Nixion v. Progressive Max Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Henry Nixion
Defendant: Progressive Max Insurance Company, Parker John Bates, Unidentified Parties and Transguard Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv07034
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2024 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Transguard Insurance Company of America, Inc.(in its capacity as the alleged Uninsured Motorist Insurer of Henry Nixion).(Roberts, Milton)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Charles V. Giordano, Michael E. Escudier, Michael D. Cangelosi, Jairo F. Sanchez, Dianna Duffy Willem, Ryan D. Kelley, Brian T. Hill, Travis J. Breslin, and Sarah E. Skidmore enrolled. Attorney Kieron Oliver; Ryan E. Bergeron and Darrin L. Forte terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2023. (my)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles V. Giordano, Michael E. Escudier, Michael D. Cangelosi, Jairo F. Sanchez, Dianna Duffy Willem, Ryan D. Kelley, Brian T. Hill, Travis J. Breslin, and Sarah E. Skidmore to be substituted in place of Darrin L. Forte, Ryan E. Bergeron, and Kieron L. Oliver by Progressive Max Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kieron Oliver added to party Progressive Max Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Oliver, Kieron)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Request by Progressive Max Insurance Company for Notice (Giordano, Charles)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Progressive Max Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Progressive Max Insurance Company.Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party Progressive Max Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Parker John Bates.(Oliver, Kieron)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance by Progressive Max Insurance Company re #2 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Errata Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B)(Oliver, Kieron) Modified link on 12/18/2023 (mp).
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transguard Insurance Company of America, Inc..Attorney Mia Jacque Lewis added to party Transguard Insurance Company of America, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lewis, Mia)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint as to Parker John Bates, Progressive Max Insurance Company. Defendants are granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 30, 2023. (mp)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Progressive Max Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oliver, Kieron)
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Parker John Bates, Progressive Max Insurance Company. (cs)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, case number 20230003916 (Fee previously paid) filed by Parker John Bates, Progressive Max Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Oliver, Kieron) Modified text on 11/24/2023 (cs).
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 DUPLICATE ENTRY SEE DOC 2 ---- NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, case number 20230003916 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10287877) filed by Parker John Bates, Progressive Max Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)Attorney Kieron Oliver added to party Parker John Bates(pty:dft), Attorney Kieron Oliver added to party Progressive Max Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Oliver, Kieron) Modified text on 11/24/2023 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixion v. Progressive Max Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Nixion
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Represented By: Joseph Roy Barbie, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Max Insurance Company
Represented By: Kieron Oliver
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Skidmore
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Brian Thomas Hill
Represented By: Michael D. Cangelosi
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Darrin L. Forte
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Ryan E. Bergeron
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Represented By: Ryan David Kelley
Represented By: Travis John Beslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker John Bates
Represented By: Kieron Oliver
Represented By: Darrin L. Forte
Represented By: Ryan E. Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transguard Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Mia Jacque Lewis
Represented By: Milton Caldwell Roberts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?