Chubb Capital I Limited et al v. New Orleans City
Plaintiff: Chubb Capital I Limited, Brit UW Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, AIG Europe Limited, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, XL Reinsurance America Inc, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, Temple Insurance Company, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada and RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited
Defendant: New Orleans City
3Rd Party Defendant: Leo A Daly Company, Atkins North America, Inc. and Crescent City Aviation Team
Case Number: 2:2023cv05806
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Chubb Capital I Limited, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital (UK) Limited, Brit UW Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, AIG Europe Limited, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited; Arch Insurance Canada Ltd.; XL Reinsurance America Inc.; Everest Insurance Company of Canada; Temple Insurance Company; and Aviva Insurance Company of Canada are GRANTED and extension of time through January 3, 2024 to respond to the counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/5/2023. (sa)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Atkins North America, Inc., Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Crescent City Aviation Team, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, Leo A Daly Company, New Orleans City, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lund, Daniel)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Reply Brief. The reply brief deadline for Plaintiffs for their pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction is January 3, 2024. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs be granted leave to file a reply brief without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/27/2023. (jls)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Atkins North America, Inc., Crescent City Aviation Team, Leo A Daly Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mmv)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Leo A Daly Company, Atkins North America, Inc., Crescent City Aviation Team, COUNTERCLAIM against AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc by New Orleans City.(Garner, James) Modified text on 11/24/2023 (mmv).
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines Reply Brief on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lund, Daniel)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Supplement Record. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and Exhibit C-1 will be attached to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/15/2023. (sa)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION to Continue Submission Date and To Continue Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that NOAB's Motion is GRANTED and that the submission date on #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is CONTINUED to January 3, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Oral Argument as to #3 Preliminary Injunction presently set for November 29, 2023, is CONTINUED to February 8, 2024, at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/14/2023.(sa)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Supplement Record by AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-1, #2 Proposed Order)(Lund, Daniel)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Sophie Rae Trosclair for New Orleans City (NOAB). Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/14/2023. (sa)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Sophie Trosclair, additional Counsel of Record by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified on 11/14/2023 (am).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date and To Continue Oral Argument Date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction To Enjoin Arbitration by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to New Orleans City. Answer due date EXTENDED through November 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/2/2023. (sa)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief. **Attorney(s) listed on pleading has not been enrolled in this case. If attorney, Sophie Trosclair, intends to be co-counsel of record, a motion to enroll should be filed. Signature block should only reflect attorneys that have made appearances. Any future filings which list attorneys not enrolled in this case will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (am)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James M. Garner added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Garner, James)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William J Tinsley, Jr. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice William Tinsley $100 fee paid Receipt# ALAEDC-10233968 by AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Consent to Electronic File, #3 Appendix Declaration of Tinsley, #4 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Lund, Daniel) Modified text on 10/24/2023 (am).
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion #3 is SET for Wednesday, November 29, 2023, at 10:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/17/2023.(am)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #6 is GRANTED and that the submission date for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is CONTINUED from October 25, 2023, to November 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/17/2023.(am)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lund, Daniel)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (Lund, Daniel)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (am)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin Arbitration by AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Chubb Capital I Limited, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital (UK) Limited, Scor Global P&C SE, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Temple Insurance Company, XL Reinsurance America Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Lund, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2023: #8 Exhibit C-1) (sa).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Orleans Aviation Board (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10198255) filed by Scor Global P&C SE, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, Brit UW Limited, AIG Europe Limited, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd, Temple Insurance Company, RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital (UK) Limited, Starr Underwriting Agents Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Chubb Capital I Limited, XL Reinsurance America Inc, Aviva Insurance Company of Canada, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party AIG Europe Limited(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Arch Insurance Canada Ltd(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Aviva Insurance Company of Canada(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Brit UW Limited(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Chubb Capital I Limited(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Everest Insurance Company of Canada(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital (UK) Limited(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Scor Global P&C SE(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Starr Underwriting Agents Limited(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Swiss Re International SE(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party Temple Insurance Company(pty:selreq), Attorney Daniel Lund, III added to party XL Reinsurance America Inc(pty:selreq).(Lund, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chubb Capital I Limited et al v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Capital I Limited
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brit UW Limited
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiss Re International SE
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scor Global P&C SE
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Europe Limited
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Underwriting Agents Limited
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Canada Ltd
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Reinsurance America Inc
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest Insurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temple Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Insurance Company of Canada
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RenaissanceRe Corporate Capital UK Limited
Represented By: Kevin W. Welsh
Represented By: Daniel Lund, III
Represented By: William J Tinsley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Amanda Russo Schenck
Represented By: Sophie Rae Trosclair
Represented By: Martha Y. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Leo A Daly Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Atkins North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Crescent City Aviation Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?