Robertson v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Anita Robertson
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Interested Party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv01431
Filed: June 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eva J Dossier
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 06/18/2024. (NEF: Div. 1, Div. 3)(ko)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS FOURTH AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(pp)
June 12, 2024 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (meb)
June 12, 2024 Filing fee received from Anita Robertson:RECEIPT # 7469 $ 405 (cc)
June 5, 2024 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $405.00 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (ess) Modified on 6/12/2024 (cc).
June 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASULATY COMPANY (Fee previously paid) filed by Anita Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Justin Lamar Winch added to party Anita Robertson(pty:pla).(Winch, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2024) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By: Francis Joseph Lobrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Robertson
Represented By: Justin Lamar Winch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?