LeBoeuf et al v. Entergy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ellen Martinez LeBoeuf, Merol Martinez Wells, Andre J Martinez, Estate of Alvin Martinez and Kara Maria Bachman
Defendant: Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee and T. Rowe Price Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv06257
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, pursuant to LR 83.2.5. Daniel L. Buchholz of Holland & Knight LLP is ADMITTED to appear before this Honorable Court pro hac vice in the above-captioned case for defendants Entergy Corporation and Entergy Corporations Employee Benefits Committee. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (pp)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, pursuant to LR 83.2.5. Lindsey Camp of Holland & Knight LLP is ADMITTED to appear before this Honorable Court pro hac vice in the above-captioned case for defendants Entergy Corporation and Entergy Corporations Employee Benefits Committee. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (pp)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel L. Buchholz (Fee previously paid) by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Chynna)
December 12, 2023 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey Camp (Fee previously paid) by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Chynna)
December 7, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2024 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at 1-888-278-0296, Access Code: 6243426. Issued by Clerk. (dw)
December 4, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by T. Rowe Price Trust Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Eichberger, Nicole) Modified text on 12/5/2023 (pp).
December 4, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Notice of Submission)(Phillips, Darryl)
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 DEFICIENT ***** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel L. Buchholz (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10299939) by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Chynna) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (cs).
December 1, 2023 Filing 19 DEFICIENT ***** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lindsey Camp (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10299866) by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Chynna) Modified text on 12/4/2023 (cs).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Enroll as Addiitonal Counsel of Record. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tulio D. Chirinos of Proskauer Rose LLP is ENROLLED as additional counsel of record for Defendant Tulio D. Chirinos in the above- captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/9/2023. (pp)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, Defendant T. Rowe Price Trust Company are granted a twenty-one (21) day extension of time to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint in the above-captioned matter, and shall file such pleadings no later than Monday, December 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/9/2023. (pp)
November 8, 2023 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Corporation (Phillips, Darryl)
November 7, 2023 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Tulio D. Chirinos by T. Rowe Price Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eichberger, Nicole)
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by T. Rowe Price Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for T. Rowe Price Trust Company (Eichberger, Nicole)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint by T. Rowe Price Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Nicole Ann Eichberger added to party T. Rowe Price Trust Company(pty:dft).(Eichberger, Nicole) Modified link/text on 11/8/2023 (pp).
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, Defendants Entergy Corporation and Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits are granted a twenty-one (21) day extension of time to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint in the above-captioned matter, and shall file such pleadings no later than Monday, December 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/2/2023. (pp)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Chynna) Modified link/text on 11/1/2023 (pp).
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 **FILED IN ERROR- SEE REC. DOC. 11** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. Attorney Chynna Marie Anderson added to party Entergy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Chynna Marie Anderson added to party Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee(pty:dft).(Anderson, Chynna) Modified on 11/1/2023 (pp). Modified on 11/7/2023 (pp).
October 26, 2023 Filing 9 *DEFICIENT* NOTICE of Appearance by Chynna Marie Anderson on behalf of Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. Attorney Chynna Marie Anderson added to party Entergy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Chynna Marie Anderson added to party Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee(pty:dft).(Anderson, Chynna) Modified on 10/27/2023 (cg).
October 26, 2023 Filing 8 *DEFICIENT* NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl M. Phillips on behalf of Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee. Attorney Darryl M. Phillips added to party Entergy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Darryl M. Phillips added to party Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee(pty:dft).(Phillips, Darryl) Modified on 10/27/2023 (cg).
October 26, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Walker, John)
October 26, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Entergy Corporation served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Walker, John)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; T. Rowe Price Trust Company served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Walker, John)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Entergy Corporation, Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee, T. Rowe Price Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee previously paid) filed by Merol Martinez Wells, Andre J Martinez, Kara Maria Bachman, Ellen Martinez LeBoeuf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Entergy Corporation, #3 Summons Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee, #4 Summons T. Rowe Price Trust Company)(Walker, John) Modified text/filers on 10/18/2023 (js).
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 **DUPLICATE FILING: SEE R. DOC. #2 ** COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10222866) filed by Ellen Martinez LeBoeuf, Merol Martinez Wells, Andre J Martinez, Estate of Alvin Martinez, Kara Maria Bachman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Entergy Corporation, #3 Summons Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee, #4 Summons T. Rowe Price Trust Company)Attorney John R. Walker added to party Ellen Martinez LeBoeuf(pty:pla), Attorney John R. Walker added to party Estate of Alvin Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney John R. Walker added to party Kara Maria Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney John R. Walker added to party Merol Martinez Wells(pty:pla), Attorney John R. Walker added to party Andre J Martinez(pty:pla).(Walker, John) Modified on 10/18/2023 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBoeuf et al v. Entergy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Martinez LeBoeuf
Represented By: John R. Walker
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merol Martinez Wells
Represented By: John R. Walker
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre J Martinez
Represented By: John R. Walker
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Alvin Martinez
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Maria Bachman
Represented By: John R. Walker
Represented By: Andrew Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Chynna Marie Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buchholz
Represented By: Lindsey Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation Employee Benefits Committee
Represented By: Darryl M. Phillips
Represented By: Chynna Marie Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Buchholz
Represented By: Lindsey Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Trust Company
Represented By: Nicole Ann Eichberger
Represented By: Tulio D. Chirinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?