Almekdad v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: JAMAL ALMEKDAD
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2024cv00899
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1101 Immigration & Nationality Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (mmv)
May 28, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint for Declaratory, Injunctive and Mandamus Relief and Summons served on US Attorney's Office; Atty General of the U.S.; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 4/18/24; 4/29/24; 5/1/24. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Gahagan, Michael) Modified text/event on 5/28/2024 (mmv).
April 11, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mmv)
April 11, 2024 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (kls)
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10479822) filed by Jamal Almekdad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party JAMAL ALMEKDAD(pty:pla).(Gahagan, Michael) Modified text on 4/11/2024 (mmv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almekdad v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAL ALMEKDAD
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?