Sorbello v. Agco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kevin M Sorbello
Defendant: Agco Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Atlas Valve Co. Inc., Auburn Technology, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Bath Iron Works Corporation, Behlman Electronics Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Bonnell Aluminum Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Cameron Solutions, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Chromalox, Inc., Cla-Val Company, Clayton Industries, Cleaver Brooks Inc, Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation, Coen Company, Inc., Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc., Cooper Industries LLC, Crosby Valve, LLC, Curtiss-Wright Electro-Mechanical Corporation, Cyclotherm Corp., Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co., Federal Pacific Electric Co., Fisher Controls International LLC, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Fulflo Specialties Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Graham Corporation, HBD Industries, Inc., Henry Technologies, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, IMO Industries, Inc., International Paper Company, ITT, LLC, J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC, Jenkins Bros., Johnson Controls, Inc, Kearney National, Manning & Lewis - A Division of Rubicon Industrie Corp., Masoneilan International, LLC, Mueller Co. LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Newterra, Inc., Notorque Corporation, Paramount Global, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pentair Filtration Solutions, LLC, Redco Corporation, Resco Holdings, LLC, RIX Industries, Robbins & Myers, Inc., Robertshaw Controls Company, Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc., Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Siemens Energy, Inc., Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corp., Taco, Inc., Tate Andale, LLC, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., TDY Industries, LLC, Tuthill Corporation, TWC The Valve Company, LLC, Tyco Electronics Corporate Holdings, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Valves and Controls US, Inc., William Powell Company, Wilo USA, LLC, York International Corporation, G. Denver and Co., LLC, ITT Corporation and Bell & Gossett Company, Kearney National Inc, Foster Wheeler Corporation and Electro Dynamic Corporation
Case Number: 2:2024cv00398
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 127 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co. (Corb, Natasha)
April 12, 2024 Filing 126 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co..(Corb, Natasha)
April 12, 2024 Filing 125 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #116 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney did not enter John Wood Group PLC (Scotland) as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. (go)
April 12, 2024 Filing 124 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brian C. Bossier, Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III, Christopher T. Grace, III, Erin H. Boyd, Laura M. Gillen, Kimmier L. Paul, and Morgan M. Smith to be substituted in place of Gus A. Fritchie, Timothy F. Daniels, David M. Melancon, M. Scott Minyard, Alison A. Spindler, Diana J. Masters, and Laura A. Leggette by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Morgan M Smith added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Smith, Morgan)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Substitute Party. ORDERED that Electro Dynamic Corporation is substituted in Plaintiff's Complaint for General Dynamics Corporation, solely in its capacity as alleged successor-ininterest to Electro- ynamic Company, d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat and that all pleadings filed to date by Plaintiff are deemed to pertain to Electro Dynamics Corporation for all purposes, subject to any applicable defenses or affirmative defenses. Electro Dynamic Corporation is hereby instructed to file its responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint within twenty-one (21) days from the entry of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted against General Dynamics, solely in its capacity as alleged successor-in-interest to Electro-Dynamic Company, d/b/a General Dynamics Electric Boat, are hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice, with each side to bear its own costs. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff preserves his claim against General Dynamics Corporation as to its shipyard in Quincy, Massachusetts, as set forth in Paragraph 17 of the Complaint, and specifically reserves all rights and claims he may have against any and all there defendants, third-parties, and/or other persons or entities, whether named or unnamed. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/11/2024. (clc)
April 11, 2024 Filing 122 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bonnell Aluminum Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tredegar Corporation for Bonnell Aluminum Inc. (Bienvenu, David)
April 11, 2024 Filing 121 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bonnell Aluminum Inc.(Bienvenu, David) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 120 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 119 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 11, 2024 Filing 118 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Paramount Global identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global, identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Paramount Global (Neill, Parker) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 117 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Paramount Global. Attorney Parker Neill added to party Paramount Global(pty:dft).(Neill, Parker) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 116 Statement of Corporate Disclosure identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler, LLC (Neill, Parker) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 115 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Foster Wheeler, LLC. Attorney Parker Neill added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC(pty:dft).(Neill, Parker) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 114 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Neill, Parker)
April 11, 2024 Filing 113 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.Attorney Parker Neill added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Neill, Parker) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (go).
April 11, 2024 Filing 112 Summons Issued as to Aurora Pump Company. (clc)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Masoneilan International, LLC, Tyco Electronics Corporate Holdings, Inc., Wilo USA, LLC, Cameron Solutions, Inc. and Federal Pacific Electric Co. dismissed. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/10/2024. (clc)
April 10, 2024 Filing 110 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Electro Dynamic Corporation by General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lancaster, Daphne)
April 9, 2024 Filing 109 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Cameron Solutions Inc., Fed. Pac. Elec. Co., Masoneilan Int'l LLC, Tyco Electr. Corp. Holdings Inc., and Wilo USA LLC by Kevin M Sorbello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Austin, Stephen)
April 9, 2024 Filing 108 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Austin, Stephen)
April 9, 2024 Filing 107 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (Foundas, Ernest) Modified on 4/10/2024 (gla).
April 9, 2024 Filing 106 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.Attorney Ernest G. Foundas added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(Foundas, Ernest)
April 8, 2024 Filing 105 Summons Issued as to RIX Industries. (clc)
April 8, 2024 Filing 104 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Austin, Stephen)
April 4, 2024 Filing 103 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Valves and Controls US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TWG Investments (No. 8) Limited for Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Adams, Jennifer)
April 4, 2024 Filing 102 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Valves and Controls US, Inc..Attorney Jennifer E. Adams added to party Valves and Controls US, Inc.(pty:dft).(Adams, Jennifer)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to General Dynamics Corporation; answer due 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/3/2024. (clc)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to TDY Industries, LLC; answer due 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/3/2024. (clc)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Siemens Energy, Inc.; answer due 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/3/2024. (clc)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Bath Iron Works Corporation; answer due 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/3/2024. (clc)
April 3, 2024 Filing 97 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #30 Summons Returned Executed. The docket entry contained an incorrect answer due date; Parties served on 3/14/2024, answers due 4/4/2024. (clc)
April 2, 2024 Filing 96 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kay B. Baxter added to party General Dynamics Corporation(pty:dft).(Baxter, Kay)
April 2, 2024 Filing 95 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by TDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kay B. Baxter added to party TDY Industries, LLC(pty:dft).(Baxter, Kay)
April 2, 2024 Filing 94 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Siemens Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kay B. Baxter added to party Siemens Energy, Inc.(pty:dft).(Baxter, Kay)
April 2, 2024 Filing 93 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Bath Iron Works Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kay B. Baxter added to party Bath Iron Works Corporation(pty:dft).(Baxter, Kay)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc.; answer due 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/29/2024. (clc)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Taco, Inc.; answer due 3/29/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/29/2024. (clc)
March 28, 2024 Filing 90 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jacqueline Romero added to party Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc.(pty:dft).(Romero, Jacqueline)
March 28, 2024 Filing 89 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cleveland-Cliffs Inc. for Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation (Benoit, Allison)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Resco Holdings, LLC; answer due 4/18/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/28/2024. (clc)
March 28, 2024 Filing 87 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Taco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Heidi Lynne Williams added to party Taco, Inc.(pty:dft).(Williams, Heidi)
March 27, 2024 Filing 86 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cooper Industries LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc for Auburn Technology, Inc. (Deto, Amanda) Modified text on 3/28/2024 (clc).
March 27, 2024 Filing 85 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Auburn Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alstom SA, Corporate Parent Bombardier Transportation (Holding) USA, Inc. for Auburn Technology, Inc. (Moir, Peter)
March 27, 2024 Filing 84 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Resco Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert Edward Williams, IV added to party Resco Holdings, LLC(pty:dft).(Williams, Robert)
March 27, 2024 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Auburn Technology, Inc..Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Auburn Technology, Inc.(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to William Powell Company; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/27/2024. (clc)
March 27, 2024 Filing 81 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Resco Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Waste Management Holdings, Inc. for Resco Holdings, LLC (Williams, Robert)
March 27, 2024 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Stephen Austin of Sworn Declaration of Service served on Aurora Pump Company on 03/25/2024. (Austin, Stephen)
March 27, 2024 Filing 79 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Coen Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Koch Industries, Inc. for Coen Company, Inc. (Deto, Amanda)
March 27, 2024 Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Redco Corporation.Attorney Jacqueline Romero added to party Redco Corporation(pty:dft).(Romero, Jacqueline)
March 27, 2024 Filing 77 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cooper Industries LLC.Attorney Jeanette Seraile-Riggins added to party Cooper Industries LLC(pty:dft).(Seraile-Riggins, Jeanette)
March 27, 2024 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation.Attorney Allison N. Benoit added to party Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation(pty:dft).(Benoit, Allison)
March 26, 2024 Filing 75 Amendment/Supplement to Document by Parker-Hannifin Corporation re #74 Statement of Corporate Disclosure Amended Certificate of Service (Carmer, Jon)
March 26, 2024 Filing 74 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Carmer, Jon)
March 26, 2024 Filing 73 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sydney Tye Stuart added to party William Powell Company(pty:dft).(Stuart, Sydney)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Alfa Laval Inc.; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/26/2024. (clc)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Agco Corporation; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/26/2024. (clc)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Pentair Filtration Solutions, LLC; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/26/2024. (clc)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to BW/IP, Inc.; answer due 3/26/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/26/2024. (clc)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.; answer due 3/26/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/26/2024. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Fulflo Specialties Company served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; Graham Corporation served on 3/19/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed as to Fulflo Specialties Company)(Austin, Stephen)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corp.; answer due 4/17/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/25/2024. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to National Steel and Shipbuilding Company; answer due 4/16/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/25/2024. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Kearney National Inc. ORDERED that Kearney-National, Inc. shall have an additional 21 days to file responsive pleadings to the plaintiff's complaint in the captioned matter, calculated from the date they were otherwise due. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/25/2024. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Filing 63 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Danielle M.S. Riera added to party Alfa Laval Inc.(pty:dft).(Riera, Danielle)
March 25, 2024 Filing 62 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Agco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Danielle M.S. Riera added to party Agco Corporation(pty:dft).(Riera, Danielle)
March 25, 2024 Filing 61 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Pentair Filtration Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Shelley Kathryn Napolitano added to party Pentair Filtration Solutions, LLC(pty:dft).(Napolitano, Shelley)
March 25, 2024 Filing 60 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Johnson Controls, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for Johnson Controls, Inc (Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnson Controls, Inc.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Johnson Controls, Inc(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 58 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ITT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT, LLC (Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT, LLC.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party ITT, LLC(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 56 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Goulds Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pumps, LLC (Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 55 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by BW/IP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mary Reed added to party BW/IP, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reed, Mary)
March 25, 2024 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Goulds Pumps, LLC.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mary Reed added to party Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.(pty:dft).(Reed, Mary)
March 25, 2024 Filing 52 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent EBARA Corporation, Corporate Parent Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company (Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Elliott Company.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Elliott Company(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 50 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Bell, Troy)
March 25, 2024 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..Attorney Troy Nathan Bell added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bell, Troy)
March 25, 2024 Filing 48 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cleaver Brooks Inc identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Brooks Acquisition LLC, Corporate Parent Aqua-Chem, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks Inc. (Moir, Peter) Modified text on 3/26/2024 (clc).
March 25, 2024 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cleaver Brooks Inc.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Cleaver Brooks Inc(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 46 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for York International Corporation (Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 45 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Strain, Stacey)
March 25, 2024 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by York International Corporation.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party York International Corporation(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 25, 2024 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.Attorney Stacey Leigh Strain added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft).(Strain, Stacey)
March 25, 2024 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to Cameron Solutions, Inc. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Coen Company, Inc..Attorney Amanda Luella Deto added to party Coen Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Deto, Amanda)
March 25, 2024 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kay B. Baxter added to party Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corp.(pty:dft).(Baxter, Kay)
March 25, 2024 Filing 39 EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kay B. Baxter added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:dft).(Baxter, Kay)
March 25, 2024 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Kearney National. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney J. Warren Gardner, Jr added to party Kearney National(pty:dft).(Gardner, J.)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 COMPLAINT as to Parker-Hannifin Corporation; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/29/2024. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint as to Bonnell Aluminum Inc.; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/25/2024. (clc)
March 25, 2024 Filing 35 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Austin, Stephen)
March 25, 2024 Filing 34 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Breeden, Autumn)
March 25, 2024 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by International Paper Company.Attorney Autumn Breeden added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Breeden, Autumn)
March 22, 2024 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jon F Carmer, Jr added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft).(Carmer, Jon)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party HBD Industries, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/22/2024. (clc)
March 22, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Agco Corporation; Alfa Laval Inc.; Bath Iron Works Corporation; Caterpillar, Inc.; Chromalox, Inc.; Emerson Electric Co.; FMC Corporation; Gardner Denver, Inc.; General Dynamics Corporation; General Electric Company; Goulds Pumps, LLC; Honeywell International, Inc.; Hopeman Brothers, Inc.; Howden North America, Inc.; Huntington Ingalls Incorporated; IMO Industries, Inc.; International Paper Company; Johnson Controls, Inc; Parker-Hannifin Corporation; Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc.; Siemens Energy, Inc. ; TDY Industries, LLC; Tuthill Corporation; Union Carbide Corporation ; York International Corporation. Parties served on 3/14/2024, answers due 4/15/2024 (Austin, Stephen) Modified text on 3/22/2024 (clc).
March 22, 2024 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Bonnell Aluminum Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David Mark Bienvenu, Jr added to party Bonnell Aluminum Inc.(pty:dft).(Bienvenu, David)
March 22, 2024 Filing 28 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation (Moir, Peter)
March 22, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carrier Corporation.Attorney Peter Andersen Moir added to party Carrier Corporation(pty:dft).(Moir, Peter)
March 21, 2024 Filing 26 **DEFICIENT** AFFIDAVIT of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Services - Private Process Server)(Austin, Stephen) Modified on 3/22/2024 (clc).
March 21, 2024 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party HBD Industries Inc. Without Prejudice by Kevin M Sorbello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Austin, Stephen)
March 21, 2024 Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement Diversity Disclosure Statement)(Kovach, Katherine)
March 21, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar, Inc..Attorney Katherine Charlotte Kovach added to party Caterpillar, Inc.(pty:dft).(Kovach, Katherine)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Howden North America, Inc.; answer due 4/19/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/20/2024. (clc)
March 20, 2024 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Howden North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John T. Balhoff, II added to party Howden North America, Inc.(pty:dft).(Balhoff, John)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Tuthill Corporation; answer due 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/19/2024. (clc)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated; answer due 3/19/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/19/2024. (clc)
March 18, 2024 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Tuthill Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael S. Harrison, Jr added to party Tuthill Corporation(pty:dft).(Harrison, Michael)
March 18, 2024 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David)
March 15, 2024 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Manning & Lewis - A Division of Rubicon Industrie Corp., Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(clc)
March 14, 2024 Filing 15 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Austin, Stephen)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Honeywell International, Inc.; answer due 4/2/2024. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/13/2024. (clc)
March 13, 2024 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Glenn B. Adams added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft).(Adams, Glenn)
March 12, 2024 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Inc. and KKR & Co. L.P. for Gardner Denver, Inc. (Dilday, Diana) Modified on 3/13/2024 (am).
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by G. Denver and Co., LLC .Attorney Diana Marie Dilday added to party G. Denver and Co., LLC.(pty:dft).(Dilday, Diana) Modified on 3/13/2024 (gla).
March 11, 2024 Filing 10 **DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR- Atty representation requires the attorney is listed on a responsive pleading or via a motion to enroll. Counsel was added to the docket sheet via the answer. ** NOTICE of Appearance by Rocky Wayne Eaton on behalf of Robertshaw Controls Company. Attorney Rocky Wayne Eaton added to party Robertshaw Controls Company(pty:dft).(Eaton, Rocky) Modified text on 3/15/2024 (clc).
March 11, 2024 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Robertshaw Controls Company identifying Corporate Parent Robertshaw US Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Robertshaw Holdings S.a.r.l. for Robertshaw Controls Company (Strain, Stacey)
March 11, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robertshaw Controls Company.Attorney Stacey Leigh Strain added to party Robertshaw Controls Company(pty:dft).(Strain, Stacey)
March 11, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Austin, Stephen)
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aurora Pump Company. (clc)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Austin, Stephen)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Agco Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Atlas Valve Co. Inc., Auburn Technology, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc., Bath Iron Works Corporation, Behlman Electronics Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Bonnell Aluminum Inc., Cameron Solutions, Inc., Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Chromalox, Inc., Cla-Val Company, Clayton Industries, Cleaver Brooks Inc, Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation, Coen Company, Inc., Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc., Cooper Industries LLC, Crosby Valve, LLC, Curtiss-Wright Electro-Mechanical Corporation, Cyclotherm Corp., Elliott Company, Emerson Electric Co., FMC Corporation, Federal Pacific Electric Co., Fisher Controls International LLC, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Fulflo Specialties Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Graham Corporation, HBD Industries, Inc., Henry Technologies, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT, LLC, International Paper Company, J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC, Jenkins Bros., Johnson Controls, Inc, Kearney National, Manning & Lewis - A Division of Rubicon Industrie Corp., Masoneilan International, LLC, Mueller Co. LLC, National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Newterra, Inc., Notorque Corporation, Paramount Global, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pentair Filtration Solutions, LLC, RIX Industries, Redco Corporation, Resco Holdings, LLC, Robbins & Myers, Inc., Robertshaw Controls Company, Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc., Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Siemens Energy, Inc., Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corp., TDY Industries, LLC, TWC The Valve Company, LLC, Taco, Inc., Tate Andale, LLC, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporate Holdings, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Valves and Controls US, Inc., William Powell Company, Wilo USA, LLC, York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons, #61 Summons, #62 Summons, #63 Summons, #64 Summons, #65 Summons, #66 Summons, #67 Summons, #68 Summons, #69 Summons, #70 Summons, #71 Summons, #72 Summons, #73 Summons, #74 Summons, #75 Summons, #76 Summons, #77 Summons, #78 Summons, #79 Summons, #80 Summons)(lb)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons, #61 Summons, #62 Summons, #63 Summons, #64 Summons, #65 Summons, #66 Summons, #67 Summons, #68 Summons, #69 Summons, #70 Summons, #71 Summons, #72 Summons, #73 Summons, #74 Summons, #75 Summons, #76 Summons, #77 Summons, #78 Summons, #79 Summons, #80 Summons)(Austin, Stephen)
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10402389) filed by Kevin M Sorbello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Stephen Jared Austin added to party Kevin M Sorbello(pty:pla).(Austin, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorbello v. Agco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M Sorbello
Represented By: Stephen Jared Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agco Corporation
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Danielle M.S. Riera
Represented By: Diana Marie Dilday
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Mary Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Represented By: Rocky Wayne Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Mary Reed
Represented By: Danielle M.S. Riera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Valve Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath Iron Works Corporation
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Represented By: Kay B. Baxter
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behlman Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnell Aluminum Inc.
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: Katherine E. Roberts
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Mary Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Katherine Charlotte Kovach
Represented By: Robert Kenton Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chromalox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cla-Val Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks Inc
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland-Cliffs Steel Corporation
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Laura Spadafora Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coen Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Arielle C. Day
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries LLC
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Vikram S. Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Electro-Mechanical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyclotherm Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Pacific Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Controls International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Parker Neill
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulflo Specialties Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Represented By: Kay B. Baxter
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Parker Neill
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBD Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Corey D. Moll
Represented By: Glenn B. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden North America, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Represented By: James M. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Diana J Masters
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: Morgan M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Autumn Breeden
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT, LLC
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Bros.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kearney National
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manning & Lewis - A Division of Rubicon Industrie Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masoneilan International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Kay B. Baxter
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newterra, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notorque Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Parker Neill
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Jon F Carmer, Jr
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Nicholas G. Grest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair Filtration Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Ebony Shadae Morris
Represented By: Lise Alexandra Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resco Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard P. Sulzer
Represented By: Robert Edward Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIX Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbins & Myers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company
Represented By: Rocky Wayne Eaton
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Solutions America, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.
Represented By: Mary Reed
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kay B. Baxter
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior-Lidgerwood-Mundy Corp.
Represented By: Kay B. Baxter
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Lynne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Darren Albert Patin
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY Industries, LLC
Represented By: Kay B. Baxter
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Michael S. Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC The Valve Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Electronics Corporate Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Erin Casey Hangartner
Represented By: Amber Barlow Garcia
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Sydney Tye Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilo USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Denver and Co., LLC
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Mary Reed
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Bradley A. Hays
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Diana Marie Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation and Bell & Gossett Company
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Represented By: Cole Christian Trolinger
Represented By: Shawn D. Golden
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kearney National Inc
Represented By: J. Warren Gardner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Parker Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Dynamic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?