Bordelon v. ACE American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ronald Bordelon
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, Chubb European Group Limited and Chubb European Group SE
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2023cv07037
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
3 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (cs)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Ronald Bordelon. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/7/2024. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Pleading, #7 Notice of Submission)(Piacun, Joseph) Modified text on 1/17/2024 (cs).
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Ronald Bordelon re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Piacun, Joseph)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chubb European Group SE identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Chubb European Group SE (Piccolo, Frank)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chubb European Group SE. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A , #3 Notice of Submission)(Piccolo, Frank) Modified text on 1/8/2024 (cs).
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DEFICIENT --- MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chubb European Group SE. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Piccolo, Frank) Modified text on 1/4/2024 (cs).
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Frank Anthony Piccolo as lead counsel for Chubb European Group SE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/11/2023. (cs)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 5. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. (cs)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney as lead counsel. Attorney Frank A. Piccolo to be substituted in place of Leah N. Engelhardt by Chubb European Group SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Frank Anthony Piccolo added to party Chubb European Group SE(pty:dft).(Piccolo, Frank) Modified text on 12/11/2023 (cs).
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Compliance by Chubb European Group SE re #1 Notice of Removal. (Engelhardt, Leah) Modified link/text on 12/11/2023 (cs).
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response to Order to Show Cause. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section R Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge (4) Karen Wells Roby. (cs)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ronald Bordelon re #7 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Piacun, Joseph)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff show good cause in writing within 14 days why the action against Chubb should not be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/1/2023.(cs)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/30/2023.(cs)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DIRECTIVE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. By Clerk.(mmv)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/14/2023.(mmv)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) by Chubb European Group SE of related case(s) 23-CV-05777. (Engelhardt, Leah)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 29th JDC, St. Charles Parish, case number 92776 Div. D (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10288111) filed by Chubb European Group SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Chubb European Group SE(pty:dft).(Engelhardt, Leah) Modified text on 11/24/2023 (mmv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bordelon v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Bordelon
Represented By: Joseph S. Piacun
Represented By: Christopher Parnell Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb European Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb European Group SE
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Represented By: Rachel Ann Meese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?