Brown v. Stalder, et al

Plaintiff: David Brown
Defendant: Billy Bagget, David Bonnett, Darren Bordelon, Burl Cain, Douglas Durrett, Jimmy Johnson, Joseph Lamartinire, Paul Perkins, David Ross, Jr, David Ross, Sr, Richard L. Stalder and Ronald Welch
Lt. Jones: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2001cv00006
Filed: January 2, 2001
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's request for expedited consideration of the instant Motion be and it is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Stay be and it is hereby GRANTED, such that the plaintiff's deposition scheduled for June 10, 2015, be and it is hereby QUASHED, and the proceedings in this case be and they are stayed until the conclusion of the plaintiff's sentencing hearing in his criminal case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/05/2015. (BCL)
March 18, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Limit Deposition Exam. The parties shall complete all discovery in this proceeding within one hundred and twenty (120) days of the date of this Order. The parties shall file cross-motions for summary judgment herein within one hundred and eighty (180) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/18/2015. (LLH)
March 1, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to 11 Motion to Lift Stay; 11 Motion to Sever. The motion to lift the stay entered in this consolidated litigation as to David Brown is hereby GRANTED and Civil Action No. 01-0006-JJB-DLD is reinstated on the Docket of the Court, and the plaintiff's individual claims are severed from this consolidated proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/29/2012. (LSM) Modified on 3/1/2012 to change document type (LSM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Stalder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Bagget
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bonnett
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Bordelon
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Durrett
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Johnson
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lamartinire
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ross, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ross, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Stalder
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lt. jones: John Doe
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?