Clark v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Torriana Clark
Defendant: Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana, Lance Wallace and Travis Day
Case Number: 2:2023cv06293
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2023 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/20/2023.(ko)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF 636(c) NON CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The undersigned Magistrate Judge has been notified that all parties have not consented to proceed to trial before a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The matter is hereby returned to the docket of the District Judge for the scheduling of a preliminary conference and the selection of discovery cut-off, pre-trial conference, and trial dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 11/13/2023.(lb)(NEF Sec I)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice of Compliance. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' OR by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 6 to document 2. (rt)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by All Defendants re #2 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rouse, Christopher) Modified text/link on 11/9/2023 (rt).
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Travis Day, Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana, Lance Wallace.(Rouse, Christopher)
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal filed by Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana, Lance Wallace, Travis Day.(js)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd District Court for the Parish of Washington, case number 116878 (Fee previously paid) filed by Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana, Travis Day, Lance Wallace. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rouse, Christopher)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 **DUPLICATE FILING: SEE R. DOC. #2 ** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd District Court for the Parish of Washington, case number 116878 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10224681) filed by Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana, Travis Day, Lance Wallace. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher J. Rouse added to party Travis Day(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Rouse added to party Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Rouse added to party Lance Wallace(pty:dft).(Rouse, Christopher) Modified on 10/25/2023 (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torriana Clark
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety and Corrections State of Louisiana
Represented By: Christopher J. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Wallace
Represented By: Christopher J. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Day
Represented By: Christopher J. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?