Collins v. Stalder et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00163
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 107 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge regarding 100 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Renode Collins. The pltfs motion is denied and the pltfs claims asserted against the deceased deft, Curly Alford, will be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/9/2011. (JDL)
January 6, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE denying 96 Motion to Substitute Party. Pla is hereby granted an extension of time of thirty (30) days from the date of this Order within which to file a proper motion to substitute pursuant to Rule 25 of the FRCP, identifying therein, with specificity, the person or persons to be substituted in the place of the deceased dft Curly Alfred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 1/6/11. (BP)
September 1, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE: As to pltfs 94 Response to Notice, the Court interprets this to be a Motion for Substitution of a proper party-defendant in the place of deceased defendant Curley Alfred. The plaintiffs Motion for Substitution is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED t hat the plaintiff is granted an extension of time of 30 days from the date of this Order within which to file a motion to substitute pursuant to FRCP Rule 25, identifying the person or persons to be substituted in the place of deceased defendant Curly Alfred. Motions shall be filed by 10/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/1/2010. (JDL, )
February 6, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 35 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. denying the 21 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Renode Collins,and granting 23 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Richard L. Stalder, Burl Cain and 32 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Curly Alfred, B. Johnson, Richard L. Stalder, Burl Cain. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge John V. Parker on 02/6/08. (HCJ, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Stalder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?