Jacob v. Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association et al
Plaintiff: Herbert J Jacob, Jr., Margaret R Jacob, Richard E Jacob, Deana M Jacob, Verlinde M Jacob and Roxanne J Bates
Defendant: Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, Eagle Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc, Uniroyal, Inc., Viad Corp., Murphy Exploration and Production Company USA, Devon Energy Production Co. LP, El Paso Natural Gas Co., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, York International Corporation, Crane Co., Goulds Pumps LLC, Carrier Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Murphy Oil USA, Inc., Texaco Inc, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company, Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Murphy Exploration and Production Company, Ocean Drilling & Exploration Company, Devon Louisiana Corporation, Seagull Energy E & P, Inc., Houston Oil & Minerals Corp, DeLaval Steam Turbine Co, Cooper-Bessemer Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, El Paso Natural Gas Company LLC and Shell USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv07414
Filed: December 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Darrel James Papillion
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Filing 29 Brief by General Electric Company re #25 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, Response Brief to February 8, 2024 Order (Eagan, Kelsey)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Darren Albert Patin for Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 02/14/2024. (ko)
February 8, 2024 Filing 27 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Roxanne J Bates, Deana M Jacob, Margaret R Jacob, Richard E Jacob, Verlinde M Jacob, in Support of #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
February 8, 2024 Filing 26 Supplemental Memorandum filed by General Electric Company, in Opposition of #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 , #23 Motions for Leave to File Surreplies re rec. doc. 11. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file supplemental briefing on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction in light of State v. Meadows, 88 F.4th 1331 (11th Cir. 2023) and the analysis contained therein. GE shall file its brief on or before 02/23/2024 and Plaintiffs shall file a reply to GE's brief on or before 03/01/2024. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 02/07/2024. (ko)
February 8, 2024 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Darren A. Patin by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 2/9/2024 (cwa).
February 7, 2024 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply of General Electric re rec. doc. 11 by Roxanne J Bates, Deana M Jacob, Margaret R Jacob, Richard E Jacob, Verlinde M Jacob. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Clement, Jonathan) Modified on 2/8/2024 (ko).
February 7, 2024 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure: Document lists counsel of record, Darren A. Patin, for a party in this action who have not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel. (ko)
February 6, 2024 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re rec. doc. 11 by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Eagan, Kelsey) Modified text on 2/8/2024 (ko).
February 6, 2024 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
February 4, 2024 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Roxanne J Bates, Deana M Jacob, Margaret R Jacob, Richard E Jacob, Verlinde M Jacob re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Clement, Jonathan) Modified text on 2/5/2024 (cwa).
January 30, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by General Electric Company re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eagan, Kelsey) Modified text on 1/31/2024 (cwa).
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Thomas Peyton Smith for Uniroyal, Inc. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn and Mary Reeves Arthur terminated. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 01/24/2024. (ko) Modified text on 1/24/2024 (ko).
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Autumn Breeden for Cameron International Corporation. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn terminated. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 01/24/2024. (ko)
January 23, 2024 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney T. Peyton Smith to be substituted in place of Mary R. Arthur and Elizabeth R. Penn by Uniroyal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Thomas Peyton Smith added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:dft).(Smith, Thomas)
January 23, 2024 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Autumn T. Breeden to be substituted in place of Elizabeth R. Penn by Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Autumn Breeden added to party Cameron International Corporation(pty:dft).(Breeden, Autumn)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PRODUCE HARD COPY re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (cwa)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court: Filing attorney incorrectly changed "N" to "Y" at the question "Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?" This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (ko)
January 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deana M Jacob, Margaret R Jacob, Richard E Jacob, Verlinde M Jacob, Roxanne J Bates. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)Attorney Jonathan Brett Clement added to party Roxanne J Bates(pty:pla).(Clement, Jonathan) Modified on 1/23/2024 (ko).
January 22, 2024 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by El Paso Natural Gas Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for El Paso Natural Gas Company LLC (Rossi, Alexandra)
January 22, 2024 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company identifying Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company (Rossi, Alexandra)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Redco Corporation for Crane Co. (Romero, Jacqueline)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Eagan, Kelsey)
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A -Part 5, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6, #7 Exhibit A - Part 7)(Eagan, Kelsey)
January 11, 2024 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Milton Rosamond, III on behalf of Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. Attorney Samuel Milton Rosamond, III added to party Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association(pty:dft).(Rosamond, Samuel) Modified on 1/11/2024 (ko).
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Devon Energy Production Co. LP identifying Corporate Parent Devon Energy Corporation, Corporate Parent DVN Operating Company, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Devon OEI Operating, LLC, Corporate Parent Devon OEI Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Devon Energy Corporation Oklahoma for Devon Energy Production Co. LP (Jalenak, Jay)
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company. By Clerk.(ko)
December 29, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
December 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-07499 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10340683) filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - 1st Supp & Amend Petition, #3 Exhibit C - 12.6.23 NOD/NORD of GE, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Kelsey Eagan added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Eagan, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacob v. Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert J Jacob, Jr.
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret R Jacob
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E Jacob
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana M Jacob
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlinde M Jacob
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne J Bates
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Caroline M. Murley
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Represented By: Gina Talluto Cursain
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Lindsay Rabalais Coussan
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Daniel J. Caruso
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Represented By: Darren Albert Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Jade Marguerite Wandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration and Production Company USA
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Co. LP
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Natural Gas Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Represented By: Chandler Agee
Represented By: Chelsea Gaudin Favret
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Chandler Agee
Represented By: Chelsea Gaudin Favret
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Adrienne Wood
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Daniel J. Caruso
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration and Production Company
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Drilling & Exploration Company
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seagull Energy E & P, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Oil & Minerals Corp
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLaval Steam Turbine Co
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper-Bessemer Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Natural Gas Company LLC
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Adrienne Wood
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell USA, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?