Heck et al v. Buhler et al

Plaintiff: Raymond E. Heck, Doug Hamley, Charles Moore, Joseph Mckearn and Allen Richardson
Defendant: Kenneth K. Buhler, Wayne Triche and Daryl S Dearmond
Cross Claimant: Wayne Triche
Cross Defendant: Kenneth K. Buhler
Case Number: 3:2007cv00021
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2015 261 Opinion or Order of the Court Factual Finding Made Pursuant to the Ruling and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/23/2015. (BCL)
December 4, 2015 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 253 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's 11/20/2015 252 Order to Supplement. The deadline is extended to 12/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/4/2015. (LLH)
November 23, 2015 251 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Defendant's Local Rule 72a Motion to Review 241 Magistrate Judge's Order Or, Alternatively, Objection to Ruling on Motion to Compel and For Contempt is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Magi strate Judge make a factual finding as to whether Defendant has offered to pay the full amount he properly owes, including interest, in light of this ruling, the 2/4/2014,judgment, (Doc. 210), and the 5/15/2015, ruling on attorneys' fees, (Doc. 228). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/20/2015. (JDL)
September 28, 2015 241 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Contempt and 239 Motion to Compel. Defendant Wayne Triche shall provide responses to theplaintiffs' interrogatories and request for production of documents within 14 days. No object ions will be allowed. Because the defendants actions were substantially justified, no costs are due under Rule 37(a)(5)(A). Plaintiff's motion is denied insofar as the plaintiff sought an order finding the defendant in contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/28/2015. (BCL)
May 15, 2014 228 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 212 Request for Attorney Fees ( Response to Court's 2/4/2014 RULING(hereinafter, "Motion")). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/14/2014. (LLH)
February 4, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING, ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion for Reconsideration of 200 Ruling and Order dated 7/2/2013. Any future motion, limited to the issue of their attorney's reasonable rate(s) shall be filed no l ater than 2/18/2014. If Plaintiff's refile their requests for fees, Defendants shall have until 3/11/2014 to file a response. Judgment shall be entered in favor of the plaintiffs and against defendants as stated herein. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/4/2014. (LLH)
July 2, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying without prejudice 198 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot 199 Motion for Leave to file an Opposition; granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion to Alter Judgment. Plaintiffs shall file a motion and proposed order within 14 days of this Ruling specifying the amounts owed by each defendant to each plaintiff, including interest. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/01/2013. (CGP)
September 28, 2012 197 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND/OR TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT, AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. For reasons stated hereing, the Court hereby DENIES Defendant's Motion forJudgment as a Matter of Law 181 . The Court further DENIES Defendant's Motion forNew Trial And/Or to Alter or Amend the Judgment 185 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/28/2012. (PJH)
March 30, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 112 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 99 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wayne Triche is GRANTED IN PART, in that plaintiffs Section 29(b) rescission claim and breach of contract claim against Triche are dismissed with prejudice and DENIED IN PART in that plaintiffs claims against Triche pursuant to §10b and Rule 10b-5 and pursuant to La. R.S. 51:712A(2) are not dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/29/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heck et al v. Buhler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond E. Heck
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Hamley
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Moore
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mckearn
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Richardson
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth K. Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Triche
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl S Dearmond
Represented By: William David Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Wayne Triche
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Kenneth K. Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?