Magee et al v. Lopinto et al
Plaintiff: Mechelle Magee, Ashton Reid and Shilar Reid
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III, jeremy budo, Randy Picarella, Philip Blitch, Cody Foret, Brittany Flowers, Oscar Pacheco, Modica Elvin, Joseph Lopinto and Elvin Modica
Case Number: 2:2023cv06709
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 16 to document 1. (cs)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Philip Blitch, Jeremy Budo, Brittany Flowers, Cody Foret, Joseph Lopinto, Elvin Modica, Oscar Pacheco, Randy Picarella.(Martiny, Daniel) Modified link/text on 12/19/2023 (cs).
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Joseph Lopinto must file his responsive pleading by December 20, 2023. All other defendants must file their responsive pleadings by December 26, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/29/2023. (cs)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Philip Blitch, Jeremy Budo, Brittany Flowers, Cody Foret, Joseph Lopinto, Elvin Modica, Oscar Pacheco, Randy Picarella. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Philip Blitch(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Jeremy Budo(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Brittany Flowers(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Cody Foret(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Joseph Lopinto(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Elvin Modica(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Oscar Pacheco(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Randy Picarella(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel) Modified text on 11/28/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Randy Picarella served 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023 (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Oscar Pacheco served 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Elvin Modica served 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023 (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cody Foret served 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Brittany Flowers served 11/13/2023, 12/4/2023. (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jeremy Budo served 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Philip Blitch served on 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/17/2023 (cs).
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Joseph Lopinto served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Richthofen, Richard) Modified on 11/17/2023 (lag).
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 DEFICIENT ---- AFFIDAVIT of Service by JENNY HUGHEY of SUMMONS served on JOSEPH LOPINTO, ELVIN MODICA, OSCAR PACHECO, RANDY PICARELLA, CODY FORET, BRITTANY FLOWERS, PHILIP BLITCH, JEREMY BUDO on 11/08/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #3 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #4 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #5 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #6 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #7 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE)(Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/16/2023 (cs).
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Philip Blitch, Jeremy Budo, Brittany Flowers, Cody Foret, Joseph Lopinto, Elvin Modica, Oscar Pacheco, Randy Picarella. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(js)
November 8, 2023 Summons Issued as to Philip Blitch, Jeremy Budo, Brittany Flowers, Cody Foret, Joseph Lopinto, Elvin Modica, Oscar Pacheco, Randy Picarella. (js)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Subpoena, #3 Subpoena, #4 Subpoena, #5 Subpoena, #6 Subpoena, #7 Subpoena, #8 Subpoena)(Richthofen, Richard)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ALAEDC-10258416) filed by Shilar Reid, Mechelle Magee, Ashton Reid. Attorney Richard J. Richthofen, Jr added to party Mechelle Magee(pty:pla), Attorney Richard J. Richthofen, Jr added to party Ashton Reid(pty:pla), Attorney Richard J. Richthofen, Jr added to party Shilar Reid(pty:pla).(Richthofen, Richard) Modified text on 11/7/2023 (js).
November 6, 2023 Filing fee received from RICHARD J. RICHTHOFTEN : Receipt 4087 $ 402 (cc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee et al v. Lopinto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechelle Magee
Represented By: Richard J. Richthofen, Jr.
Represented By: George Richard Ketry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Reid
Represented By: Richard J. Richthofen, Jr.
Represented By: George Richard Ketry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shilar Reid
Represented By: Richard J. Richthofen, Jr.
Represented By: George Richard Ketry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jeremy budo
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Picarella
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Blitch
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Foret
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Flowers
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Pacheco
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modica Elvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lopinto
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvin Modica
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Represented By: James Bryan Mullaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?