Hayward v. Douglas et al

Plaintiff: Dannie R Hayward, Sr
Defendant: Several Other Unknown Nurses, Medical Care Givers and Prison Officials on Duty from March 18, 2005 through July 30, 2005, Unknown Wilson, Carla Hawkins, Unknown Riley, Unknown Johnson, Unknown Gray, Unknown Ford, Willie Douglas, Greg Phares, JoLynn Williams, Bobbie Unknown, Cathy Unknown, Kietsha Scott, Unknown Williams, Pam Porter and Marbe Doe
Case Number: 3:2007cv00072
Filed: January 31, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 221 Report and Recommendationsof the U.S. Magistrate Judge... granting 214 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carla Hawkins, Pam Porter, Cathy Roule, JoLynn Williams, denying 187 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dannie R Hayward, Sr...denying as moot 220 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gary Wilson, denying 211 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dannie R Hayward, Sr...Judgment shall be entered accordingly....Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 09/28/2011. (KDC)
May 25, 2011 206 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 192 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 183 Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Pam Porter, Cathy Roule, JoLynn Williams shall be granted, vacating and setting aside the default entered herein on 04/20/2011, and this matter shall be referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 05/25/2011. (NLT)
May 13, 2011 200 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 175 Motion to designate ruling as final and appealable. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 05/12/11. (PAH)
March 16, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 162 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the 92 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sidney J Gautreaux, Richard Johnson, Greg Phares, Aaron Gray, Kyle Ford, Eugene Marbe, Willie Douglas, and the 139 Motion to Dismiss filed by Demitris Williams shall be granted, dismissing the pltfs claims asserted against these defts, with prejudice, and that this matter shall be referred back for further proceedings Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/16/2011. (JDL)
March 1, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 154 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/1/11. (BP)
August 11, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 120 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that the 97 MOTION to Vacate 89 Clerk's Entry of Default and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment by Kyle Ford, Aaron Gray, Richard Johnson, Eugene Marbe shall be granted, setting aside the default entered herein on 5/10/2010. This matter shall be referred back for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 8/10/2010. (CMM, )
January 12, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: IT IS ORDERED that the 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Unknown Wilson, Unknown Riley, Unknown Ford, Unknown Gray, Unknown Johnson, and the 34 MOTION Request for Clarification filed by Sidney J Gautreaux, Greg Phares, Willie Douglas shall b e construed as motions to quash service and, as such, shall be granted quashing service upon all defendants except Warden Willie Douglas, Sheriff Sidney Gautreaux and former Sheriff Greg Phares. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall be allow ed an additional period of 45 days from the date the District Judge rules on this Report and Recommendation to serve the unserved defendants and that this matter be referred back for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/12/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayward v. Douglas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Several Other Unknown Nurses, Medical Care Givers and Prison Officials on Duty from March 18, 2005 through July 30, 2005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Phares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoLynn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kietsha Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marbe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannie R Hayward, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?