Brandt v. CNS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Brandt
Defendant: CNS Corporation, Ozark National Life Insurance Company and CNS Corporation of Missouri
Not Yet Classified: N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00574
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Carey L. Menasco for Brian Brandt. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/25/2024. (sa)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION to Continue Submission date - IT IS ORDERED that #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration is RESET for submission on 6/5/2024. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/25/2024.(sa)
April 24, 2024 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record , Carey L. Menasco by Brian Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reisman, Carol) Modified on 4/25/2024 (sa).
April 24, 2024 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date as to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Brian Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reisman, Carol) Modified on 4/25/2024 (sa).
April 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Melton Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - FINRA Broker Check, #4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Erin Pelleteri Howser added to party CNS Corporation of Missouri(pty:dft).(Howser, Erin) Modified on 4/23/2024 (sa).
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan D. LeMoine. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cs)
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryan David LeMoine (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10480720) by CNS Corporation, N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., Ozark National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Declaration of Bryan LeMoine, #2 Exhibit "B" - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit "C" - Electronic Case Filing Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Howser, Erin)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants GRANTED an extension of time through April 20, 2024 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/20/2024. (sa)
March 19, 2024 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by CNS Corporation, CNS Corporation of Missouri, N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., Ozark National Life Insurance Company for the following reason: duplicate payment made; receipt number ALAEDC-10430983. (Howser, Erin)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, by CNS Corporation, N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., Ozark National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kesler, Emily) Modified on 3/14/2024 (sa).
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by All Defendants re #4 Order. Attorney Emily Olivier Kesler added to party CNS Corporation of Missouri(pty:dft).(Kesler, Emily)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #2 Notice of Removal,, filed by N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., CNS Corporation, Ozark National Life Insurance Company. (lb)
March 7, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (kls)
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, case number 2024-0000319-B (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10430983) filed by Ozark National Life Insurance Company, N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., CNS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Burkholder Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Erin Pelleteri Howser added to party CNS Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Pelleteri Howser added to party N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc.(pty:selreq), Attorney Erin Pelleteri Howser added to party Ozark National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Howser, Erin) Modified text on 3/8/2024 (lb).
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CNS Corporation, N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., Ozark National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent National Western Life Group, Inc. for N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc., Ozark National Life Insurance Company (Howser, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt v. CNS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Brandt
Represented By: Carol Welborn Reisman
Represented By: Carey L. Menasco
Represented By: Melanie Nicole Derefinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNS Corporation
Represented By: Erin Pelleteri Howser
Represented By: Bryan D. LeMoine
Represented By: Emily Olivier Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin Pelleteri Howser
Represented By: Bryan D. LeMoine
Represented By: Emily Olivier Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNS Corporation of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?