Bryan et al v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deja Bryan and Jarvis Bolton
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC and Walmart
Case Number: 2:2023cv07116
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/17/2024.(clc)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk,, #16 Order on Motion to Remand, Order on Motion for Discovery, #15 Supplemental Memorandum, **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 02/08/2024. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (am)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk,, #16 Order on Motion to Remand, Order on Motion for Discovery, #15 Supplemental Memorandum, ; by Jarvis Bolton, Deja Bryan. Motion(s) will be submitted on 02/08/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Desiah, Travis) Modified text/submission date on 1/2/2024 (am).
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER & REASONS DENYING #7 Motion to Remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #7 motion for expedited discovery is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/26/2023. (pp)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Reply Memorandum in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Expedited Discovery, filed by Jarvis Bolton, Deja Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(pp)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/26/2023. (pp)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Jarvis Bolton, Deja Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit Binding Stipulation, #4 Exhibit Exh 1, #5 Exhibit Exh 2, #6 Exhibit Exh 3, #7 Exhibit Exh 4)(Desiah, Travis)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **DEFICIENT** RESPONSE to Motion filed by Jarvis Bolton, Deja Bryan re #7 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Desiah, Travis) Modified text on 12/21/2023 (clc).
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart Inc. re #7 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Derojas, Isidro)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart Inc..(Derojas, Isidro)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Compliance List of Parties and Pleadings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1448(B) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Derojas, Isidro)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Expedited Discovery, MOTION for Discovery . **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. **2. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 12/28/2023 before Judge Barry W Ashe. No further action is necessary.** (am)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand or in the Alternative, Motion for Expedited Discovery, by Jarvis Bolton, Deja Bryan. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Notice of Submission)(Desiah, Travis) Modified text/removed referral/added submission date on 12/5/2023 (am).
December 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Remand , MOTION for Discovery by Jarvis Bolton, Deja Bryan. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Desiah, Travis) Modified on 12/4/2023 (am).
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart Inc. (lb)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC for Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC (Derojas, Isidro)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Walmart (Derojas, Isidro)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans, case number 2023-11795 A-16 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10296976) filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Service on Walmart, #4 Exhibit C - Service on Wal-Mart Louisiana)Attorney Isidro Rene' Derojas added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Isidro Rene' Derojas added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft).(Derojas, Isidro) Modified text on 12/1/2023 (lb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan et al v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deja Bryan
Represented By: Travis Lavelle Desiah, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis Bolton
Represented By: Travis Lavelle Desiah, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Isidro Rene' Derojas
Represented By: Christopher David James-Lomax
Represented By: Elise Whitney Benezech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Isidro Rene' Derojas
Represented By: Christopher David James-Lomax
Represented By: Elise Whitney Benezech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?