Stanton Square LLC v. City of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: STANTON SQUARE, LLC and Stanton Square LLC
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW ORLEANS, THE NEW ORLEANS CITY COUNCIL, FREDDIE KING, New Orleans City, New Orleans City Council and Freddie King, III
Case Number: 2:2023cv05733
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl J Barbier
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
3 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 12/28/2023 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice.(mmv)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #15 Motion to Continue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Submission Date for the Motion to Dismiss (R. Doc. 14) be CONTINUED to January 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/21/2023. (ctc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date re rec. doc. 14 by Stanton Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilty, Reagan) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (mmv).
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Freddie King, III, New Orleans City, New Orleans City Council. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney James Michael Roquemore added to party Freddie King, III(pty:dft), Attorney James Michael Roquemore added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft), Attorney James Michael Roquemore added to party New Orleans City Council(pty:dft).(Roquemore, James) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (mmv). Responses due by 12/4/2023 (mmv).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Freddie King, III answer due 11/17/2023; New Orleans City answer due 11/17/2023; New Orleans City Council answer due 11/17/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants shall have until November 17, 2023 to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/26/2023. (ctc)
October 25, 2023 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Freddie King, III, New Orleans City, New Orleans City Council. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Shawn Lindsay added to party Freddie King, III(pty:dft), Attorney Shawn Lindsay added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft), Attorney Shawn Lindsay added to party New Orleans City Council(pty:dft).(Lindsay, Shawn)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #9 , #10 Motions are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that David DePriest and Yiyang Wu be granted pro hac vice admission and be permitted to appear as additional counsel of record for all purposes on behalf of Plaintiff Stanton Square, LLC in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys Admitted PHV) (mmv)
October 13, 2023 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yiyang Wu (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10217075) by Stanton Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Declaration, #4 Consent to EFiling Privileges)(Wilty, Reagan)
October 13, 2023 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David DePriest (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10217029) by Stanton Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Declaration, #4 Consent to EFiling Privileges)(Wilty, Reagan)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Smith, Randall)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City Council served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Smith, Randall)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Freddie King, III served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Smith, Randall)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/5/2023.(lb)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Carl J Barbier recused. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier. (NEF: Sections J, D)(gec)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Freddie King, III, New Orleans City, New Orleans City Council. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(gec)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10190654) filed by Stanton Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons The City of New Orleans, #3 Summons City Council, #4 Summons King)Attorney Randall A. Smith added to party STANTON SQUARE, LLC(pty:pla).(Smith, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton Square LLC v. City of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANTON SQUARE, LLC
Represented By: Randall A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanton Square LLC
Represented By: Randall A. Smith
Represented By: David DePriest
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Represented By: Yiyang Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW ORLEANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW ORLEANS CITY COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDDIE KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Shawn Lindsay
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: James Michael Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City Council
Represented By: Shawn Lindsay
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: James Michael Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie King, III
Represented By: Shawn Lindsay
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: James Michael Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?