Bodin et al v. New Orleans City
Plaintiff: Bret Bodin, Brad Newell, Darian Morgan, Michael Rosas, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC and Airbnb, Inc.
Defendant: New Orleans City
Case Number: 2:2025cv00329
Filed: February 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/30/2025. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(mmm)
April 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/3/2025. (mmm)
April 2, 2025 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading 12(b)(6) Motion, #3 Proposed Pleading Memo In Support, #4 Notice of Submission)(Markey, Sean)
March 21, 2025 Filing 17 Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs to #16 Notice of Related Case(s) (Freese, Madeline)
March 20, 2025 Filing 16 Notice of Related Case(s) by New Orleans City of related case(s) 19-cv-13773. (Markey, Sean)
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Michael Davidson. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul D. Clement. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander A. Berengaut. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chloe Goodwin. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice PHV) (mmm)
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to New Orleans City answer due 4/2/2025. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/13/2025. (mmm)
March 13, 2025 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul D. Clement (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10920014) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Cunningham, Mark)
March 13, 2025 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexander A. Berengaut (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10919987) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Cunningham, Mark)
March 13, 2025 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chloe Goodwin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10919950) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Cunningham, Mark)
March 13, 2025 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffery M. Davidson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-10919925) by Airbnb, Inc., Bret Bodin, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Michael Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Cunningham, Mark)
March 12, 2025 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by New Orleans City. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sean Michael Markey added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Markey, Sean)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 2/19/2025, answer due 3/12/2025. (Freese, Madeline)
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (car)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
February 14, 2025 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Airbnb, Inc. (Cunningham, Mark)
February 14, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10886647) filed by Airbnb, Inc., Michael Rosas, Bret Bodin, Darian Morgan, Brad Newell, Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of New Orleans)Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Bret Bodin(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Brad Newell(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Darian Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Michael Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party Airbnb, Inc.(pty:pla).(Cunningham, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodin et al v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Bodin
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Madeline Melissa Freese
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Chloe Goodwin
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Newell
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Madeline Melissa Freese
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Chloe Goodwin
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darian Morgan
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Madeline Melissa Freese
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Chloe Goodwin
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rosas
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Madeline Melissa Freese
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Chloe Goodwin
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-City Mike Rentals LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Madeline Melissa Freese
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Chloe Goodwin
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Madeline Melissa Freese
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Chloe Goodwin
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Mark Aaron Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Sherri L. Hutton
Represented By: Donesia D. Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Sean Michael Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?