Wagner v. McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, et al
Plaintiff: Meco Wagner
Defendant: McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, ABC Insurance Company, Unidentified Party and Krause and Kinsman Trial Lawyers, LLP
Case Number: 2:2023cv06901
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC. (mmv)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is SUMMONS SUBMITTED FOR ISSUANCE. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (mmv)
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 Summons Submitted for Issuance as to McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC filed by Meco Wagner re #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint. (Chopin, Richard) Modified text/event on 1/4/2024 (mmv).
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wendy B Vitter: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/11/2023. During the conference, the Court discussed the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and whether the Court could exercise diversity jurisdiction in this matter. The Court will determine jurisdiction once the Defendants have made an appearance in this matter. (mmv)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **FILED IN WRONG CASE** TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Due to a scheduling conflict, the Telephone Status Conference scheduled December 14, 2023 is hereby RESCHEDULED to December 13, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. The dial information will remain the same. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(mf) Modified to show that this text order was docketed in the wrong case on 12/7/2023 (mmv).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Due to a scheduling conflict with the Courts calendar, the Telephone Status Conference scheduled on December 8, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby CONTINUED to begin at 1:00 p.m. The dial information will remain the same. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(mf)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Conference be held in this matter on Friday, December 8, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Dial-in information will be sent to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(ctc)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Krause and Kinsman Trial Lawyers, LLP. (mmv)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Before Answer against All Defendants filed by Meco Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Chopin, Richard)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Declaration. **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mmv)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Amended Complaint. **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mmv)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Meco Wagner of Citizenship (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chopin, Richard) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (mmv).
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed pursuant to Order, rec. doc. 4 against All Defendants filed by Meco Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chopin, Richard) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (mmv).
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Meco Wagner shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order to refile a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) and to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, properly setting forth the citizenship particulars of all of the parties as required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). The comprehensive amended pleading shall include all of Plaintiff's numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, which will become the operative Complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/17/2023.(mmv)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC. (mmv)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-10276742) filed by Meco Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard A Chopin added to party Meco Wagner(pty:pla).(Chopin, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meco Wagner
Represented By: Richard A Chopin
Represented By: Adam P. Sanderson
Represented By: Justin McCarthy Chopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krause and Kinsman Trial Lawyers, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?