10, 2023 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Set Deadline for Sur-Reply and Allow Live Testimony by CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC, Albert Walter Courcelle, III, FCA Construction, LLC, FCA Electrical Services, LLC, FCA Equipment, LLC, FCA Mechanical, LLC, FCA Plumbing, LLC, FCA Roofing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael)
October 10, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION Set Deadline for Sur-Reply and Allow Live Testimony by CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC, Albert Walter Courcelle, III, FCA Construction, LLC, FCA Electrical Services, LLC, FCA Equipment, LLC, FCA Mechanical, LLC, FCA Plumbing, LLC, FCA Roofing, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Dodson, Michael)
October 10, 2023 Filing 15 **DEFICIENT**RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Southstar Financial, LLC re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - TX Court Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Todd Culbreth, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Lori Wolff)(King, Mary Ellen) Modified on 10/11/2023 (am).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearing on #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue : Motion Hearing with Oral Argument set for 10/19/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/04/2023.(am)
October 3, 2023 Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael)
October 3, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dodson, Michael)
September 22, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Southstar Financial, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Factoring Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Construction Addendum, #4 Exhibit 3 - Attestation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Guaranty, #6 Notice of Submission)(King, Mary Ellen)
September 21, 2023 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Southstar Financial, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SouthStar Capital, LLC for Southstar Financial, LLC (King, Mary Ellen)
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Southstar Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Factoring Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Construction Addendum, #4 Exhibit 3 - Attestation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Guaranty)Attorney Mary Ellen King added to party Southstar Financial, LLC(pty:dft).(King, Mary Ellen) Modified text on 9/22/2023 (am).
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael R. Dodson of First Amended Complaint served on SouthStar Financial, LLC thru its agent Lindsey W. Cooper & signed by J. Ackie on September 6, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B FedEx Confirmation Amended Complaint)(Dodson, Michael)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Southstar Financial, LLC served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Federal Express Confirmation)(Dodson, Michael)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southstar Financial, LLC filed by FCA Plumbing, LLC, FCA Electrical Services, LLC, FCA Roofing, LLC, FCA Construction, LLC, Albert Walter Courcelle, III, CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC, FCA Equipment, LLC, FCA Mechanical, LLC.(Dodson, Michael)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND REASONS - The Court finds that Plaintiffs have failed to adequately allege diversity of citizenship. Plaintiffs are GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND their Complaint within 20 days from the entry of this Order. Failure to file timely an amended complaint will result in dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/30/2023.(sa)
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Southstar Financial, LLC. (sa)
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Southstar Financial, LLC re: #1 Complaint. (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2023 (sa).
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Southstar Financial, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10118357) filed by FCA Plumbing, LLC, FCA Electrical Services, LLC, FCA Roofing, LLC, FCA Construction, LLC, Albert Walter Courcelle, III, CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC, FCA Equipment, LLC, FCA Mechanical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party Albert Walter Courcelle, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party FCA Construction, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party FCA Electrical Services, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party FCA Equipment, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party FCA Mechanical, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party FCA Plumbing, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Ryan Dodson added to party FCA Roofing, LLC(pty:pla).(Dodson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC et al v. Southstar Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CFM Disaster Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA Electrical Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA Mechanical, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA Plumbing, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Walter Courcelle, III
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southstar Financial, LLC
Represented By: Mary Ellen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?