Woodfox v. Foti et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00789
Filed: October 11, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2015 316 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: This Court finds the State has not satisfied its burden, and the request for a stay of our order issuing an unconditional writ barring retrial is DENIED. For the same reasons this Court does not grant the States request for a stay, the Court GRANTS the pending 279 motion for release. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/08/2015. (BCL)
February 26, 2013 274 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Albert Woodfox. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/26/2013. (LLH)
May 22, 2012 237 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER ON PRE-HEARING MOTIONS : As stated herein, Petitioner Albert Woodfox's motion for clarification and reconsideration (Doc. 231) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Woodfox's motion in limine (Doc. 228) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The State's objections to Woodfoxs proffered evidence (Doc. 230) is deferred until the hearing. The State's motion in limine (Doc. 235) is deferred until the hearing. Thus, the State's motion for expedited hearing on the motion in limine (Doc. 236) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/22/12. (DCB)
May 14, 2012 229 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 214 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/11/12. (DCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodfox v. Foti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?