Special Touch of North AL, LLC v. Design Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Special Touch of North AL, LLC
Defendant: Design Management Group, LLC, Ryan McCroskey and Aren McCroskey
Case Number: 2:2024cv00541
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brandon S Long
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Waiver of Service Executed, #16 Waiver of Service Executed. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Waivers. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (js)
April 18, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Aren McCroskey on 4/5/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Lewis, Sara) Modified on 4/19/2024 (js). (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/19/2024) (js).
April 18, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Ryan McCroskey on 4/5/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Lewis, Sara) Modified text on 4/19/2024 (js). (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/19/2024) (js).
April 17, 2024 Filing 14 **DEFICIENT** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Aren McCroskey on 4/5/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Lewis, Sara) Modified on 4/18/2024 (js).
April 17, 2024 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Ryan McCroskey on 4/5/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Lewis, Sara) Modified on 4/18/2024 (js).
April 3, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Wayne Augillard of Civil Complaint served on Design Management Group, LLC on March 26, 2024. (Lewis, Sara)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/7/2024. (NEF: Section O, Mags. 4 & 5) (sa)
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Complaint - Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (gla)
March 6, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Design Management Group, LLC, Aren McCroskey, Ryan McCroskey. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(gla)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lewis, Sara)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lewis, Sara)
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lewis, Sara)
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
March 4, 2024 Filing fee received from Special Touch of North AL, LLC: Receipt ALAEDC-10424102 $ 405 (cc)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee previously paid) filed by Special Touch of North AL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Sara) Modified on 3/6/2024 (gla).
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case(s) Statement of Collateral Proceedings by Special Touch of North AL, LLC of related case(s) 24-cv-00493. (Lewis, Sara)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement by Special Touch of North AL, LLC (Lewis, Sara) Modified on 3/6/2024 (lag).
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR - REFILED AT DOC. 4 - COMPLAINT against Design Management Group, LLC, Aren McCroskey, Ryan McCroskey (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10424102) filed by Special Touch of North AL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)Attorney Sara Lewis added to party Special Touch of North AL, LLC(pty:pla).(Lewis, Sara) Modified on 3/6/2024 (gla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Special Touch of North AL, LLC v. Design Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Touch of North AL, LLC
Represented By: Sara Lewis
Represented By: Guy E. Wall
Represented By: Jonathan R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McCroskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aren McCroskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?