Brumfield v. Coody et al

Plaintiff: Shedrick Brumfield
Defendant: Shirley Coody, Unknown Beoker, David Honeycutt, David Daigrenpont, Richard Stalder and Linda Ramsey
Case Number: 3:2007cv00064
Filed: January 26, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 98 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the adopted 93 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on Behalf of Defendants Boeker, David Daigrepont and Honeycutt be granted and this action shall be dismissed. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 8/26/2011. (JDL)
July 13, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge...granting the Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of Defendant Shirley Coody and dismissing the claims against her... The Court also finds there is no just reason to delay entry of judgment dismi ssing this suit against Shirley Coody pursuant to Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure...A final judgment shall be entered dismissing plaintiff's suit against Shirley Coody with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 07/13/2011. (KDC)
September 22, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 68 Motion to Correct Service and ORDER Dismissing Defendant. Plantiff's complaint is amended to identify Capt. Barrett Beoker as the dft previously identified as Lt. Beoker. Furthermore; IT IS ORDERED that Charles Honeycutt is joined as a dft, and dft David Honeycutt is dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1). The U.S. Marshal shall serve dfts Charles Honeycutt and Capt. Barrett Beoker wherever found. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/22/2010. (CMM, )
August 17, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file any response they may have to the plaintiff's 68 Motion to Correct Service, construed as including a motion to amend the complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/17/2010. (CMM, )
February 9, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDING Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status: Considering ptlfs response to 50 the Order of Court, the evidence showed that the pltf is indigent and has insufficient funds to pay the full appellate filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/9/2009. (JDL, )
January 6, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 49 , the USCA remanded this matter to the district court. IT IS ORDERED that within 20 days from the date of this order, pltf shall provide information regarding financial status, as described in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/6/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfield v. Coody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedrick Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Coody
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Beoker
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Honeycutt
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daigrenpont
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stalder
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ramsey
Represented By: Annette Rhodes Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?