Yogaratnam v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam
Defendant: Darina Dubois, Unidentified Parties and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2024cv00393
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Entry of Default. FURTHER ORDERED that preliminary default be entered against Defendant "1" a/k/a "DARINA DUBOIS" and JOHN DOES 1-20 (collectively "Defendants"), pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 55(a). Issued by Clerk. (mp)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry Default as to Defendant "1" a/k/a "Darina Dubois" and JOHN DOES 1-20 by Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Declaration of Attorney Reagan Charleston Thomas, Esq.)(Thomas, Reagan) Modified text on 3/22/2024 (mp).
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Preliminary Injunction is entered as detailed herein. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on March 8, 2024.(mp)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 3/8/2024. (Court Reporter Alexis Vice.) (mp)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam Filing Proof of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Affidavit of Attorney Reagan Charleston Thomas, Esq.)(Thomas, Reagan)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam's #7 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) is GRANTED, without prejudice to Defendants' opportunity to challenge service and/or personal jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on February 23, 2024. (mp)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam's #6 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice Against Defendant '1' a/k/a 'Darina Dubois' and John Does 1-20 is GRANTED, as detailed herein. A hearing to determine whether to convert this temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction is set for March 8, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on February 23, 2024. (mp)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Service by Publication (Alternative Service on Foreign Defendants) by Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - ECF 1, #2 Exhibit "2" - ECF 6-3, #3 Exhibit "3" Second Stanev Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Reagan)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Plaintiff Declaration, #2 Exhibit "B" - Stanev Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Reagan)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Darina Dubois. (mp)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Amendment/Supplement to Document. Document has been marked "Filed in Error" at Rec. Doc. 3 and was attached as "Exhibit 1" to the Complaint by Clerk. (mp)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *FILED IN ERROR - See Rec. Doc. 1*: Amendment/Supplement to Document by Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam re #1 Complaint, Exhibit "1" - Cryptocurrency Tracing Report (Thomas, Reagan) Modified on 2/15/2024 (mp).
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Defendant "1", John Does 1-20 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10401593) filed by Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant "1" a/k/a "Darina Dubois", #3 Summons John Does 1-20)Attorney Reagan Charleston Thomas added to party Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam(pty:pla).(Thomas, Reagan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2024: #4 Exhibit 1) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yogaratnam v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeysen Zivan Yogaratnam
Represented By: Reagan Charleston Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darina Dubois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?