Isleem et al v. Peacock et al
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Isleem, Michael W. Gahagan and Gahagan Law Firm, L.L.C.
Defendant: Sandra Peacock, Nicole Decuir and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2024cv00559
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eva J Dossier
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1101 Immigration & Nationality Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 04/12/2024.(lag)
April 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nicole Decuir served on 3/22/2024, answer due 5/21/2024; Sandra Peacock served on 3/22/2024, answer due 5/21/2024; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 4/11/2024 (jls).
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nicole Decuir, Sandra Peacock, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(mmm)
March 5, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (meb)
March 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10427745) filed by Mahmoud Isleem, Gahagan Law Firm, L.L.C., Michael W. Gahagan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Michael W. Gahagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Gahagan Law Firm, L.L.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Mahmoud Isleem(pty:pla).(Gahagan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isleem et al v. Peacock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Isleem
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Gahagan
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gahagan Law Firm, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Decuir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?