Deroche et al v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Geo P. Reintjes, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Goulds Pumps LLC, Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Eagle Packing & Equipment Co., Geo. P. Reintjes Co., Inc., Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Gerald Deroche and Sharon Deroche
Cross Defendant: Eagle, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Estee Lauder Inc. and Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Mosaic Fertilizer LLC and Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company, Avon Products, Inc., Estee Lauder International, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., Kenvue Inc., LTL Management LLC, Redco Corporation, Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Avondale Industries, Inc., Estee Lauder Companies, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Crane Co., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, MW Custom Papers, LLC, LLT Management LLC, Uniroyal, Inc. and Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv07179
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brandon S Long
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #59 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on behalf of Third-Party Defendant, Avon Products, Inc. (Avon) is GRANTED. Third-Party Defendant Avon's deadline to file pleadings responsive to the third-party demands against it is extended to February 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 01/30/2024. (js)
January 30, 2024 Filing 60 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #59 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Notice of Removal, #13 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim. Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section O, Judge Brandon S. Long. (js)
January 29, 2024 Filing 59 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Notice of Removal, #13 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Avon Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Ebony Shadae Morris added to party Avon Products, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 1/30/2024 (js).
January 26, 2024 Filing 58 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Breeden, Autumn) Modified text/filer on 1/29/2024 (js).
January 26, 2024 Filing 57 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #13 Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Autumn Breeden added to party Uniroyal Inc.(pty:3pd).(Breeden, Autumn) Modified text/filer on 1/29/2024 (js).
January 23, 2024 Filing 56 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA), Inc.'s, LLT Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., Johnson & Johnson, LLT Management LLC, Kenvue, Inc. (Sharko, Madison) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (go).
January 23, 2024 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Stay Proceedings by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., Kenvue Inc., LTL Management LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Submission)Attorney Madison A. Sharko added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pty:3pd), Attorney Madison A. Sharko added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:3pd), Attorney Madison A. Sharko added to party Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Madison A. Sharko added to party Kenvue Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Madison A. Sharko added to party LTL Management LLC(pty:3pd).(Sharko, Madison)
January 22, 2024 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Uniroyal Inc. served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Melancon, David)
January 19, 2024 Filing 53 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ameron International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ameron International Corporation, Corporate Parent Grant Prideco, Inc. for Ameron International Corporation (Wilkes, Forrest) Modified text on 1/22/2024 (js).
January 19, 2024 Filing 52 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand by Ameron International Corporation. Attorney Forrest Ren Wilkes added to party Ameron International Corporation(pty:3pd).(Wilkes, Forrest) Modified text on 1/22/2024 (js).
January 18, 2024 Filing 51 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Company for Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. (Marionneaux, Mark) Modified text on 1/19/2024 (js).
January 18, 2024 Filing 50 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. (Marionneaux, Mark) Modified text on 1/19/2024 (js).
January 18, 2024 Filing 49 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 1/19/2024 (js).
January 18, 2024 Filing 48 ANSWER to #9 Notice of Removal Third Party Demands of Mosaic Global Holding, Inc. by Travelers Indemnity Company. Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:3pd).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 1/19/2024 (js).
January 16, 2024 Filing 47 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #41 Answer to Crossclaim, #42 Answer to Crossclaim, #43 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #44 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section O, Judge Brandon S. Long. (js)
January 15, 2024 Filing 46 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim, Third Party Complaint Answer to Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 1/16/2024 (js).
January 15, 2024 Filing 45 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
January 12, 2024 Filing 44 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC (Moir, Peter)
January 12, 2024 Filing 43 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc for Grinnell LLC (Moir, Peter)
January 12, 2024 Filing 42 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim by Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc. Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.(pty:crd).(Moir, Peter) Modified text on 1/16/2024 (js).
January 12, 2024 Filing 41 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim, by Grinnell LLC(Doc 13). Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Grinnell LLC(pty:crd).(Moir, Peter) Modified on 1/16/2024 (js).
January 10, 2024 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Redco Corporation served on 1/10/2024, answer due 1/31/2024. (Melancon, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 39 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim, with Jury Demand by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(Balhoff, John) Modified text/link on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 38 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim, with Jury Demand by Estee Lauder International, Inc..(Balhoff, John) Modified text/link on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 37 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim with Jury Demand by Estee Lauder Inc.(a Subsidiary of the Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.).(Balhoff, John) Modified text/link on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 36 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Mosaic Global Holding, Inc.'s Third-Party Demand by Estee Lauder Inc. (Balhoff, John) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 35 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Mosaic Global Holding, Inc.'s Third-Party Demand by Estee Lauder International, Inc. (Balhoff, John) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 34 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Mosaic Global Holding, Inc.'s Third-Party Demand by Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. (Balhoff, John) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed; MW Custom Papers, LLC served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (Melancon, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Flowserve US, Inc.(Doc 13 As successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation) served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (Melancon, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Avon Products, Inc. served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (Melancon, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ameron International Corporation(Doc 13) served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (Melancon, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Geo. P. Reintjes Co., Inc. (Morris, Ebony)
January 9, 2024 Filing 28 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Geo. P. Reintjes Co., Inc. (Morris, Ebony) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 9, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim by Gardner Denver, Inc.(Doc 13). Attorney Diana Marie Dilday added to party Gardner Denver, Inc.(pty:crd).(Dilday, Diana) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (js).
January 4, 2024 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Taylor Seidenbach Inc.., Through Its Counsel of Record, Christopher Kelly Lightfoot on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Errata A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc., Through Its Counsel of Record, Mark Andrew Marionneaux on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Through Its Counsel of Record, McGready Lewis Richeson on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Grinnell LLC, Through Its Counsel of Record, Peter Andersen Moir on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Goulds Pumps LLC f/k/a Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Through Its Counsel of Record, Peter Andersen Moir on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Geo P. Reintjes Co., Through Its Counsel of Record, Lise Alexandra Newton on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Gardner Denver, Inc., Through Its Counsel of Record, Christopher O. Massenburg on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Through Its Counsel of Record, James M. Garner on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Estee Lauder International Inc., Through Its Counsel of Record, James M. Garner on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jason Serio of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counter-Claim,Cross Claims, Third-Party Complaint, and Jury Demand served on Estee Lauder Inc., Through Its Counsel of Record, James M. Garner on 12/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Melancon, David)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long. Judge Sarah S. Vance no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/27/2023.(lag)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ameron International Corporation, Avon Products, Inc., Eagle, Inc.(Doc 13), Flowserve US, Inc.(Doc 13 As successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), MW Custom Papers, LLC, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Redco Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(cs)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to Ameron International Corporation, Avon Products, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Redco Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #13 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Melancon, David)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Redco Corporation, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, MW Custom Papers, LLC, Ameron International Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc., CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Flowserve US, Inc., Estee Lauder International, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Grinnell LLC, Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Geo. P. Reintjes Co., Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Estee Lauder Inc., Eagle, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc. by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Amend is GRANTED and Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Notice of Removal is amended as set forth in Record Document 9; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Notice of Removal, Record Document 1, is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/13/2023. (cs)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, and to Withdraw Previous Filing by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Anco Insulations, Inc. dismissed. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/11/2023. (cs)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2023-03750 E 7 (Fee previously paid) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Melancon, David)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Inc., and KKR & Co. L.P. for Gardner Denver, Inc. (Dilday, Diana) Modified text on 12/11/2023 (cs).
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 DEFICIENT ---NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Marie Dilday on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. Attorney Diana Marie Dilday added to party Gardner Denver, Inc.(pty:dft).(Dilday, Diana) Modified text on 12/11/2023 (cs).
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 12/11/2023 (cs).
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Without Prejudice by Anco Insulations, Inc., Sharon Deroche and Gerald Deroche. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rand, Kenan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/7/2023) (cbs).
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (cs)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER AT REC DOC 12 ---NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-03750 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10305198) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-Additional State Court Pleadings)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:3pd).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 12/7/2023 (cs). Modified text on 12/13/2023 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deroche et al v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gerald Deroche
Represented By: Madeline M. Dixon
Represented By: Ivan David Cason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sharon Deroche
Represented By: Madeline M. Dixon
Represented By: Ivan David Cason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Kenan S. Rand, Jr
Represented By: Margaret M. Joffe
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo P. Reintjes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Packing & Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo. P. Reintjes Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lise Alexandra Newton
Represented By: Ebony Shadae Morris
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Pertuit
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Katie Deranger Bell
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Diana Marie Dilday
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Mary Reed
Represented By: Alexandra D. Bourbon
Represented By: Danielle M.S. Riera
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Vikram S. Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Darren Albert Patin
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Estee Lauder Inc.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Curtis James Case
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Mosaic Fertilizer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: Diana J Masters
Represented By: Kelli Murphy Miller
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Ebony Shadae Morris
Represented By: Lise Alexandra Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estee Lauder International, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Curtis James Case
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Estee Lauder Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Madison A. Sharko
Represented By: Victoria E. Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Madison A. Sharko
Represented By: Victoria E. Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Victoria E. Terranova
Represented By: Madison A. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kenvue Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Madison A. Sharko
Represented By: Victoria E. Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LTL Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Redco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Diana J Masters
Represented By: Kelli Murphy Miller
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Connor Peth
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Diana J Masters
Represented By: Kelli Murphy Miller
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estee Lauder Companies
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Curtis James Case
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Madison A. Sharko
Represented By: Victoria E. Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Curtis James Case
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ameron International Corporation
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LLT Management LLC
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Gabriel Winsberg
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Madison A. Sharko
Represented By: Victoria E. Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?