Johns v. Francis et al
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Johns
Defendant: Donovan Francis, Tony Hernandez, The Johns Law Firm, LLC and Johns Law Firm, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01064
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Eva J Dossier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donovan Francis, Tony Hernandez, Johns Law Firm, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mp)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Donovan Francis, Tony Hernandez, Johns Law Firm, LLC filed by Jeremiah Johns re #1 Complaint,. (Johns, Jeremiah)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. (meb)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donovan Francis, Tony Hernandez, Johns Law Firm, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10504513) filed by Jeremiah Johns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Loan Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Metadata re Operating Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jeremiah Nathan Johns added to party Jeremiah Johns (pty:pla).(Johns, Jeremiah) Modified on 4/29/2024 (gla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns v. Francis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Johns
Represented By: Jeremiah Nathan Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?