St. Cyr v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Edward Joseph St. Cyr, III
Defendant: Kevin McDonald, New Roads Police Department, Kenneth Black, John Doe and Clarendon America Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv00539
Filed: July 31, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 71 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 67 Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants, considered as a motion for summary judgment, shall be denied. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 10/8/09. (BP, )
September 16, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shawntell Johnson, Tony Johnson, New Roads Police Department, John Doe, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Kevin McDonald, Kenath Black. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants' Motion to Dismiss, considered as a motion for summary judgment, be denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/16/09. (BP, )
February 5, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 55 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Shawntell Johnson, Tony Johnson. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/4/09. (BP, )
January 22, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Prescription filed by defendants Officers Shawntell Johnson and Tony Johnson shall be denied. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/21/2009. (NLT, )
January 13, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Bystander Liability filed by Shawntell Johnson, Tony Johnson, New Roads Police Department, John Doe, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Kevin McDonald, Kenath Black. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Officers Shawntell Johnson and Tony Johnson be denied. Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/13/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Cyr v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Joseph St. Cyr, III
Represented By: Roderick Terrell Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Roads Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?