Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality v. Tidewater Landfill LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Defendant: Tidewater Landfill LLC, Environmental Operators, LLC, Louisiana Fruit Company, USI Gulf Coast Inc, Gray Insurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Ironshore Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana, LLC, Unidentified Party and AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Paul Guidry, Kevin Guidry, Industrial Management Group, L.L.C., AGPG LLC, Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana, Gulf Coast Water & Beverage LLC, Industrial Services Group LLC, Personnel Providers LLC, Diesel Maintenance LLC and Pintail Equipment Rental LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv06183
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Filing 18 Reply Brief in Support of #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Gray Insurance Company, Ironshore Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company . (pp)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of (doc. 5) Joint Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/6/2023. (pp)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of (doc. 5) Joint Motion to Remand by AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Gray Insurance Company, Ironshore Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed pleading)(Durbin, Tabitha) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (pp).
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Environmental Operators, LLC, Tidewater Landfill LLC re #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Madigan, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR- SEE REC. DOC. 15**RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Environmental Operators, LLC, Tidewater Landfill LLC re #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Madigan, Thomas) Modified on 11/29/2023 (pp).
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AGPG LLC, Diesel Maintenance LLC, Kevin Guidry, Paul Guidry, Gulf Coast Water & Beverage LLC, Industrial Management Group, L.L.C., Industrial Services Group LLC, Personnel Providers LLC, Pintail Equipment Rental LLC, Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana, LLC re #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Landis, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Fruit Company re #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Claims 1-1, 2-1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Land Agreement)(Hurley, Grady)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality re #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Landry, Shane)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Affidavit. (1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Certificate of Service. Clerk took corrective action. (2) Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section B, Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (js) Modified on 11/22/2023 (js).
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT** AFFIDAVIT of Greta M Brouphy re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Brouphy, Greta) Modified on 11/22/2023 (js).
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Service re #7 Notice (Other) (Brouphy, Greta) Modified text on 11/22/2023 (js).
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance Parties Remaining in the Action re #1 Notice of Removal by AGPG LLC, Diesel Maintenance LLC, Kevin Guidry, Paul Guidry, Gulf Coast Water & Beverage LLC, Industrial Management Group, L.L.C., Industrial Services Group LLC, Personnel Providers LLC, Pintail Equipment Rental LLC, Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana, LLC . (Brouphy, Greta) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (pp).
November 14, 2023 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court.**Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (pp)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Gray Insurance Company, Ironshore Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company.Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Ironshore Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) Modified text on 11/14/2023 (pp).
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Darrel James Papillion recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 10/30/2023. (NEF: Section B)(ko)
October 26, 2023 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal (rt)
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District Court, case number 64848 A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-10217524) filed by Gulf Coast Water & Beverage LLC, Industrial Management Group, L.L.C., Industrial Services Group LLC, Diesel Maintenance LLC, Kevin Guidry, Personnel Providers LLC, AGPG LLC, Paul Guidry, Pintail Equipment Rental LLC, Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B)Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party AGPG LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Diesel Maintenance LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Kevin Guidry(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Paul Guidry(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Gulf Coast Water & Beverage LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Industrial Management Group, L.L.C.(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Industrial Services Group LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Personnel Providers LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Pintail Equipment Rental LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Douglas Scott Draper added to party Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana(pty:selreq).(Draper, Douglas) Modified text on 10/26/2023 (rt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality v. Tidewater Landfill LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Paul Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kevin Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Industrial Management Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AGPG LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gulf Coast Water & Beverage LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Industrial Services Group LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Personnel Providers LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Diesel Maintenance LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Pintail Equipment Rental LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By: Oscar Lyle Magee
Represented By: Jill Carter Clark
Represented By: Rodney S. Barnes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Landfill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Operators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Fruit Company
Represented By: Grady S. Hurley
Represented By: Sara Barry Kuebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USI Gulf Coast Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Insurance Company
Represented By: Karl Howard Schmid
Represented By: Travis Louis Bourgeois
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Insurance Company
Represented By: Tabitha Robertson Durbin
Represented By: Jennifer E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Angelica Petrovna Dubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Disposal Services of South Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Scott Draper
Represented By: Greta Manning Brouphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert I. Siegel
Represented By: Alistair Ward
Represented By: Stefanie N. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?