Little et al v. Quality Title Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carl Little Law, LLC
Defendant: Quality Title Services, LLC, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC, Scott Sternberg, Clayton White, Joseph Marriott, Keith Nacarri and M. Suzanne Montero
Cross Defendant: Carl Little
Cross Claimant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2023cv05394
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Strike #44 Manual Attachment Received Exhibit A by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC, Clayton White. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Bezou, Jacques)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC, Clayton White re #40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim, ; . (Bezou, Jacques)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit A under seal. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/13/2023. (clc)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The Court declines to schedule oral argument at this time. If the Court later finds that oral argument would be helpful, counsel will be notified. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/13/2023.(clc)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Seal Exhibit 3 re #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/13/2023. (clc)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Manual Attachment Received and Scanned re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Carl Little, Carl Little Law, LLC. (am)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manual Attachment, #2 Proposed Order)(Kutcher, Robert)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC., and Clayton White. (Bezou, Jacques) Modified filers on 11/13/2023 (clc).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little regarding #40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Order & Reasons (Kutcher, Robert)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Order & Reasons by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Kutcher, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2023: #3 Exhibit A) (clc).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document #38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Exhibit 3 by Quality Title Services, LLC, Quality Title Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Manual Attachment)(Gauthier, Camille)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Quality Title Services, LLC, Quality Title Services, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)Attorney Camille E. Gauthier added to party Quality Title Services, LLC(pty:intplp).(Gauthier, Camille)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Quality Title Services, LLC.(Gauthier, Camille)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that the #10 motion to dismiss of SNW, the QTS member defendants, and Montero is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that QTS's #12 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/26/2023. (clc)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, Petition for Concursus by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little.(Kutcher, Robert)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim of the United States by Carl Little.(Kutcher, Robert)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Quality Title Services, LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(clc)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/18/2023. (clc)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC, Clayton White re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (am)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/17/2023. (am)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Quality Title Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum, #2 Proposed Pleading Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Gauthier, Camille)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12 (B)(6), Rec. Doc. 10 by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC, Clayton White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)Attorney Jacques Francois Bezou added to party Clayton White(pty:dft).(Bezou, Jacques) Modified text on 10/17/2023 (am). Modified on 10/17/2023 (am).
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, QTS state-court petition for concursus, CROSSCLAIM against Carl Little, Carl Little by United States of America.(Mansfield, Peter)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little . (Kutcher, Robert) Modified on 10/13/2023 (am).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Strike Any Reference to Keith T. Naccari. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/11/2023. (am)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kutcher, Robert)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Carl Little Law, LLC, Carl Little re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kutcher, Robert)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Strike Any Reference to Keith T. Naccari by Keith Nacarri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bezou, Jacques)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney did not select party for party served. Party served was Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC on 09/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. No further action is necessary.** (am)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Kutcher, Robert) Modified on 10/6/2023 (am).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion #17 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/04/2023.(am)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to transfer interpleader funds from state court. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/04/2023.(CC:Clerk of Court for the Civil District Court, Orleans Parish) (am)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #6 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC, Clayton White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party Clayton White(pty:dft).(Bezou, Jacques)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to transfer interpleader funds from state court by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mansfield, Peter)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 Notice of Compliance. **Document marked as filed in error, see rec. doc. 14 for corrected filing.** (am)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Compliance by United States of America re #2 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings (Service of Process))(Mansfield, Peter)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC. 14**Notice of Compliance by United States of America re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings (Service of Process))(Mansfield, Peter) Modified on 9/29/2023 (am).
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Quality Title Services, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Camille E. Gauthier added to party Quality Title Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Gauthier, Camille)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Keith Nacarri, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Marriott, M. Suzanne Montero, Keith Nacarri, Scott Sternberg, Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party Joseph Marriott(pty:dft), Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party M. Suzanne Montero(pty:dft), Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party Scott Sternberg(pty:dft), Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC(pty:dft).(Bezou, Jacques)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kutcher, Robert)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Kutcher, Robert)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Dismiss. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Strike , MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Nacarri. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Jacques F. Bezou, Jr added to party Keith Nacarri(pty:dft).(Bezou, Jacques) Modified text/removed referral on 9/27/2023 (am).
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe.(am)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Related Case(s) by United States of America of related case(s) #18-9599. (Mansfield, Peter)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-6043 (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mansfield, Peter)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **FILED IN ERROR SEE REC. DOC. 2**NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-6043 (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Peter M. Mansfield added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Mansfield, Peter) Modified on 9/21/2023 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little et al v. Quality Title Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Little Law, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Represented By: Nicole S. Tygier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Carl Little
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Represented By: Nicole S. Tygier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Title Services, LLC
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Alixe L. Duplechain
Represented By: Harold J. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sternberg, Naccari & White, LLC
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sternberg
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton White
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Marriott
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Nacarri
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Jacques Francois Bezou
Represented By: Jacques F. Bezou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: United States of America
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?