Wilkerson, et al v. Stalder, et al

Plaintiff: Herman Wallace, Robert King Wilkerson and Albert Woodfox
Defendant: Burl Cain, Paul J Myers, Tom Norris, Richard Peabody, R Rachal, Randy Ritchie, Sam Smith, Richard L. Stalder, Major Ned Tolliver and Darrell Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2000cv00304
Filed: March 30, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2015 663 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 623 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/03/2015. (NLT)
May 12, 2015 646 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 634 Motion for Protective Order. The 629 Motion to Take Depositions from Tory Pegram and Malik Rahim by Remote Means is GRANTED. The Non-Party Malik Rahim 's 641 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Deposition is DENIED. The Court's Amended Scheduling Order is modified to allow for the depositions of Tory Pegram and Malik Rahim no later than 5/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/11/2015. (LLH)
May 27, 2014 588 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT granting 587 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, all Claims of Herman Wallace. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/27/2014. (NLT)
January 31, 2014 568 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 557 Motion to Stay of Proceedings Pending Hunt/Wade Defendants' Interlocutory Appeal on Qualified Immunity. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/31/2014. (NLT)
December 17, 2013 554 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 517 Motion to Substitute Party and granting 546 Motion to Substitute Party. Barbara Wallace Marshall, Lorraina Wallace Anderson and Justina Wallace Williams added. Herman Wallace terminated. Plaintiffs may file a motion to intervene. Oppositions must be filed within 15 days of the filing of Plaintiff's brief. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/16/2013. (SMG)
November 1, 2013 534 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 484 and 510 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants may file a joint motion in opposition to injunctive relief no later than November 7, 2013, or maintain motions already filed. A hearing is set on the merits of the preliminary injunction for November 13, 2013 at 9:30 A.M.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/1/2013. (LLH)
September 22, 2011 412 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON APPEAL: Therefore, the Magistrate Judges 374 Order granting Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is AFFIRMED, Defendants Appeals 387 , 388 are DENIED. Defendants 396 Motion to Strike is dismissed as MOOT.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/20/2011. (CMM)
March 30, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 384 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 351 Motion to Strike filed by Albert Woodfox, Robert King Wilkerson, Herman Wallace is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1. Affirmative defenses 2, 3, and 6 are stricken as moot. 2. All references to pornographic material in the 13th affirmative defense in sections a., b., and c., are stricken. 3. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. FURTHER, rec. docs. 359, 359-2 (Exhibit B), and 359-3 (Exhi bit C) are UNSEALED and placed back into the public record. FURTHER, rec. docs. 359-1 (Exhibit A), 359-4 (Exhibit D) and 359-5 (Exhibit E) will remain UNDER SEAL and available only to the court for purposes of any appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/29/10. (BP, )
April 3, 2009 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pltfs motion to withdraw the 12/1/08 proposed third amended complaint and refile 279 is GRANTED, and the 12/1/08 motion to amend complaint 268 be withdrawn and the third amended complaint attached to the 12/29/08 motion, be filed in the re cord. FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone status conference is set for 4/27/2009 at 2:00 PM. Counsel for pltf shall initiate call to chambers. FURTHER ORDERED that the defts motion to withdraw request for sanctions 275 and 283 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/3/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson, et al v. Stalder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J Myers
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Norris
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Peabody
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Rachal
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Ritchie
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Smith
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Stalder
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Ned Tolliver
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Represented By: Richard A. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Wallace
Represented By: Corrine A. Irish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert King Wilkerson
Represented By: Corrine A. Irish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Woodfox
Represented By: Corrine A. Irish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?