Corley v. State Of Louisiana Through Division Of Administration, Office Of Risk Management

Case Number: 3:2006cv00882
Filed: November 16, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2011 292 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 290 Motion Requesting Waiver of Cost to Prepare Trial Transcript and Expedited Consideration; denying 290 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/7/2011. (LSM)
October 18, 2011 270 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 242 Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Jill L. Craft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/18/2011. (JDL)
October 17, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 210 , 211 , 212 , 225 , 226 and granting 223 , 224 Motions in Limine.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/17/2011. (CMM)
September 29, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: As to 209 Scheduling Order...IT IS ORDERED that Dr. Rennie Culver provide to the pltf a report which complies with FRCP Rule 26(a)(2)(B) by 10/10/2011. This order is not a determination that Dr. Culvers deposition testimony will be admitted into evidence at the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/29/2011. (JDL)
September 13, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 188 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted to the defendants as to all other employment actions which the plaintiff alleged were retaliatory in violation of Title VII and § 1981.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/12/2011. (CMM)
September 15, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: After reviewing plaintiffs appeal, the ruling of the magistrate judge, and the record in this case, the Court finds that for reasons set forth by the magistrate judge, which are adopted herein as this Courts opinion, the August 16, 2010, ruling is hereby AFFIRMED. Finally, while not pertinent to the issue on this appeal, the Court finds that the magistrate judge and this judge have timely ruled on all motions filed in this case.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/15/2010. (CMM, )
August 18, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Pltfs 104 Motion for Setting Status Conference or in the Alternative Motion for Hearing and 107 Motion Requesting an Explanation for the Court's Inaction and/or Reason for Delayed Rulings on Pending Motion are denied, in part, as moo t. IT IS ORDERED that pltf and counsel for the defts confer in an attempt to agree on reasonable scheduling order deadlines, as stated. FURTHER ORDERED that pltf and counsel for the deft submit their agreed proposed deadlines to the Court by 10/18/2010. If they cannot agree on the proposed deadlines, then they shall submit separate proposed deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/18/2010. (JDL, )
August 17, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Defts 112 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Deposition of Barbara Goodson is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/17/2010. (JDL, )
August 16, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion to Strike; denying 110 Motion for Protective Order as moot; denying 110 Motion in Limine without prejudice, as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/16/2010. (CMM,)
November 12, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 90 Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Discovery Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/12/09. (LSM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corley v. State Of Louisiana Through Division Of Administration, Office Of Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?