Thomas v. Cain et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00941
Filed: July 12, 2005
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The Rulings of the Magistrate Judge, ( 172 Order and 173 Order) are hereby Affirmed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/26/11. (BP)
August 5, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 6 Order of this Court dated October 6, 2005, pursuant to which the plaintiff was granted in forma pauperis status in the above-captioned proceeding, be and it is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff s 2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis herein, be and it is hereby DENIED, and the plaintiff is granted twenty (20) days from the date of this Order within which to pay $250.00, the full amount of the Courts filing fee herein.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/5/2010. (CMM, )
November 4, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 130 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendant's 112 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied, and this action is referred back to the Magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/4/2009. (CMM,)
September 28, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reginald Smith...It is recommended that the motion be denied... Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/28/2009. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?