Cook v. Bickham et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell P. Cook
Defendant: Dustin Bickham
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2023cv06460
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #4 Habeas Corpus Response Order, as to Dustin Bickham answer due 1/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 12/15/2023. (lb)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #4 Habeas Corpus Response Order, by Dustin Bickham. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew Caplan added to party Dustin Bickham(pty:dft).(Caplan, Matthew)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on St. Tammany Parish Clerk of Court on 11/17/2023(cs)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service of Habeas Corpus Response Order served on St. Tammany Parish District Attorney's Office (cs)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for St. Tammany Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 11/14/2023. (rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2023: #1 Certified Mail Receipts: Attorney General, Clerk of Court, District Attorney) (rt).
November 14, 2023 Filing fee paid from Mitchell P. Cook re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt 200004198). (ss)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt No. 200004198) filed by Mitchell P. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Original Deficient Filling, #4 Exhibits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss) Images QC'd on 12/11/2023 (aj).
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 11/14/2023. (ss)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed filed by Mitchell P. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Bickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell P. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Bickham
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?