Flanks v. City of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Flanks
Defendant: City of New Orleans, Jason Williams, Anne Kirkpatrick, John Dillmann and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv06897
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2023. (my)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew J. Paul added to party Jason Williams(pty:dft).(Paul, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; John Dillmann served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (Davis, Eleanor)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jason Williams served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (Davis, Eleanor)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; City of New Orleans served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Davis, Eleanor)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eleanor Davis. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 22, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Deborah Ingrid Francois. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 22, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Bradley Shanies. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 22, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eleanor C. Davis (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10284882) by Raymond Flanks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Eleanor C. Davis, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (mp).
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Deborah I. Francois (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10284763) by Raymond Flanks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Deborah I. Francois, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent to E-Filing, #4 (Proposed Order))(Murell, Christopher) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (mp).
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Shanies (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10284525) by Raymond Flanks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David B. Shanies, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent to E-Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Murell, Christopher) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (mp).
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of New Orleans, John Dillmann, Anne Kirkpatrick, Jason Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mp)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of New Orleans, John Dillmann, John/Jane Does #1-20, Anne Kirkpatrick, Jason Williams (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10276560) filed by Raymond Flanks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Professor Laurie L. Levenson, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Raymond Flanks(pty:pla).(Murell, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flanks v. City of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Flanks
Represented By: Christopher James Murell
Represented By: Meghan K. Matt
Represented By: David Bradley Shanies
Represented By: Deborah Ingrid Francois
Represented By: Eleanor Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Williams
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dillmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?