Miles v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Amanda Miles
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: U.S. Attorney Eastern District of Louisiana -SSA
Case Number: 2:2023cv07127
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until February 19, 2024 to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 1/26/2024. (pp)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Social Security Administration. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Elizabeth A. Chickering added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).(Chickering, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Scheduling Order: Within sixty (60) days after the notice of the complaint, the defendant shall file an answer along with the transcript of the administrative proceedings. Within thirty (30) days after the defendant has filed his answer, the plaintiff shall file a BRIEF in support of his or her claims for relief. Within thirty (30) days after the plaintiff's brief is filed, the defendant shall file with the Court a REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 12/1/2023.(lb)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10297995) filed by Amanda Miles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Amanda Miles(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 12/1/2023 (NEF sent to SSA and USA) (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Miles
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Chickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Attorney Eastern District of Louisiana -SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?