Profit v. Coleman et al
Plaintiff: Tamika Profit
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc., Generali US Branch, Germanique C Coleman, Harry Brandon and Brandon Harry
Case Number: 2:2023cv07103
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brandon S Long
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties joint motion to reset pending motions to the court's next available submission date is GRANTED. The submission date on (1) Airbnb, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Remainder of the Case Pending Arbitration (R. Doc. #8 ), (2) Airbnb, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (R. Doc. #9 ), and (3) Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (R. Doc. #10 ) is hereby reset to the Court's next available submission date of February 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 01/10/2024.(js)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tamika Profit re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Remainder of the Case Pending Arbitration . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Garbin, Vatroslav)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tamika Profit re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Garbin, Vatroslav)
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Dates for Airbnb, Inc.s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Remainder of the Case Pending Arbitration (R. Doc. 8), Airbnb, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (R. Doc. 9) and, Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 10) by Airbnb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tamika Profit. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Garbin, Vatroslav)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/27/2023.(lag)
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Airbnb, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Pardee, Avery)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Remainder of the Case Pending Arbitration by Airbnb, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Pardee, Avery)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of compliance by Airbnb, Inc. re #3 Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A)(Del Turco, Marisa) Modified on 12/18/2023 (sa).
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Airbnb, Inc. (Anada, Tarak)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Airbnb, Inc. Answer due date EXTENDED through January 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/6/2023. (sa)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Airbnb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Airbnb, Inc. By the Clerk.(am)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-05745 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10295813) filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Attorney Tarak Anada added to party Airbnb, Inc.(pty:dft).(Anada, Tarak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Profit v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamika Profit
Represented By: Vatroslav Jacob Garbin
Represented By: Kelsey Ann St Romain
Represented By: Sean Marc Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Avery Bryce Pardee
Represented By: Marisa Del Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generali US Branch
Represented By: Jay Russell Sever
Represented By: Tucker Tyler Bohren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Germanique C Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Harry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Represented By: Jerry Bryant Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Jonas Peyton Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?