Gable et al v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Kunta Gable and Sidney Hill
Defendant: New Orleans City, Len Davis, Sammie Williams, Wayne Tamborella, Dwight Deal, Anthony Small, David Benelli, Mitchell Dussett, Jeff Mocklin, Ken Harris, Unknown Insurance Company, Jason Rogers Williams, Ross J.J. Mocklin, Kenneth Harris and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv06203
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Darrel James Papillion
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that Member Case 23-6203 is consolidated with Master Case 23-3111. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case, together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation, and a specific notation as to which case the document applies. All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies. (Ref: 23-3111, 23-6203). Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/20/2023.(mmm)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jed W. Glickstein. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nabihah Maqbool. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Aaron Schmutzer. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Grady. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
October 20, 2023 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nabihah Maqbool). Document 11 does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section A and Magistrate (2) Currault. #12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jed Glickstein. Document 12 contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section A. (mmm)
October 20, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jason Rogers Williams. (mmm)
October 20, 2023 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Submitted for Issuance. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mmm)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Judge Darrel James Papillion no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 10/18/2023. (NEF: Section A)(ko)
October 19, 2023 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jed Glickstein (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10228504) by Kunta Gable, Sidney Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Under Oath, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
October 19, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nabihah Maqbool (Fee previously paid) by Kunta Gable, Sidney Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Under Oath, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Adcock, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/20/2023) (mmm).
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to David Benelli, Len Davis, Dwight Deal, Mitchell Dussett, Kenneth Harris, Ross J.J. Mocklin, New Orleans City, Anthony Small, Wayne Tamborella, Sammie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(ko)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #7 Summons Submitted for Issuance: 1. Filing attorney did not properly format PDF of Summons. When the document was opened, the PDF was able to be edited. When using a form, print the document to PDF format prior to uploading. Clerk took corrective action by replacing image with one that cannot be edited. 2. Summons not issued to "Jason Rogers" and Unidentified Insurance Companies. Summons may only be issued to named defendants. (ko)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons for D. Benelli, #2 Summons for D. Deal, #3 Summons for DA Official Capacity, #4 Summons for K. Harris, #5 Summons for L. Davis, #6 Summons for M. Dussett, #7 Summons for R. Mocklin, #8 Summons for S. Williams, #9 Summons for Unknown Insurance Comp., #10 Summons for W. Tamborella)(Adcock, John) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 6 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 7 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 8 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko). (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko).
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Adcock, John) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/18/2023) (ko).
October 17, 2023 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10221584) by Kunta Gable, Sidney Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration Under Oath, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John) Modified on 10/18/2023 (ko).
October 17, 2023 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10221578) by Kunta Gable, Sidney Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Adcock, John)
October 16, 2023 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sarah Grady (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10219867) by Kunta Gable, Sidney Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Grady Declaration, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)Attorney John Nelson Adcock added to party Sidney Hill(pty:pla).(Adcock, John) Modified text on 10/18/2023 (cwa).
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
October 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10219199) filed by Kunta Gable, Sidney Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Nelson Adcock added to party Kunta Gable(pty:pla).(Adcock, John) Modified on 10/17/2023 (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gable et al v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kunta Gable
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: John N. Adcock
Represented By: David Aaron Schmutzer
Represented By: Jed W. Glickstein
Represented By: Nabihah Maqbool
Represented By: Sarah Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Hill
Represented By: John Nelson Adcock
Represented By: John N. Adcock
Represented By: David Aaron Schmutzer
Represented By: Jed W. Glickstein
Represented By: Nabihah Maqbool
Represented By: Sarah Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Len Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Tamborella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Benelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Dussett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Mocklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rogers Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross J.J. Mocklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?