Doolittle v. Holmes et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00986
Filed: December 29, 2006
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The defts motions for summary judgment 69 is granted, dismissing the pltfs claim asserted against the remaining defts, and this action is dismissed. All other pending motions are dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/4/2010. (JDL, )
October 16, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Doolittle and 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jolie Darbonne, Howard Prince...It is recommended that the pltfs motion for summary judgment be denied, that t he defts motion for summary judgment be granted, dismissing the pltfs claim asserted against the remaining defts, and that this action be dismissed... Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 10/16/2009. (JDL, )
April 21, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 65 Pltfs Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/21/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doolittle v. Holmes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?