Rushing v. Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana Systems (Southeastern Louisiana University) et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00623
Filed: August 28, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 124 Third MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 4/20/12. (PLH)
December 5, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as set forth herein re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 12/5/11. (PLH)
October 25, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/25/2010. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana Systems (Southeastern Louisiana University) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?