6101 Tullis Drive, LLC v. Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: 6101 Tullis Drive, LLC
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON - SYNDICATE 2357, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON- SYNDICATE 1458 SUBSCRIBING TO BINDING AUTHORITY B604510568622021, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Certain Underwriters Lloyds London
Case Number: 2:2023cv07066
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING #13 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Genevieve K. Jacques (La. Bar No. 27818), of the law firm of Degan, Blanchard & Nash, shall be enrolled as additional counsel of record for Defendants. Attorney John M. Futrell terminated. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/24/24. (fml)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorney Genevieve K. Jacques (#27818) to be substituted in place of John Futrell by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Futrell, John) Modified text on 1/23/2024 (mmv).
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 2/8/2024 01:30 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice. (mmv)
December 26, 2023 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Answer to Complaint. **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mmv)
December 26, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schrempp, Joseph) Modified text on 12/26/2023 (mmv).
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Pursuant to LR 7.8, defendants, Interstate Fire &Casualty Insurance Company, Subscribing to Policy No. VRX-CN-0003034-01; Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Subscribing to Policy No. VUX-CN-0003034-01; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. VNB-CN-0003034-01; and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds and Other Insurers (Subscribing to Binding Authority B604510686220221) Subscribing to Policy VUX-CN-0003034-01, shall have an additional 21 days, or until December 26, 2023, to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/6/23. (fml)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . **1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. **2) Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 2. **3) Filing attorney should have selected Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion 'Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. **4) Filing attorney did not select Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company as filers. Clerk added filers.** (mmv)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schrempp, Joseph) Modified text/filers/event on 12/6/2023 (mmv).
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should thedocument you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 4.** (mmv)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance re #4 Directive pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Certain Underwriters Lloyds London, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Futrell, John) Modified text/added linkage on 11/28/2023 (mmv).
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal. By Clerk.(mmv)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CDC, Orleans Parish, case number 23-11681 Div. A Sect. 16 (Fee previously paid) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters Lloyds London. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court Pleadings)(Futrell, John) Modified text/filers on 11/28/2023 (mmv).
November 28, 2023 Filing fee received from All Defendants :Receipt Receipt: ALAEDC-10291623 $ 402 (cc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 **FILED IN ERROR- SEE CORRECT FILING, REC. DOC. 2** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-11681 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10291623) filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON - SYNDICATE 2357, Independent Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON- SYNDICATE 1458 SUBSCRIBING TO BINDING AUTHORITY B604510568622021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Policy, #3 State Court Pleadings)Attorney John M. Futrell added to party CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON- SYNDICATE 1458 SUBSCRIBING TO BINDING AUTHORITY B604510568622021(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Futrell added to party CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON - SYNDICATE 2357(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Futrell added to party Independent Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Futrell added to party Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Futrell, John) Modified on 11/28/2023 (mmv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 6101 Tullis Drive, LLC v. Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6101 Tullis Drive, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Matthew M. Mize
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Represented By: Genevieve K. Jacques
Represented By: Joseph Francis Schrempp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Represented By: Genevieve K. Jacques
Represented By: Joseph Francis Schrempp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON - SYNDICATE 2357
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON- SYNDICATE 1458 SUBSCRIBING TO BINDING AUTHORITY B604510568622021
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Represented By: Genevieve K. Jacques
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Joseph Francis Schrempp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters Lloyds London
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Represented By: Genevieve K. Jacques
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Joseph Francis Schrempp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?