Catania et al v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Catania and Michael Catania
Defendant: Royal Insurance Company of America, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Gulf States Utilities Company, McCarty Corporation, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Riley Power, Inc., Foster Wheeler, Inc., Royal Indemnity Company, General Electric Company, Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc., Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Anco Insulations, Inc., DSM Copolymer, Inc., Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, The Dow Chemical Company, Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. and The Travelers Insurance Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Foster Wheeler LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation and Celotex Asbestos Settlement Trust
Case Number: 3:2005cv01418
Filed: December 21, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: P.I. : Asbestos Office
Presiding Judge: James J Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting #387 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to dft McCarty Corporation. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/14/10. (BP, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #388 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to dft Eagle, Inc. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/14/10. (BP, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #384 Motion to Dismiss claims asserted against Anco Insulations. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/13/10. (PAH, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 388 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Eagle, Inc.. (Kohn, Susan)
September 9, 2010 Filing 387 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by McCarty Corporation. (Kohn, Susan)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting #385 Joint MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/4/2010. (CMM, )
September 2, 2010 Filing 385 Joint MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order)(Redmann, David) Modified on 9/2/2010 to edit text. (CMM,)
August 30, 2010 Filing 384 Joint MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Joffe, Margaret) Modified on 8/30/2010 to edit text. (CMM,)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #382 Joint Motion for Partial Voluntary Dismissal as to dft Royal Indemnity Company only. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/26/10. (BP, )
August 25, 2010 Filing 382 Joint for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Kristen Catania, Michael Catania, Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Donna) Modified on 8/25/2010 to edit title (BP, ).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 60 DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL...This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/2/2010. (CMM, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting #369 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena and ORDERS that the Trial Subpoena directed to Reuel L. Anderson, Jr. BE QUASHED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/23/2010. (JDL, )
July 22, 2010 Filing 379 MOTION to Adopt #369 MOTION to Strike Page Line Designations of Plaintiffs' Witness Marie-Christine Aubry filed by Anco Insulations, Inc. by Eagle, Inc.. (Guidry, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 378 MOTION to Adopt #369 MOTION to Exclude Page Line Designations of Plaintiffs' Witness Marie-Christine Aubry filed by Anco Insulations, Inc. by McCarty Corporation. (Guidry, James)
July 21, 2010 Filing 377 Witness List by Foster Wheeler LLC. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Faust, Sheri)
July 21, 2010 Filing 376 MOTION to Adopt #369 MOTION to Strike Page Line Designations of Plaintiffs' Witness Marie-Christine Aubry filed by Anco Insulations, Inc. by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Young, Donna)
July 21, 2010 Filing 375 Witness List by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Joffe, Margaret)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #370 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Francis Philip Accardo for Royal Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/21/10. (BP, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #368 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Douglas R. Elliott for Anco Insulations, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/21/10. (BP, )
July 21, 2010 Filing 372 Witness List by Royal Insurance Company of America. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Young, Donna)
July 21, 2010 Filing 371 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena directed to Reuel L. Anderson Jr. by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit A to Memo in Support of Motion to Quahs, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Joffe, Margaret)
July 21, 2010 Filing 370 MOTION to Enroll Francis P. Accardo as Additional Attorney by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Donna)
July 21, 2010 Filing 369 MOTION to Exclude Page Line Designations of Plaintiffs' Witness Marie-Christine Aubry by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit B to Memo in Support, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Joffe, Margaret) Modified on 7/21/2010 to edit text. (CMM,)
July 21, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #370 MOTION to Enroll Francis P. Accardo as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CMM, )
July 20, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #368 MOTION to Enroll Douglas R. Elliott as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 368 MOTION to Enroll Douglas R. Elliott as Additional Attorney by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Joffe, Margaret)
July 19, 2010 Filing 367 Witness List by Pharmacia Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Redmann, David)
July 19, 2010 Filing 366 Witness List by Royal Insurance Company of America. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Young, Donna)
July 19, 2010 Filing 365 Witness List by Eagle, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Guidry, James)
July 19, 2010 Filing 364 Witness List by McCarty Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Guidry, James)
July 19, 2010 Filing 363 Witness List by Foster Wheeler LLC. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Faust, Sheri)
July 19, 2010 Filing 362 Witness List by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Joffe, Margaret)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 RULING AND ORDER deferring to trial #249 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Testimony and/or Evidence Relating to the Survival Claims filed by Royal Insurance Company of America, #258 MOTION in Limine on Survival Damages filed by Pharmacia Corporation, #254 MOTION in Limine & Memorandum filed by Anco Insulations, Inc.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 RULING and ORDER granting #247 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of pre death loss of consortium damages. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/2010. (CMM,)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RULING AND ORDER denying #257 MOTION in Limine filed by Foster Wheeler, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 RULING AND ORDER deferring to trial #261 MOTION in Limine on Prior Irrelevant Medicals filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 RULING: Accordingly, it is ordered that dft's #248 motion in limine to preclude lay opinion testimony regarding whether particular products released asbestos fibers is deferred to trial. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/2010. (CMM,)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 RULING AND ORDER deferring to trial #262 MOTION in Limine On Settlements filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 RULING AND ORDER deferring to trial #260 MOTION in Limine on Collateral Sources filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 RULING AND ORDER granting #250 MOTION in Limine to Strike All Allegations of Fraud Against Royal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RULING AND ORDER granting #246 MOTION in Limine to Require all Parties to Provide Page and Line Designations of the Transcribed Testimony and Designations for any Video that they Seek to Introduce at Trial. All parties shall submit page and line designations of transcribed testimony and videos 7 days prior to trial, and counter-designations or counter-portions 3 days prior to trial. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 RULING AND ORDER denying #244 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Reference to the Financial Status of Any Party. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 RULING and ORDER granting #245 Motion in Limine, with the qualification that rebuttal witnesses are not subject to this order and the notification period begins only after the jury is selected and seated.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/2010. (CMM,)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #348 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to dft General Electric Company only. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/10. (BP, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #347 Motion to Dismiss the claims currently asserted against Viacom Inc., by plaintiffs, Michael Catania and Kristen Catania in this matter.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/2010. (CMM,)
July 16, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 7/19/2010. Brief due by 7/23/2010. (BP, )
July 14, 2010 Filing 348 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Voluntary Dismissalby Kristen Catania, Michael Catania, General Electric Company. (Crosby, Michele)
July 14, 2010 Filing 347 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Kristen Catania, Michael Catania, Viacom, Inc.. (Crosby, Michele)
July 7, 2010 Filing 346 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Phyllis Guy on July 6, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 345 Witness List by Kristen Catania, Michael Catania. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 344 RESPONSE Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List and Bench Book Exhibits filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Faust, Sheri)
July 6, 2010 Filing 343 Witness List by Royal Insurance Company of America. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Young, Donna)
July 6, 2010 Filing 342 Exhibit List by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Pages 1-35, #2 Exhibit 1, Pages 36-70, #3 Exhibit 1, Pages 71-105, #4 Exhibit 2)(Faust, Sheri)
July 6, 2010 Filing 341 Witness List by Foster Wheeler LLC. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Faust, Sheri)
July 6, 2010 Filing 340 Exhibit List Bench Book of Exhibits by Anco Insulations, Inc... (Joffe, Margaret)
July 6, 2010 Filing 339 Exhibit List by McCarty Corporation.. (Guidry, James)
July 6, 2010 Filing 338 Witness List by McCarty Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Guidry, James)
July 6, 2010 Filing 337 Exhibit List by Eagle, Inc... (Guidry, James)
July 6, 2010 Filing 336 Witness List by Eagle, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Guidry, James)
July 6, 2010 Filing 335 RESPONSE Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits filed by McCarty Corporation. (Guidry, James)
July 6, 2010 Filing 334 RESPONSE Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits filed by Eagle, Inc.. (Guidry, James)
July 6, 2010 Filing 333 Joint Objections to Plaintiffs' PROPOSED JURY CHARGES by Anco Insulations, Inc. (Joffe, Margaret) Modified on 7/6/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 332 Joint Objections to PROPOSED JURY CHARGES Submitted by Plaintiffs by Anco Insulations, Inc.(Joffe, Margaret) Modified on 7/6/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 331 RESPONSE Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits filed by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Young, Donna)
July 6, 2010 Filing 330 RESPONSE Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Foster, Darryl)
July 6, 2010 Filing 329 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Russell Reno on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 328 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. R. Scott Thurston on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 327 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Royal Indemnity Company, through its agent, Louisiana Secretary of State on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 326 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Shael Wolfson on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 325 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Victor Reno on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 324 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Reuel "Sonny" Anderson on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 323 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Lucy Giordano on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 322 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Peter Giordano on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 321 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Columbus Daigle on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 320 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. Michael McCarthy on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 319 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. Gerald Militello on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 318 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Leon Campiere on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 317 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Fred Schuber Jr. on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 316 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Fred Schuber, Jr., through his agent, Susan Kohn on June 28, 2010 (Clement, Jonathan)
July 6, 2010 Filing 315 Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List and Bench Book Exhibits by Anco Insulations, Inc. (Joffe, Margaret) Modified on 7/6/2010 to edit text (JDL, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 314 BENCH BOOK filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (11 disks containing electronic copies of Exhibits, Final Exhibit List and Objections to Pltfs Exhibits List and Bench Book Exhibits.)(JDL, )
July 6, 2010 Filing 313 Exhibit List by Anco Insulations, Inc... (Joffe, Margaret) Modified on 7/6/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 312 Witness List by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Joffe, Margaret)
July 6, 2010 Filing 311 Joint RESPONSE Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Jury Interrogatories and Verdict filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Foster, Darryl)
July 5, 2010 Filing 310 Witness List by Kristen Catania, Michael Catania. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Clement, Jonathan)
July 5, 2010 Filing 309 RESPONSE to #119 Exhibit List, #118 Exhibit List, #116 Witness List, #114 Exhibit List, #115 Witness List (Plaintiffs' Objection to All Defendants' Exhibits) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Jonathan)
July 5, 2010 Filing 308 RESPONSE to #305 Proposed Voir Dire Questions of defendants (Plaintiffs' objections) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Roussel, Gerolyn)
July 5, 2010 Filing 307 RESPONSE to #301 Proposed Jury Interrogatories of Defendants (Plaintiffs' objections) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Roussel, Gerolyn)
July 5, 2010 Filing 306 RESPONSE to #303 Proposed Jury Charges of Defendants(Plaintiffs' Objections) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Roussel, Gerolyn)
July 2, 2010 Filing 305 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Eagle, Inc.. (Guidry, James)
July 2, 2010 Filing 304 Witness List by Pharmacia Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Foster, Darryl)
July 2, 2010 Filing 303 PROPOSED JURY INTERROGATORIES by Anco Insulations, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, McCarty Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Royal Insurance Company of America.. (Faust, Sheri)
July 2, 2010 Filing 302 Exhibit List (Final) by Royal Insurance Company of America.. (Young, Donna)
July 2, 2010 Filing 301 Proposed Jury Interrogatories by Anco Insulations, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, McCarty Corporation, Pharmacia Corporation, Royal Insurance Company of America. (Young, Donna)
July 1, 2010 Filing 300 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, John)
July 1, 2010 Filing 299 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Roussel, Perry)
July 1, 2010 Filing 298 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by McCarty Corporation. (Guidry, James) (Main Document 298 replaced on 7/1/2010) (CMM, ). Modified on 7/1/2010 to rotate pages. (CMM)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #293 Motion to Enroll James Richard Guidry for Eagle, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/30/2010. (CMM, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #291 Motion to Enroll James Richard Guidry for McCarty Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/30/2010. (CMM,)
June 29, 2010 Filing 295 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Eagle, Inc.. (Kinler, Douglas) (Main Document 295 replaced on 6/29/2010) (BP, ). Modified on 6/29/2010 to correct orientation of document (BP, ).
June 29, 2010 Filing 294 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by McCarty Corporation. (Kinler, Douglas) (Main Document 294 replaced on 6/29/2010) (JDL, ). Modified on 6/29/2010 to replace upside down document (JDL, ).
June 29, 2010 Filing 293 MOTION to Enroll James R. Guidry as Additional Attorney by Eagle, Inc.. (Kinler, Douglas)
June 29, 2010 EMAIL DELIVERY FAILURE as to Attorney Troy Bell regarding #295 Affidavit. Action taken: email address removed. Attorney is no longer with the firm.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (CMM,)
June 29, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #291 MOTION to Enroll James R. Guidry as Additional Attorney, #293 MOTION to Enroll James R. Guidry as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
June 28, 2010 Notice of Docket Entry Modification by Deputy Clerk regarding 292 MOTION to Enroll James R. Guidry as Additional Attorney. There is no document for this entry. Incorrect pdf attached. Attorney refiled corrected motion. See record document 293. (BP, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 292 There is no document for this entry. Incorrect pdf attached. Attorney refiled motion. (Kinler, Douglas) Modified on 6/29/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
June 28, 2010 Filing 291 MOTION to Enroll James R. Guidry as Additional Attorney by McCarty Corporation. (Kinler, Douglas) Modified on 6/29/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 RULING AND ORDER: Before the Court are several motions in limine, motions to adopt, and motions for joinder. The Court construes the following motions, regardless of titles, as motions to adopt: Motion in Limine (doc. 251), Motion in Limine (doc. 252), Motion in Limine (doc. 253), Motion in Limine Adoption (doc. 255, ) Motion to Adopt Motion in Limine (doc. 256), Motion to Adopt (doc. 277), Motion to Adopt (doc. 278), Motion for Joinder (doc. 280), Motion for Joinder (doc. 281) and Motion for Joinder (doc. 282). To the extent that these motions raise substantive arguments, the Court will address those arguments when it rules upon the underlying motions. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the above motions as adopting motions or oppositions filed before the Court. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/25/2010. (JDL, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 289 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Pharmacia Corporation. (Foster, Darryl) (Main Document 289 replaced on 6/28/2010) (JDL, ).
June 25, 2010 Filing 288 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Joffe, Margaret)
June 25, 2010 Filing 287 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Young, Donna)
June 22, 2010 Filing 286 Minute Entry/Notice to Counsel for proceedings held before Judge James J. Brady: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/22/2010. Counsel for Royal Indemnity requested trial be continued. The Court DENIED the motion for continuance. (JDL, )
June 21, 2010 Filing 285 Additional Exhibits to #257 MOTION in Limine by All Plaintiffs. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 9, #2 Exhibit No. 10, #3 Exhibit No. 11, #4 Exhibit No. 12, #5 Exhibit No. 13, #6 Exhibit No. 14, #7 Exhibit No. 15, #8 Exhibit No. 16, #9 Exhibit No. 17, #10 Exhibit No. 18, #11 Exhibit No. 19)(Clement, Lauren)
June 21, 2010 Filing 284 Additional Exhibits to #257 MOTION in Limine by All Plaintiffs. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 5, #2 Exhibit No. 6, #3 Exhibit No. 7, #4 Exhibit No. 8)(Clement, Lauren)
June 21, 2010 Filing 283 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #257 MOTION in Limine filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit No. 3, #4 Exhibit No. 4)(Clement, Lauren)
June 21, 2010 Filing 282 MOTION for Joinder with #276 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Pharmacia Corporation by Foster Wheeler LLC, Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (Faust, Sheri)
June 21, 2010 Filing 281 MOTION for Joinder with #275 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Pharmacia Corporation by Foster Wheeler LLC, Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (Faust, Sheri)
June 21, 2010 Filing 280 MOTION for Joinder with #274 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Pharmacia Corporation by Foster Wheeler LLC, Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (Faust, Sheri)
June 21, 2010 Filing 279 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #260 MOTION in Limine on Collateral Sources, #261 MOTION in Limine on Prior Irrelevant Medicals, #262 MOTION in Limine On Settlements filed by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Young, Donna)
June 21, 2010 Filing 278 MOTION to Adopt Pharmacia's Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by Eagle, Inc.. (Kinler, Douglas)
June 21, 2010 Filing 277 MOTION to Adopt Pharmacia's Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by McCarty Corporation. (Kinler, Douglas)
June 21, 2010 Filing 276 Opposition to Plaintiffs' #262 MOTION in Limine On Settlements filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
June 21, 2010 Filing 275 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Prior Medical Conditions #261 MOTION in Limine filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
June 21, 2010 Filing 274 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Collateral Source #260 MOTION in Limine filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
June 18, 2010 Filing 273 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #249 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Testimony and/or Evidence Relating to the Survival Claims, #258 MOTION in Limine on Survival Damages, #254 MOTION in Limine & Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #250 MOTION in Limine to Strike All Allegations of Fraud Against Royal, #253 MOTION in Limine & Supporting Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #248 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Lay Opinion Testimony Regarding Whether Products Released Asbestos Fibers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #246 MOTION in Limine to Require all Parties to Provide Page and Line Designations of the Transcribed Testimony and Designations for any Video that they Seek to Introduce at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #244 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Reference to the Financial Status of Any Party filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #245 MOTION in Limine to Require Plaintiffs to Disclose the Names of Witnesses Twenty-Four Hours Prior to the Date of Their Anticipated Testimony at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 267 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #247 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence of Pre-Death Loss of Consortium Damages, #259 MOTION in Limine on Pre-Death Loss of Consortium filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #251 MOTION in Limine filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #256 MOTION to Adopt #249 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Testimony and/or Evidence Relating to the Survival Claims filed by Royal Insurance Company of America, #247 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence of Pre-Death Loss of Consortium Damag MOTION to Adopt #249 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Testimony and/or Evidence Relating to the Survival Claims filed by Royal Insurance Company of America, #247 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence of Pre-Death Loss of Consortium Damag filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 264 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #252 MOTION in Limine filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 18, 2010 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #255 MOTION in Limine Adoption filed by All Plaintiffs. (Clement, Lauren)
June 11, 2010 Filing 262 MOTION in Limine On Settlements by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Roussel, Perry)
June 11, 2010 Filing 261 MOTION in Limine on Prior Irrelevant Medicals by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Roussel, Perry)
June 11, 2010 Filing 260 MOTION in Limine on Collateral Sources by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Roussel, Perry)
June 11, 2010 Filing 259 MOTION in Limine on Pre-Death Loss of Consortium by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Redmann, David)
June 11, 2010 Filing 258 MOTION in Limine on Survival Damages by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Redmann, David)
June 11, 2010 Filing 257 MOTION in Limine by Foster Wheeler LLC, Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3)(Faust, Sheri)
June 11, 2010 Filing 256 MOTION to Adopt #249 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Testimony and/or Evidence Relating to the Survival Claims filed by Royal Insurance Company of America, #247 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence of Pre-Death Loss of Consortium Damages filed by Royal Insurance Company of America by Foster Wheeler LLC, Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (Faust, Sheri)
June 11, 2010 Filing 255 MOTION in Limine Adoption by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Joffe, Margaret)
June 11, 2010 Filing 254 MOTION in Limine & Memorandum by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Joffe, Margaret) (Main Document 254 replaced on 6/22/2010) (LSM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2010: #2 Memorandum in Support) (LSM, ).
June 11, 2010 Filing 253 MOTION in Limine & Supporting Memorandum by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Joffe, Margaret) (Main Document 253 replaced on 6/22/2010) (LSM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2010: #2 Memorandum in Support ) (LSM, ).
June 11, 2010 Filing 252 MOTION in Limine by Eagle, Inc.. (Kinler, Douglas)
June 11, 2010 Filing 251 MOTION in Limine by McCarty Corporation. (Kinler, Douglas)
June 10, 2010 Filing 250 MOTION in Limine to Strike All Allegations of Fraud Against Royal by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 10, 2010 Filing 249 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Testimony and/or Evidence Relating to the Survival Claims by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 10, 2010 Filing 248 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Lay Opinion Testimony Regarding Whether Products Released Asbestos Fibers by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 10, 2010 Filing 247 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence of Pre-Death Loss of Consortium Damages by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 10, 2010 Filing 246 MOTION in Limine to Require all Parties to Provide Page and Line Designations of the Transcribed Testimony and Designations for any Video that they Seek to Introduce at Trial by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 10, 2010 Filing 245 MOTION in Limine to Require Plaintiffs to Disclose the Names of Witnesses Twenty-Four Hours Prior to the Date of Their Anticipated Testimony at Trial by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 10, 2010 Filing 244 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Reference to the Financial Status of Any Party by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Young, Donna)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE AND ORDER : Considering that this matter is set for jury trial commencing 7/26/10, cnsl are advised of the procedures stated herein that the court intends to utilize to take advantage of courtroom technology. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/7/10. (BP, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Donna Mannina Young for Royal Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/12/2010. (JDL, )
April 12, 2010 Filing 241 MOTION to Enroll Donna M. Young as Additional Attorney by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pugh, Lawrence)
April 12, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #241 MOTION to Enroll Donna M. Young as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LSM, )
March 24, 2010 Filing 240 Amended Order/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James J. Brady: Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2010. All motions in limine, including Daubert motions, shall be filed 45 days prior to trial. The parties shall comply with the deadlines as stated herein.. (LSM, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER: In accordance with the preceding pretrial order, all parties shall comply with the instructions stated with regard to (1) Final Affidavit of Settlement Efforts, (2) Joint Jury Instructions/Interrogatories, and (3) Bench Books.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2010. (LSM, )
March 24, 2010 Filing 238 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Judge James J. Brady: Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2010. All motions in limine, including Daubert motions, shall be filed 45 days prior to trial. The parties shall comply with the deadlines as stated herein.. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. (LSM, )
March 10, 2010 Filing 237 Proposed Pretrial Order By All Parties by Kristen Catania, Michael Catania. (Roussel, Gerolyn)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #235 Motion to Withdraw Attorney and Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Nicole M. Loup is withdrawn as counsel of record for Royal Insurance Company of America. Attorneys Jacqueline Romero and William W. Sentell, III are enrolled as additional counsel of record for Royal Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/5/2010. (JDL, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 235 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Jacqueline A. Romero and William W. Sentell, III as Additional Attorney by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pugh, Lawrence)
March 4, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #235 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Jacqueline A. Romero and William W. Sentell, III as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL, )
February 19, 2010 FAILURE TO PAY TRIENNIAL DUES as to Attorney Claude Frederick Bosworth. Action taken: The attorney's CM/ECF login,password and email address have been removed for failure to comply with ULLR 83.2.3.1M. This attorney is suspended for non-compliance. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
February 3, 2010 Filing 234 UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge James J. Brady. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/10/2010. (LSM, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 233 Second MOTION To Set Jury Trial by Kristen Catania, Michael Catania. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Set Trial, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Roussel, Perry) Modified on 1/27/2010 to edit text (BP, ).
November 23, 2009 Filing 232 RULING denying #200 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/23/09. (BP, )
November 17, 2009 Filing 231 RULING denying #202 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #203 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/17/09. (BP, )
November 17, 2009 Filing 230 RULING denying #201 Motion to exclude Plaintiffs' expert testimony and for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/17/09. (BP, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #198 MOTION to Strike Certain Defense Witnesses as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/16/09. (BP, )
October 22, 2009 Filing 228 RULING denying #195 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/22/2009. (NLT, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 227 Memorandum in RESPONSE to #224 REPLY to #218 Memorandum in Opposition to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment based on No Duty filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #225 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Pharmacia's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's No-Duty Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/15/09. (BP, )
October 14, 2009 Filing 225 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Pharmacia's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's No-Duty Motion for Summary Judgment by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Response to Pharmacia's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's No-Duty Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Leave of Court to File Memorandum)(Roussel, Perry)
October 14, 2009 Filing 224 REPLY to #218 Memorandum in Opposition to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment based on No Duty filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (BP, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 MOTION for Leave to File reply memorandum supporting motion for summary judgment (no duty) filed by Pharmacia Corporation. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/13/09. (BP, )
October 12, 2009 Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to File reply memorandum supporting motion for summary judgment (no duty) by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum Supporting No-Duty Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed order)(Redmann, David)
October 6, 2009 Filing 221 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #220 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6(a) - Victor Reno Deposition, #2 Exhibit 6(b) - Victor Reno Deposition, #3 Exhibit 7 - Barbara Catania Deposition, #4 Exhibit 7(a) - Barbara Catania Deposition)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #200 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings regarding Premises Liability Claims MOTION in Limine regarding Premises Liability Claims filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Pharmacia's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #4 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit 3 - Victor Reno Deposition, #6 Exhibit 4 - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #7 Exhibit 4(a) - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #8 Exhibit 4(b) - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #9 Exhibit 4(c) - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #10 Exhibit 5 - Victor Reno Itemized Statement of Earnings)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 219 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #218 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - R. Emmet Kelly Deposition, #2 Exhibit 6 - R. Emmet Kelly Deposition)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment based on No Duty filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Pharmacia's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1 - Frank Parker Deposition, #4 Exhibit 1(a) - Frank Parker Deposition, #5 Exhibit 1(b) - Frank Parker Deposition, #6 Exhibit 2 - Walsh Healey Act, #7 Exhibit 3 - Wagner Article, #8 Exhibit 4 - Petition for Damages)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 217 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lack of Duty) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lack of Duty) filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Royal's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1 - Trial and Scheduling Order, #4 Exhibit 2 - Frank Parker Deposition, #5 Exhibit 2(a) - Frank Parker Deposition, #6 Exhibit 2(b) - Frank Parker Deposition, #7 Exhibit 3 - Walsh Healey Act, #8 Exhibit 4 - Wagner Study)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #201 MOTION exclude expert testimony (Daubert)MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION exclude expert testimony (Daubert) filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Opposition to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Attachment Plaintiffs' Statement of Contested Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Clement, Jonathan)
October 6, 2009 Filing 215 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #210 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19 - James Millette Deposition, #2 Exhibit 19(a) - James Millette Deposition, #3 Exhibit 19(b) - James Millette Deposition, #4 Exhibit 19(c) - James Millette Deposition, #5 Exhibit 20 - Victor Reno Social Security Itemized Statement of Earnings, #6 Exhibit 21 - Russell Reno Social Security Itemized Statement of Earnings, #7 Exhibit 22 - Peter Giordano Social Security Itemized Statement of Earnings)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 214 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #210 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13(b) - James Millette Deposition, #2 Exhibit 13(c) - James Millette Deposition, #3 Exhibit 13(d) - James Millette Deposition, #4 Exhibit 14 - Samuel Hammar Deposition, #5 Exhibit 14(a) - Samuel Hammar Deposition, #6 Exhibit 14(b) - Samuel Hammar Deposition, #7 Exhibit 15 - Trial Magazine Article, #8 Exhibit 16 - Helsinki Criteria, #9 Exhibit 17 - Environmental Household Exposures Article)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 213 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #210 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11(a) - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #2 Exhibit 11(b) - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #3 Exhibit 11(c) - Columbus Daigle Deposition, #4 Exhibit 12 - Peter Giordano Deposition, #5 Exhibit 12(a) - Peter Giordano Deposition, #6 Exhibit 13 - James Millette Deposition)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 212 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #210 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7(d) - Frank Parker Deposition, #2 Exhibit 7(e) - Frank Parker Deposition, #3 Exhibit 8 - Mesothelioma Article, #4 Exhibit 9 - Russell Reno Deposition, #5 Exhibit 9(a) - Russell Reno Deposition, #6 Exhibit 10 - Victor Reno Deposition)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 211 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Royal's Motion for Summary Judgment Additional Exhibits to #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #210 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4(a) - Peter Giordano Deposition, #2 Exhibit 5 - Phyllis Reno Guy Deposition, #3 Exhibit 6 - Lucy Reno Giordano Deposition, #4 Exhibit 7 - Frank Parker Deposition, #5 Exhibit 7(a) - Frank Parker Deposition, #6 Exhibit 7(b) - Frank Parker Deposition)(Roussel, Perry)
October 6, 2009 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Royal's Statement of Facts, #2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Barbara Catania, #4 Exhibit 1(a) - Deposition of Barbara Catania, #5 Exhibit 2 - Jennie Bueche Deposition, #6 Exhibit 3 - Victor Reno Deposition, #7 Exhibit 3(a) - Victor Reno Deposition, #8 Exhibit 3(b) - Victor Reno Deposition)(Roussel, Perry)
October 5, 2009 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #198 MOTION to Strike Certain Defense Witnesses filed filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Redmann, David)
September 18, 2009 Filing 208 RULING denying #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (basic no-exposure) filed by Pharmacia Corporation. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/18/09. (BP, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER denying #199 MOTION to Set Trial at this time. Once the pretrial motions have been resolved, the court will set a pretrial conference and the trial will be set at that time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defense Experts and Fact Witnesses (doc. 198) be referred to the magistrate judge as this relates to discovery and the scheduling order set by the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/17/09. (BP, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 206 NOTICE to Parties Regarding #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lack of Duty), #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #201 MOTION exclude expert testimony (Daubert) and MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #200 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings regarding Premises Liability Claims and MOTION in Limine regarding Premises Liability Claims, #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment based on No Duty. Opposition to these motions shall be filed on or before OCTOBER 6, 2009, at which time the matter shall be submitted. No extensions of time and no additional briefing will be allowed absent a showing of good cause. The motions for oral argument (docs.196 and 205) are DENIED at this time. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/17/09. (BP, )
September 17, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #198 MOTION to Strike Certain Defense Witnesses filed. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
September 16, 2009 Filing 205 MOTION for Oral Argument on #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lack of Duty) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lack of Duty) by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Loup, Nicole)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #197 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to The Dow Chemical Company only, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/15/09. (BP, )
September 16, 2009 Filing 203 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lack of Duty) by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Pugh, Lawrence)
September 15, 2009 Filing 202 MOTION for Summary Judgment based on No Duty by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1)(Redmann, David)
September 15, 2009 Filing 201 MOTION exclude expert testimony (Daubert), MOTION for Summary Judgment (partial) by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Redmann, David) Modified on 9/16/2009 to correct relief type (BP, ).
September 15, 2009 Filing 200 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings regarding Premises Liability Claims, MOTION in Limine regarding Premises Liability Claims by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Redmann, David)
September 15, 2009 Filing 199 MOTION to Set Trial filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial, #2 Proposed Order)(Fogleman, Kelly)
September 15, 2009 Filing 198 MOTION to Strike Certain Defense Witnesses filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defense Witnesses, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Fogleman, Kelly)
September 14, 2009 Filing 197 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by The Dow Chemical Company, Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Sigler, Jennifer)
September 14, 2009 Filing 196 MOTION for Oral Argument on #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Loup, Nicole)
September 14, 2009 Filing 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Loup, Nicole)
August 25, 2009 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM in Response to Dft's Reply to Pla's Memorandum in Opposition to #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (basic no-exposure) filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #191 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's Basic No-Exposure Motion for Summary Judgment filed filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 8/24/09. (BP, )
August 24, 2009 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #191 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's Basic No-Exposure Motion for Summary Judgment filed filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
August 21, 2009 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's Basic No-Exposure Motion for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacia's Basic No-Exposure Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 24 - Fremin Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 25 - Danos Judgment, #4 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Memorandum)(Roussel, Perry)
August 17, 2009 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to #189 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,,,, #185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #187 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,,, #183 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #186 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (basic no-exposure), #188 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
August 3, 2009 Filing 189 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #187 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,,, #186 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, #185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #188 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Deposition of James Millette (9/12/03) (Part 1), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Deposition of James Millette (9/12/03) (Part 2), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Deposition of James Millette (9/12/03) (Part 3), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Deposition of James Millette (9/12/03) (Part 4), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Deposition of Samuel Hammar, M.D. (Part 1), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Deposition of Samuel Hammar, M.D. (Part 2), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Deposition of Samuel Hammar, M.D. (Part 3), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Trial Magazine Article, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Helsinki Criteria, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - Environmental Household Exposures Article, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - Judgment 11-10-03)(Roussel, Perry)
August 3, 2009 Filing 188 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #187 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,,, #186 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Columbus Daigle (Part 1), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Columbus Daigle (Part 2), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Columbus Daigle (Part 3), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Columbus Daigle (Part 4), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Affidavit of Frank Parker, III, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Deposition of James Millette (3/13/02))(Roussel, Perry)
August 3, 2009 Filing 187 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #186 Additional Exhibit to Main Document,, #185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Article, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Russell Reno (Part 1), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Russell Reno (Part 2), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Social Security Itemized Statement of Earnings for Victor Reno, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Victor Reno (7/24/96), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Deposition of Victor Reno (1/26/00), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Pharmacia's Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Gilbert Tarver (Part 1), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Gilbert Tarver (Part 2), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Gilbert Tarver (Part 3))(Roussel, Perry)
August 3, 2009 Filing 186 Plaintiffs' Additional Exhibits to #185 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Peter Giordano (Part 1), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Peter Giordano (Part 2), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Phyllis Reno Guy, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Lucy Reno Guy, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Frank Parker, III (Part 1), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Frank Parker, III (Part 2), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Frank Parker, III (Part 3))(Roussel, Perry)
August 3, 2009 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (basic no-exposure) filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Pharmacia's Statement of Facts, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Barbara Catania, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Barbara Catania (Part 2), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Jennie Bueche, #6 Exhibit Deposition of Victor Reno (02/06/02) Part 1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Victor Reno (02/06/02) Part 2, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Victor Reno (02/06/02) Part 3)(Roussel, Perry)
July 16, 2009 Filing 184 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby: Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2009. #172 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) filed by Royal Insurance Company of America is granted. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/15/2009. #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania is granted as to any July deposition dates. The parties shall cooperate in the scheduling of any remaining depositions as stated herein. (BP, )
July 16, 2009 Filing 183 Briefing Notice regarding #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (basic no-exposure) : Opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before August 3, 2009. Any reply brief shall be filed within 15 days of the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/16/09. (BP, )
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Opposition (re Expert Discovery Deadline) filed by Royal Insurance Company of America (see document #180 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/15/09. (BP, )
July 15, 2009 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Opposition (re Expert Discovery Deadline) by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Opposition (re Expert Discovery Deadline), #2 Attachment Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File)(Pugh, Lawrence)
July 15, 2009 Filing 180 REPLY TO #178 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Pugh, Lawrence)
July 15, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #181 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Opposition (re Expert Discovery Deadline). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
July 14, 2009 Filing 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (basic no-exposure) by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Redmann, David)
July 13, 2009 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #172 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Roussel, Gerolyn)
July 13, 2009 Filing 177 REPLY to #171 Memorandum in Opposition to #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy filed by all plaintiffs. (BP, )
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #173 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Dft's Opposition to Motion to Quash filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/13/09. (BP, )
July 12, 2009 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Support of #172 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: defendants shall file any opposition to the motion to quash by noon on Tuesday, July 14, 2009. Telephone Conference set for 7/16/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deposition of Dr. McCarthy is continued without date until such time as the motion to quash has been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/10/09. (BP, )
July 10, 2009 Filing 173 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Dft's Opposition to Motion to Quash(Roussel, Gerolyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2009: #1 proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Dft's Opposition to Motion to Quash) (BP, ). Modified on 7/10/2009 to correct event type and reattach documents in correct order (BP, ).
July 10, 2009 Filing 172 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadline, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pugh, Lawrence)
July 10, 2009 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy, #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Redmann, David)
July 10, 2009 Filing 170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Roussel, Gerolyn)
July 10, 2009 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy by all plaintiffs. (This entry is for statistical purposes only. Second part of two part motion. See record document #170 for image.) (BP, )
July 10, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy, MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #170 MOTION to Quash The Deposition of Dr. Michael P. McCarthy. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
July 10, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #173 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Dft's Opposition to Motion to Quash. This document is a motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
July 10, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #172 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline) MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Expert Discovery Deadline). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Motion to Dismiss. Party(s) The Travelers Indemnity Company and The Travelers Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/02/09. (PAH, )
July 2, 2009 Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss by The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #166 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Claude F. Bosworth is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 5/28/09. (BP, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 166 MOTION for Claude F. Bosworth to Withdraw as Attorney by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
May 27, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #166 MOTION for Claude F. Bosworth to Withdraw as Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Sheri S. Faust shall SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING within 10 days, why he/she should not be held in contempt of court or other appropriate sanctions imposed for failure to pay the triennial fee. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2009.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/26/09. (BP, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Claude F. Bosworth shall SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING within 10 days, why he/she should not be held in contempt of court or other appropriate sanctions imposed for failure to pay the triennial fee. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2009.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/26/09. (BP, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #161 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Experts shall be deposed by 7/13/2009. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 8/24/2009. Pharmacia's #150 Motion to Bar Recovery of Certain Economic Losses or, Alternately, to Compel Responses to Economic-Issues Discovery (rec. doc. 150), is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 5/15/09. (BP, )
May 14, 2009 Filing 162 RULING granting #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed filed by Pharmacia Corporation, and granting #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Royal Insurance Company of America, Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/13/09. (BP, )
May 13, 2009 Filing 161 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; proposed order)(Redmann, David)
May 13, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #161 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
April 27, 2009 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #150 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Economic Issues Discovery MOTION to Strike Economic Evidence and Testimony filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Clement, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2009: #4 Exhibit 4 (orientation corrected), #5 Exhibit 5 (orientation corrected)) (BP, ).
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying #154 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. MOTION to Strike #140 Plaintiffs' Memorandum filed by Pharmacia Corporation is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/23/09. (BP, )
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER : Oral argument set for 4/28/09 is cancelled. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/22/09. (BP, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #155 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Jonathan Brett Clement, Lauren R Clement, and Kelly C. Fogleman for Michael Catania and Kristen Catania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/21/09. (BP, )
April 21, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION to Strike #140 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed, #143 Statement of Material Facts, #149 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #141 Additional Exhibit to Main Document, #142 Additional Exhibit to Main Document, #154 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Replies to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacias Motion to Dismiss Survival Action and to the Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Survival Claims Filed on, #151 Reply,, MOTION for Leave to File last-word memorandum supporting prescription motion by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; last-word reply, #2 Proposed Pleading; order)(Redmann, David)
April 21, 2009 Filing 155 MOTION to Enroll Jonathan B. Clement, Lauren R. Clement, and Kelly C. Fogleman as Additional Attorney of Record. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record)(Roussel, Perry)
April 21, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #155 MOTION to Enroll Jonathan B. Clement, Lauren R. Clement, and Kelly C. Fogleman as Additional Attorney of Record. Filed. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Replies to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Pharmacias Motion to Dismiss Survival Action and to the Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing the Survival Claims Filed on Behalf of Defendants, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Royal Indemnity Company, and Chemtura Corporation. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Response to Defendants' Replies to Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)(Roussel, Perry)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE AND ORDER : Oral Argument reset for 4/28/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/16/09. (BP, )
April 13, 2009 Filing 152 Joint REPLY TO #140 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #149 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Action Claims filed by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Pugh, Lawrence)
April 13, 2009 Filing 151 REPLY TO #140 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed, #143 Statement of Material Facts, #149 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #141 Additional Exhibit to Main Document, #142 Additional Exhibit to Main Document filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
April 7, 2009 Filing 150 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Economic Issues Discovery, MOTION to Strike Economic Evidence and Testimony by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Redmann, David)
April 7, 2009 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #150 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Economic Issues Discovery MOTION to Strike Economic Evidence and Testimony. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
April 2, 2009 Filing 149 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed, #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims filed by all plaintiffs. (BP, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #146 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in Support of Pla's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/1/09. (BP, )
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that all claims against Chemtura Corporation, as successor to Chemtura USA Corporation f/k/a Crompton Manufacturing, Inc., f/k/a Uniroyal Chemical Company are hereby STAYED. Counsel for Chemtura shall notify the court in the event that the automatic stay is lifted. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/31/09. (BP, )
April 1, 2009 EMAIL DELIVERY FAILURE as to Attorney Kimberly Delk regarding #146 Motion for Leave to File Document,. Action taken: removed email address. No longer with the firm. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BP, )
March 31, 2009 Filing 146 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in Support of Pla's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order For Leave of Court, #2 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental Memorandum in Support)(Roussel, Perry) Modified on 4/1/2009 to correct title of document (BP, ).
March 24, 2009 Filing 145 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seiler, Scott)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Withdraw and The Dow Chemical Company's participation in the #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims is withdrawn. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/19/09. (BP, )
March 18, 2009 Filing 143 First Statement of Material Facts to #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed, #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims filed by all plaintiffs. (Roussel, Perry)
March 18, 2009 Filing 142 Additional Exhibits to #140 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 6, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 7)(Roussel, Perry)
March 18, 2009 Filing 141 Additional Exhibits to #140 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by all plaintiffs. filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11, Part 5)(Roussel, Perry)
March 18, 2009 Filing 140 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims, #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #15 Statement of Undisputed Facts Statement of Material Facts, #16 Statement of Undisputed Facts Opposition To Defendant's Material Facts)(Roussel, Perry)
March 18, 2009 Filing 139 MOTION to Withdraw #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims by The Dow Chemical Company. (Sigler, Jennifer)
March 18, 2009 Filing 138 Joint STIPULATION by The Dow Chemical Company. (Sigler, Jennifer)
March 18, 2009 Filing 137 Answer to Plaintiffs' First Supplemental and Amendign Petition for Damages ANSWER to Complaint by Eagle, Inc..(Kohn, Susan)
March 18, 2009 Filing 136 Answer to Plaintiffs' First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages ANSWER to Complaint by McCarty Corporation.(Kohn, Susan)
March 17, 2009 Filing 135 Notice of Setting Motion and Oral Argument before JJB on #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims, #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed :...Opposition to the motion for partial SJ shall be filed by 04/02/09. Any reply shall be filed within 15 days of the opposition. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. (PAH, )
March 17, 2009 Motions terminated: #133 MOTION for Oral Argument on #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims MOTION for Oral Argument on #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Royal Insurance Company of America, The Dow Chemical Company, Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc.. This motion is terminated ruled on this date by 135. (PAH, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 134 ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages #86 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, John) Modified on 3/16/2009 to edit text (NLT, ).
March 13, 2009 Filing 133 MOTION for Oral Argument on #132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Royal Insurance Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Seiler, Scott)
March 13, 2009 Filing 132 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Survival Claims by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc., Royal Insurance Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Seiler, Scott) Modified on 3/19/2009 to reflect that The Dow Chemical Company is withdrawn as a participant per order #144 (BP, ).
March 2, 2009 Filing 131 NOTICE regarding #130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed : Opposition to the motion shall be filed by 3/19/09. The mover may file a reply brief within 15 days of the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/2/09. (BP, )
February 27, 2009 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss Survival Action as Prescribed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Redmann, David)
January 12, 2009 Filing 129 Witness List by Royal Insurance Company of America. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Loup, Nicole)
January 5, 2009 Filing 128 Letter to Attorney John Cazale who is Co-Counsel for party Foster Wheeler. Attorney is not admitted to practice in MDLA. (BP, )
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #121 Motion to Substitute Attorney. John J. Hainkel, III for Foster Wheeler, Inc. and Foster Wheeler LLC, Angela M. Bowlin for Foster Wheeler, Inc. and Foster Wheeler LLC, James H. Brown, Jr for Foster Wheeler, Inc. and Foster Wheeler LLC, Sheri Sport Faust for Foster Wheeler, Inc. and Foster Wheeler LLC, Andrew Mark Maestri for Foster Wheeler, Inc. and Foster Wheeler LLC replacing Lynn Luker and Lynn Luker & Associates, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/5/09. (BP, )
December 31, 2008 Filing 126 Exhibit List by The Dow Chemical Company.. (Sigler, Jennifer)
December 31, 2008 Filing 125 Witness List by The Dow Chemical Company. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Sigler, Jennifer)
December 31, 2008 Filing 124 Witness List by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Wilmore, Charles)
December 31, 2008 Filing 123 Exhibit List by The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Insurance Company.. (Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
December 31, 2008 Filing 122 Witness List by The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Insurance Company. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
December 31, 2008 Filing 121 MOTION to Substitute John J. Hainkel, III in place of Lynn Luker as Attorney by Foster Wheeler, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, John)
December 31, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #121 MOTION to Substitute John J. Hainkel, III in place of Lynn Luker as Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
December 30, 2008 Filing 120 Witness List by Royal Insurance Company of America. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Pugh, Lawrence)
December 30, 2008 Filing 119 Exhibit List (Preliminary) by Royal Insurance Company of America.. (Pugh, Lawrence)
December 24, 2008 Filing 118 Exhibit List by Pharmacia Corporation.. (Redmann, David)
December 24, 2008 Filing 117 Witness List by Pharmacia Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Redmann, David)
December 17, 2008 Filing 116 Witness List by Eagle, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Bienvenu, David)
December 17, 2008 Filing 115 Witness List by McCarty Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Bienvenu, David)
December 16, 2008 Filing 114 Exhibit List by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bell, Troy)
December 16, 2008 Filing 113 Witness List by Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Bell, Troy)
December 12, 2008 Filing 112 Witness List by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Roussel, Perry)
December 9, 2008 Filing 111 ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint by The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Insurance Company.(Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
November 26, 2008 Filing 110 Witness List by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (For your free look at document, enter your ECF login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Roussel, Perry)
November 13, 2008 Filing 109 Summons Issued as to Claims Resolution Management Corporation, Celotex Asbestos Settlement Trust. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (BP, )
November 13, 2008 Filing 108 Summons Submitted (Luker, Lynn)
November 13, 2008 Filing 107 Summons Submitted (Luker, Lynn)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Troy Nathan Bell for Foster Wheeler, Inc. and Foster Wheeler LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/12/08. (BP, )
November 11, 2008 Filing 105 Summons Submitted (Luker, Lynn)
November 11, 2008 Filing 104 Summons Submitted (Luker, Lynn)
November 10, 2008 Filing 103 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of Foster Wheeler LLC against Celotex Asbestos Settlement Trust, Claims Resolution Management Corporation, filed by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Luker, Lynn) Modified on 11/12/2008 to correct filer (BP, ).
November 10, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION to Enroll Troy N. Bell as Additional Attorney of Record by Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Luker, Lynn)
November 10, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #102 MOTION to Enroll Troy N. Bell as Additional Attorney of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BP, )
November 6, 2008 Filing 101 ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint by The Dow Chemical Company.(Sigler, Jennifer)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Nicole M. Loup for Royal Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/4/08. (BP, )
November 3, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #99 MOTION to Enroll Nicole M. Loup as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
November 3, 2008 Filing 99 MOTION to Enroll Nicole M. Loup as Additional Attorney by Royal Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order on Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel)(Pugh, Lawrence)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Khristina Miller and Guenton Slawson, Jr. are withdrawn; granting #97 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Sean P. Brady for Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/30/08. (PAH, )
October 29, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #97 MOTION for Khristina DeLuna Miller and Guenton Cyril Slawson, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Enroll Sean P. Brady as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
October 29, 2008 Filing 97 MOTION for Khristina DeLuna Miller and Guenton Cyril Slawson, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney, MOTION to Enroll Sean P. Brady as Additional Attorney by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Seiler, Scott)
October 29, 2008 Filing 96 ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Seiler, Scott)
October 28, 2008 Filing 95 ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint by Royal Insurance Company of America.(Pugh, Lawrence)
October 28, 2008 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania re #86 Amended Complaint (1st Supplemental) (Roussel, Perry)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #90 Motion to Adopt scheduling order and granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion to adopt scheduling order as stated in the order... Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/27/08. (PAH, )
October 27, 2008 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #91 First MOTION To Adopt Scheduling Order (Plaintiffs' motion) filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (Redmann, David)
October 26, 2008 Filing 91 First MOTION To Adopt Scheduling Order by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion To Adopt Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Scheduling Order)(Roussel, Perry)
October 24, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #91 First MOTION To Adopt Scheduling Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
October 24, 2008 Filing 90 MOTION to Adopt #87 Scheduling Conference,, Set Deadlines, by Pharmacia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Pharmacia's proposed scheduling order, #3 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiffs' proposed scheduling order)(Redmann, David)
October 24, 2008 Filing 89 1st Supplemental and Amended ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint by Anco Insulations, Inc..(Kilpatrick, Jennifer)
October 23, 2008 Filing 88 ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint ("First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages") by Pharmacia Corporation.(Redmann, David)
October 16, 2008 Filing 87 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby: Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2008. Either an unopposed motion and proposed scheduling order or an opposed motion and proposed orders in the alternative shall be filed by 10/30/2008. (BP, )
October 9, 2008 Filing 86 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania.(PAH, )
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #80 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/09/08. (PAH, )
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/16/2008 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 09/18/08. (PAH, )
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER...the scheduling conference set for 09/4/08 is canceled and will be reset at a later date.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 08/29/08. (PAH, ) Modified on 9/8/2008 to edit text(PAH, ).
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Withdraw #6 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 08/29/08. (PAH, )
August 21, 2008 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT by all plaintiffs. (Roussel, Perry)
August 19, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Attachment First Supplemental and Amedning Petition for Damages)(Roussel, Perry)
August 19, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #80 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave of Court to File First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to Riley Power Inc.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/31/08. (PAH, )
July 30, 2008 Filing 78 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Riley Power, Inc., Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Rish, Kellie)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2008 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby. Status Report due by 8/21/2008.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 07/25/08. (PAH, )
July 25, 2008 Filing 76 First MOTION to Withdraw Remand to State Court by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion To Withdraw Remand, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Clement, Lauren)
July 25, 2008 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #76 First MOTION to Withdraw Remand to State Court. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (HCJ, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Substitute Attorney and Ella Diaz-Yaeger and Katherine L. Osborne are enrolled as counsel for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 06/26/08. (PAH, )
June 24, 2008 Filing 74 MOTION to Substitute Elia Diaz-Yaeger and Katherine L. Osborne in place of Ralph Hubbard, Seth Schmeeckle and Kristopher T. Wilson as Attorney by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Partial Dismissal with prejudice Bayer CropScience, Inc. as successor to Aventis CropScience. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/23/08. (PAH, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 72 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Richeson, McGready)
June 12, 2008 Filing 71 Conditional Remand Order remanding this action to the USDC for the Middle District of Louisiana. (BP, )
December 12, 2007 Motions terminated: #70 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.. (Per atty, motion pending before MDL) (PAH, )
December 11, 2007 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.. (Riggins, Jeanette)
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Dismiss. Party(s) DSM Copolymer, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/11/07. (PAH, )
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Dismiss. Party(s) Exxon Mobil Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/11/07. (PAH, )
December 11, 2007 Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by DSM Copolymer, Inc.. (Anding, Gregory)
December 11, 2007 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Anding, Gregory)
December 4, 2007 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler, Inc..(Luker, Lynn)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to Entergy Gulf States, Inc.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/30/07. (PAH, )
November 29, 2007 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal Voluntary by Gulf States Utilities Company, Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Van Horn, Mark)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Partial Dismissal as to Reilly-Benton Company reserving to pltfs all rights which they have or may have against any other person, entity, or corporation, whether named or unnamed in this suit.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/06/07. (PAH, )
November 5, 2007 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Riggins, Jeanette) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (PAH, ).
August 14, 2007 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Reilly-Benton Company, Inc..(Riggins, Jeanette) Re-attached answer without cover letter on 8/14/2007 (HCJ, )
August 13, 2007 Filing 59 O-I's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Owens-Illinois, Inc..(Rubenstein, Joshua)
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 JOINT MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal as to dft Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/18/06. (BP, )
December 15, 2006 Filing 57 JOINT MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 JOINT MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to dft Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc only. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/25/06. (BP, ) Modified on 10/25/2006 to add text (BP, ).
October 24, 2006 Filing 55 JOINT MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
June 26, 2006 Filing 54 Letter dated 6/19/06 from Sharon Carter, MDL coordinator to Clerk of Court Re: Transfer Order...original record, certified docket entries, and/or a certified copy of the transfer order NOT SENT (DCB, ) Modified on 6/27/2006 to reflect that case is transferred to EDPA and closed in MDLA
April 10, 2006 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gulf States Utilities Company re #52 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #51 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (Van Horn, Mark)
April 10, 2006 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gulf States Utilities Company identifying Entergy Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Van Horn, Mark)
April 10, 2006 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #48 MOTION to Vacate filed by Gulf States Utilities Company. (Van Horn, Mark)
March 31, 2006 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support Of Transfer to MDL 875 filed by Pharmacia Corporation. (SAH, )
March 29, 2006 Filing 49 Claim/Answer and Affirmative Defenses by The Dow Chemical Company. (Gendusa, Kathleen)
March 29, 2006 Filing 48 MOTION to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Filed in MDL court, not pending in MDLA). (BP, )
March 28, 2006 Filing 47 NOTICE of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania (BP, )
March 17, 2006 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #41 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26 filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1#2 Exhibit Part 2#3 Exhibit Part 3)(BP, )
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Mark Edward Van Horn for Gulf States Utilities Company, John Joseph Zvonek for Gulf States Utilities Company replacing Andrew L. Plauche', Jr. and Kenan S. Rand, Jr....Carter B. Wright is not admitted to MDLA. Signed by Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/9/06. (BP, )
March 10, 2006 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(BP, )
March 9, 2006 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of #41 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26 filed by Gulf States Utilities Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List #2 Exhibit)(Van Horn, Mark)
March 9, 2006 Filing 42 MOTION to Substitute Mark E. Van Horn, Carter B. Wright and John J. Zvonek in place of Andrew L. Plauche' Jr., and Kenan S. Rand, Jr. as Attorney by Gulf States Utilities Company. (BP, )
March 9, 2006 Filing 41 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26 by Gulf States Utilities Company. (Van Horn, Mark)
March 8, 2006 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by The McCarty Corporation.(BP, )
March 8, 2006 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by Pharmacia Corporation.(BP, )
March 2, 2006 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc..(DCB, )
February 27, 2006 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Insurance Company.(BP, )
February 22, 2006 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Royal Insurance Company of America.(BP, )
February 22, 2006 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Gulf States Utilities Company. (BP, )
February 21, 2006 Filing 34 Return on Subpoena to John Braymer by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania, Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
February 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc. answer due within 20 days of the signing of this order . Signed by Judge Docia L Dalby on 2/10/06. (BP, )
February 10, 2006 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc. (BP, )
February 8, 2006 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(BP, )
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Foster Wheeler, Inc. answer due 2/26/2006. . Signed by Judge Docia L Dalby on 2/6/06. (BP, )
February 6, 2006 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Foster Wheeler, Inc.. (BP, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania as to service via La Long Arm Statute to dfts Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Foster Wheeler, Gulf States Utilities Company and Owens-Illinois, Inc. (BP, )
January 31, 2006 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company.(BP, )
January 31, 2006 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Viacom, Inc..(BP, )
January 31, 2006 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Riley Power, Inc..(BP, )
January 31, 2006 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Anco Insulations, Inc..(BP, )
January 25, 2006 Filing 23 Exhibit(s) to #21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibt C, pgs 1-14#2Exhibt C pgs 15-32, Exh D pgs 1-2#3 Exhibit E - L#4 Exhibit L pgs 1-10) (PAH, )
January 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Royal Insurance Company of America answer due 2/15/2006. . Signed by Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/25/06. (BP, )
January 25, 2006 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand (Exhibits to be filed conventionally with the Clerk's office) filed by DSM Copolymer, Inc.. (Nelson, David)
January 24, 2006 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Royal Insurance Company of America. (BP, )
January 24, 2006 Filing 19 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation. (BP, )
January 19, 2006 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc.. (PAH, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 17 NOTICE of tag-along action (PAH, )
January 18, 2006 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc..(PAH, )
January 17, 2006 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Eagle, Inc..(BP, )
January 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. granted an additional 30 days to complete its investigation and to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/13/06. (DCB, )
January 12, 2006 Filing 13 REQUEST for Notice by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (DCB, )
January 12, 2006 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (DCB, )
January 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. The Dow Chemical Company answer due 2/9/2006. . Signed by Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/12/06. (DCB, )
January 11, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal by The Dow Chemical Company. (PAH, )
January 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. Exxon Mobil Corporation answer due 2/8/2006. . Signed by Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/10/06. (DCB, )
January 10, 2006 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (DCB, )
January 5, 2006 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
January 5, 2006 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. (BP, )
January 5, 2006 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Anco Insulations, Inc. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; The Dow Chemical Company served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Exxon Mobil Corporation served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; General Electric Company served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; The McCarty Corporation served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Pharmacia Corporation served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Riley Power, Inc. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Royal Insurance Company of America served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; The Travelers Indemnity Company served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; The Travelers Insurance Company served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006; Viacom, Inc. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. (BP, )
January 5, 2006 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Catania, Kristen Catania. Eagle, Inc. served on 1/3/2006, answer due 1/23/2006; Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. served on 1/3/2006, answer due 1/23/2006; Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. served on 1/3/2006, answer due 1/23/2006. (BP, )
December 30, 2005 Summons Issued as to Anco Insulations, Inc., Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc., Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, DSM Copolymer, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Foster Wheeler, Inc., Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, General Electric Company, Gulf States Utilities Company, The McCarty Corporation, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Royal Insurance Company of America, Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Insurance Company, Viacom, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (DMC, )
December 27, 2005 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DSM Copolymer, Inc..(BP, )
December 21, 2005 Filing 2 Rule 3.1 NOTICE of Collateral Proceeding by DSM Copolymer, Inc. (BP, )
December 21, 2005 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC. (Filing fee $ 250.00 receipt number 1130), filed by DSM Copolymer, Inc..(BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catania et al v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William W. Sentell, III
Represented By: Eugene J. Radcliff
Represented By: Francis Philip Accardo
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Donna Mannina Young
Represented By: Edward R. McGowan
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: Karina P. Gentinetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Joshua L. Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf States Utilities Company
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Represented By: Andrew L. Plauche, Jr.
Represented By: Kenan S. Rand, Jr
Represented By: John Joseph Zvonek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Harold
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas R. Kinler
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: James Richard Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Katherine L. Osborne
Represented By: Elia Demetria Diaz-Yaeger
Represented By: Claude Frederick Bosworth
Represented By: Ralph Shelton Hubbard, III
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Janet L. Macdonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Luker
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: Andrew Mark Maestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Indemnity Company
Represented By: William W. Sentell, III
Represented By: Eugene J. Radcliff
Represented By: Francis Philip Accardo
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Donna Mannina Young
Represented By: Edward R. McGowan
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: Karina P. Gentinetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Represented By: Michele Whitesell Crosby
Represented By: Leon Gary, Jr.
Represented By: Olivia Smith Regard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Cropscience USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence E. Abbott
Represented By: Deborah Kuchler
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Sarah E. Iiams
Represented By: Michele Dana Allen-Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Michael E Hill
Represented By: Claude A. Greco
Represented By: Spiro Latsis
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Medo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Jonathan P. Hilbun
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Edward R. McGowan
Represented By: Douglas R. Kinler
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: James Richard Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Schuette, Jr.
Represented By: Leon Gary, Jr.
Represented By: Olivia Smith Regard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jennifer Shepard Kilpatrick
Represented By: Janet L. Macdonell
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: Margaret Moran Joffe
Represented By: Jamie H. Baglio
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM Copolymer, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Boudreaux
Represented By: David K. Nelson
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crompton Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Cundiff
Represented By: Sherman Gene Fendler
Represented By: Charles Bradford Wilmore
Represented By: Khristina DeLuna Miller
Represented By: Sean P. Brady
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Guenton Cyril Slawson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Alicia Edmond Wheeler
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Gary A. Bezet
Represented By: Scott D. Johnson
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Carol Louise Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Kathleen Gendusa Bodin
Represented By: Jennifer M. Sigler
Represented By: Todd S. Manuel
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: Elisabeth Q. Prescott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: Darryl J. Foster
Represented By: David E. Redmann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Represented By: Katherine L. Osborne
Represented By: Elia Demetria Diaz-Yaeger
Represented By: Claude Frederick Bosworth
Represented By: Ralph Shelton Hubbard, III
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: Lynn Luker
Represented By: Andrew Mark Maestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Celotex Asbestos Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Catania
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren R Clement
Represented By: Angelique Duhon Freel
Represented By: Perry J. Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Kelly C. Fogleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Catania
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren R Clement
Represented By: Angelique Duhon Freel
Represented By: Perry J. Roussel, Jr.
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Kelly C. Fogleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?