Jackson v. Hammond City et al
Plaintiff: Lionell Jackson
Defendant: Craig Dunn, City of Hammond and Hammond City
Case Number: 2:2023cv06467
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Craig Dunn.(Cutaiar, Trevor)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Mark Emerson Hanna, Trevor Cutaiar, Dominic John Carmello for Craig Dunn. Attorney Andre Gerard Coudrain and Brittany L. Schroder-Michael terminated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/15/2023. (lag)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark E. Hanna, Trevor M. Cutaiar, Dominic J. Carmello to be substituted in place of Andre G. Coudrain and Brittany L.S. Michael by Craig Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Trevor Matthew Cutaiar added to party Craig Dunn(pty:dft).(Cutaiar, Trevor) Modified text on 12/7/2023 (js).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's #11 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Plead be hereby GRANTED, and that Defendant Craig Dunn shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days or until and through December 15, 2023 in which to respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/29/2023. (js)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hammond City. Attorney Andre Gerard Coudrain added to party Hammond City(pty:dft).(Coudrain, Andre) Modified text on 11/28/2023 (js).
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Craig Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Andre Gerard Coudrain added to party Craig Dunn(pty:dft).(Coudrain, Andre) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (js).
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hammond City served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Washington, Daryl)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Craig Dunn served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Washington, Daryl)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daryl K Washington. IT IS ORDERED that Daryl K. Washington be and is hereby admitted to the bar of this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lionell Jackson in the above described action. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (js)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. (1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk took corrective action. (2) Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (js)
October 26, 2023 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daryl K. Washington by Lionell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Willis, Kenneth) Modified text/event on 10/27/2023 (js).
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10237284) by Lionell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Willis, Kenneth) Modified on 10/25/2023 (js).
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Craig Dunn, Hammond City. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js)
October 24, 2023 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet or the Summons. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (js)
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10234730) filed by Lionell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Kenneth M. Willis added to party Lionell Jackson(pty:pla).(Willis, Kenneth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/24/2023) (js). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/24/2023) (js). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/24/2023) (js).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Hammond City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionell Jackson
Represented By: Kenneth M. Willis
Represented By: Daryl K Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Dunn
Represented By: Mark Emerson Hanna
Represented By: Andre Gerard Coudrain
Represented By: Brittany L. Schroder-Michael
Represented By: Dominic John Carmello
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Cutaiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammond City
Represented By: Andre Gerard Coudrain
Represented By: Brittany L. Schroder-Michael
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Coudrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?